Degraffenreid v. Lee
Petitioner / Appellant: Brian Degraffenreid
Respondent / Appellee: William Lee, Superintendent, Eastern Correctional Facility
Case Number: 20-1676
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for certificate of appealability [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2872741] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:57 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, appellant respectfully requests that this Court retract its June 24th, 2020 Order and permit appellant to proceed with the appeal. RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2869870] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/24/2020 12:21 PM]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 06/24/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/08/2020, unless Appellant Brian Degraffenreid submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[2869669] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:23 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Nancy D. Killian, [ # 17 ], in place of attorney Barbara Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2869663] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:19 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2869654] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/24/2020 10:16 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2868893] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:43 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 9 ], [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED.[2856668] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/08/2020 02:06 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2856394] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/08/2020 12:00 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [10], on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED.[2855970] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/08/2020 09:05 AM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 CORRECTED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2855507] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:11 AM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 7 ], on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED.[2855447] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:46 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2855088] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:23 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2855083] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:21 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2855020] [20-1676] [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:00 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2850619] [20-1676] [Entered: 05/29/2020 02:17 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/24/2020, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2850090] [20-1676] [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:26 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2850079] [20-1676] [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:23 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2850076] [20-1676] [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:22 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Brian Degraffenreid, FILED. [2850069] [20-1676] [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Degraffenreid v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Brian Degraffenreid
Represented By: Barbara Zolot Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: William Lee, Superintendent, Eastern Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?