Karp v. SI Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert McHugh and Stephen Bushansky
Defendant / Appellee: Kathleen A. Nealon, Michael R. Garvey, Donna M. Evan, Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc., Mark D. Alliod, Kevin M. McCarthy, Dennis Pollack, SI Financial Group, Inc., Robert O. Gillard, Robert C. Cushman, Sr., Roger Engle and Rheo A. Brouillard
Plaintiff / Appellant: Selwyn Karp, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 20-1625
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 24 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2857796] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:43 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 06/09/2020, determining the appeal to DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT, ISSUED.[Mandate][2857793] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:42 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 22 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2857789] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:37 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 42 STIPULATION, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED.[2857306] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:59 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 06/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2857303] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:55 AM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 STIPULATION, [14], on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED.[2856505] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/08/2020 12:41 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 06/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2856368] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/08/2020 11:54 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [12], on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED.[2855130] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:38 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2855056] [20-1625] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:13 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2845993] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:37 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Thomas McKenna for Selwyn Karp, in case 20-1625, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2845756] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:08 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED. Service date 05/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2845723] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:53 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 CAPTION, Stephen Bushansky and Robert McHugh were added as Consols-Plaintiffs, AMENDED.[2845615] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:50 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Bennett T. Richardson, Esq. for Appellees SI Financial Group, Inc., Mark D. Alliod, Rheo A. Brouillard, Roger Engle, Donna M. Evan, Michael R. Garvey, Robert O. Gillard, Kevin M. McCarthy, Kathleen A. Nealon, Dennis Pollack, Robert C. Cushman, Sr. and Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2845594] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:37 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY, Bennett T. Richardson for Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc. Rheo A. Brouillard, Robert O. Gillard, Roger Engle, Mark D. Alliod, Kathleen A. Nealon, Kevin M. McCarthy, Robert C. Cushman Sr., Donna M. Evan, Dennis Pollack, SI Financial Group, Inc., Michael R. Garvey, in case 20-1625, [ # 1 ], ADDED.[2845592] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:35 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, district court receipt # ACTDC-5871030, FILED.[2845468] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:13 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2845467] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:12 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Selwyn Karp, FILED. [2845466] [20-1625] [Entered: 05/22/2020 02:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Karp v. SI Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kathleen A. Nealon
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael R. Garvey
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donna M. Evan
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark D. Alliod
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin M. McCarthy
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dennis Pollack
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SI Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert O. Gillard
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert C. Cushman, Sr.
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roger Engle
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rheo A. Brouillard
Represented By: Bennett T. Richardson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Selwyn Karp, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: James C. Riley
Represented By: Thomas McKenna
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bushansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?