In Re: Aggrenox Antitrust
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company, Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Professional Drug Company, Inc., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Walgreen Co., Safeway Inc., Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Albertson's LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc., Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Rite Aid Corporation, American Sales Company, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Cesar Castillo, Kroger Co., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Humana Inc., on behalf of itself and on behalf of all others similarly situated and IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., an Israeli Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: Teva Women's Health, Inc., FKA Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Barr Laboratories Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation, now known as Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., a Delaware Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation, now known as Teva Women's Health, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, a German Limited Liability Corporation
Plaintiff / Appellee: Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Neca-Ibew Health & Welfare Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health and Welfare Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund and A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Appellant: People of the State of California
Case Number: 19-754
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Michael R. McDonald for Aetna Inc.,[ # 2563645-2 ], ADDED.[2563807] [18-2474, 18-2487, 18-2578, 19-754] [Entered: 05/14/2019 04:24 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION ORDER, granting motions to extend time to file reply brief[ # 2558380-2 ][ # 2555613-2 ] filed by Appellant Aetna Inc. and People of the State of California in 18-2474, FILED. [2561068][42] [18-2474, 18-2487, 18-2578, 19-754] [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:36 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 39 CAPTION, per order of consolidation of appeals, dated 05/08/2019, AMENDED.[2560704] [19-754, 18-2474, 18-2487, 18-2578] [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:50 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals 18-2474, 18-2487, 18-2578, 19-754, Appellants brief for the appeal in 19-754 must be filed on or before June 7, 2019. Appellees briefs in response must be filed on or before July 8, 2019. The parties briefs must not exceed 10 pages, [ # 31 ] filed by Appellant People of the State of California, by DC, FILED. [2559399][38] [19-754] [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:23 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Health & Welfare Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund and Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, in re: opposing further briefing, RECEIVED. Service date 04/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2548689] [19-754]--[Edited 04/26/2019 by JW] [Entered: 04/25/2019 03:55 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, FILED. Service date 04/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2548189] [19-754] [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:18 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 30 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, informing Court of proposed due date 06/30/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 04/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2546157] [19-754] [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:11 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 29 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2537623] [19-754] [Entered: 04/11/2019 10:40 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 24 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536107] [19-754] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:49 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536105] [19-754] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:47 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534626] [19-754] [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:23 AM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Ross E. Elfand for Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International and GmbH Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, in case 19-754 , [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2534222] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:43 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte for Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, in case 19-754 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2534220] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:42 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Jack Pace for Appellees Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG, in case 19-754 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2534218] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:39 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Health & Welfare Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund and Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534161] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:19 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, Neca-Ibew Health & Welfare Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, Sergeants Benevolent Association Health and Welfare Fund, Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund and Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534149] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:15 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534145] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:13 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534131] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:08 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534118] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:04 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534104] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:01 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barr Laboratories Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2533876] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:57 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Barr Laboratories Inc., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2533871] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:54 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Barr Laboratories Inc., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2533867] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:52 PM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. and Barr Laboratories Inc., FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2533858] [19-754] [Entered: 04/05/2019 01:49 PM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2527608] [19-754] [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:40 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS, dated 02/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2527604] [19-754] [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:38 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, district court receipt # CTDC5209174, FILED.[2527602] [19-754] [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:37 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant People of the State of California, FILED. [2527600] [19-754] [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Aggrenox Antitrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council 21 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEB Grocery Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota and North Dakota Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Health Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newspaper And Magazine Employees Health And Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Drug Company, Inc., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order Of Police Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertson's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 312 Health and Welfare Trust, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sales Company, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Inc., on behalf of itself and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAFF Local 22 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Teva Women's Health, Inc., FKA Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Represented By: Jack Pace Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte Esq.
Represented By: Ross E. Elfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barr Laboratories Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation, now known as Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Gerard Justin Cedrone Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Holding Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Gerard Ronan
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GMBH & Co. KG
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Represented By: Jack Pace Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte Esq.
Represented By: Ross E. Elfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., a Delaware Corporation, now known as Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, a German Limited Liability Corporation
Represented By: Brian Timothy Burgess Esq.
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Timothy Gerard Ronan
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Peter James Carney Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Represented By: Jack Pace Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Sterrett Leddicotte Esq.
Represented By: Ross E. Elfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pipefitters Union Local NO 537 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AGC-International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: United Food And Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health And Welfare Fund, on its own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Twin City Iron Workers Health And Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Man-U Service Contract Trust Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: School Cafeteria Employees Local 634 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Painters District Council No. 30 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Neca-Ibew Health & Welfare Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Afscme District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sergeants Benevolent Association Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Electrical Workers' Insurance Fund
Represented By: John A. Macoretta Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Eisler Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Heidi M. Drewes-Silton Esq.
Represented By: Stephen E. Connolly Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Represented By: Robin A. Van der Meulen Esq.
Represented By: Brian Oliver O'Mara Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Lee Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Buildings Trade Welfare Plan, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Renae D. Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen Esq.
Represented By: William H. Narwold Esq.
Represented By: Marvin Alan Miller Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: People of the State of California
Represented By: John Alden Meade Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., an Israeli Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?