In Re: Carolyn Fjord
Petitioner: Gail S. Kosach, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Lisa McCarthy, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, J. Michael Walker, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, L. West Oehmig, Jr., c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Keith Dean Bradt, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Carolyn Fjord, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Bill Rubinsohn, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Dana L. Robinson, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Clyde D. Stensrud, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Sondra K. Russell, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Jose M. Brito, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Annette M. Tippetts, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Len Marazzo, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Michael C. Malaney, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Pamela S. Ward, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Gabriel Garavanian, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-02, Pamela Faust, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Sylvia N. Sparks, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Don Freeland, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Brenda K. Davis, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Harry Garavanian, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Christine O. Whalen, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Robert A. Rosenthal, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Katherine R. Arcell, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Deborah M. Pulfer, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027, Rosemary D'Augusta, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Cynthia Prosterman, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Wayne Taleff, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Donald V. Fry, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Judy Crandall, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Gary Talewsky, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, June Stansbury, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Diana Lynn Ultican, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Jan Marie Brown, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Valarie Ann Jolly, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270, Robert D. Conway, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270 and Lee M. Gentry, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Respondent: US Airways, Inc., Kobre & Kim LLP 800 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022, US Airways Group, Inc., American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporation
Case Number: 19-513
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/13/2019, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2534112] [19-513] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:03 PM]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, denying petition for writ of mandamus, by RCW, DC, RJS, FILED.[2517453] [19-513] [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:59 PM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 22 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2517447] [19-513] [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:56 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER, on behalf of Petitioner Katherine R. Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Jose M. Brito, Jan Marie Brown, Robert D. Conway, Judy Crandall, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donald V. Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Lee M. Gentry, Valarie Ann Jolly, Gail S. Kosach, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, L. West Oehmig, Jr., Cynthia Prosterman, Deborah M. Pulfer, Dana L. Robinson, Robert A. Rosenthal, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, Sylvia N. Sparks, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Wayne Taleff, Gary Talewsky, Annette M. Tippetts, Diana Lynn Ultican, J. Michael Walker, Pamela S. Ward and Christine O. Whalen, advising the court that the trial that is the subject of the petition for writ of mandamus is scheduled to begin on Monday, March 11, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2514739] [19-513]--[Edited 03/11/2019 by KR] [Entered: 03/11/2019 12:20 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys, TRANSMITTED.[2511878] [19-513] [Entered: 03/06/2019 03:57 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERS, Corrected Petition for Writ of Mandamus cover page, RECEIVED.[2508864] [19-513] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:46 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Katherine R. Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Jose M. Brito, Jan Marie Brown, Robert D. Conway, Judy Crandall, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donald V. Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Lee M. Gentry, Valarie Ann Jolly, Gail S. Kosach, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, L. West Oehmig, Jr., Cynthia Prosterman, Deborah M. Pulfer, Dana L. Robinson, Robert A. Rosenthal, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, Sylvia N. Sparks, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Wayne Taleff, Gary Talewsky, Annette M. Tippetts, Diana Lynn Ultican, J. Michael Walker, Pamela S. Ward and Christine O. Whalen, USCA receipt # A02-72814-25, FILED.[2508823] [19-513] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:23 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT, SERVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by US mail.[2508821] [19-513] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:21 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING, PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, on behalf of Petitioner Katherine R. Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Jose M. Brito, Jan Marie Brown, Robert D. Conway, Judy Crandall, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donald V. Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Lee M. Gentry, Valarie Ann Jolly, Gail S. Kosach, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, L. West Oehmig, Jr., Cynthia Prosterman, Deborah M. Pulfer, Dana L. Robinson, Robert A. Rosenthal, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, Sylvia N. Sparks, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Wayne Taleff, Gary Talewsky, Annette M. Tippetts, Diana Lynn Ultican, J. Michael Walker, Pamela S. Ward and Christine O. Whalen, FILED.[2508817] [19-513] [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Carolyn Fjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gail S. Kosach, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa McCarthy, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J. Michael Walker, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L. West Oehmig, Jr., c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Dean Bradt, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carolyn Fjord, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bill Rubinsohn, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dana L. Robinson, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clyde D. Stensrud, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sondra K. Russell, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose M. Brito, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Annette M. Tippetts, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Len Marazzo, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael C. Malaney, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela S. Ward, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriel Garavanian, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-02
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Faust, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sylvia N. Sparks, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Don Freeland, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brenda K. Davis, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harry Garavanian, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christine O. Whalen, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert A. Rosenthal, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Katherine R. Arcell, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deborah M. Pulfer, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-027
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosemary D'Augusta, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cynthia Prosterman, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne Taleff, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald V. Fry, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patricia Ann Meeuwsen, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Judy Crandall, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Talewsky, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: June Stansbury, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diana Lynn Ultican, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jan Marie Brown, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Valarie Ann Jolly, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert D. Conway, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee M. Gentry, c/o David J. Cook, Esq. Cook Collection Attorneys, PLC P.O. Box 270 San Francisco, CA 94104-0270
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Airways, Inc., Kobre & Kim LLP 800 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Airways Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AMR Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Karotkin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?