In Re: SSA Bonds Antitrust Lit
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California, Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund, City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all otrhers similarly situated, Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, City of Bristol Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and in a representative capacity, on behalf of all similarly situated, Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Boston Retirement System, On behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, The Police Retirement System of St. Louis, City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System, KBC Asset Management NV, Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, on behalf of itself, and, in a representative capacity, on behalf of all those similarly situated
Defendant: John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, Barclays Services Limited, Gary McDonald, Merrill Lynch International, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Bhardeep Singh Heer, Nomura Holdings, Inc., Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited, Barclays Capital Inc., TD Securities Limited, Bank of America, TD Bank, N.A., Amandeep Singh Manku, Credit Agricole S.A., Nomura International plc, Credit Suisse AG, Gary Richard McDonald, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Shailen Pau, Bank of America Corporation, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., BNP Paribas, Barclays Bank PLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited and Credit Suisse International
Plaintiff / Appellant: Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Deutsche Bank AG, Bank of America, N.A., Citibank, N.A., BNP Paribas S.A., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, RBC Europe Limited, Hiren Gudka, The Toronto-Dominion Bank, HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Canada, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Case Number: 20-1759
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 106 ATTORNEY, Benjamin D. Wasserman for The Toronto-Dominion Bank TD Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759 , [ # 105 ], ADDED.[2889222] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:33 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Toronto-Dominion Bank and TD Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2889127] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/21/2020 02:42 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 104 CAPTION, removing appellate designation for Credit Suisse Group AG, AMENDED.[2881611] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/10/2020 12:04 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 103 ATTORNEY, Matthew J. Porpora for RBC Europe Limited RBC Capital Markets LLC Royal Bank of Canada, in case 20-1759 , [ # 102 ], ADDED.[2877381] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:59 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2877252] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:52 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 101 ATTORNEY, Eric Lawson for Bhardeep Singh Heer, in case 20-1759 , [ # 100 ], ADDED.[2875810] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:12 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bhardeep Singh Heer, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2875795] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:08 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 99 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bhardeep Singh Heer, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2875790] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:05 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 98 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in re: requesting to remove appellate designation for Credit Suisse Group AG, RECEIVED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2873394] [20-1759]--[Edited 06/29/2020 by JW] [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:52 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 97 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Brief due date as 09/14/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 09/14/2020, FILED.[2872222] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:41 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 96 ATTORNEYS, Adam Mintz, Sheila Ramesh, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse AG, in case 20-1759 , [ # 67 ], [ # 66 ], [ # 65 ], ADDED.[2872221] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:40 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 95 ATTORNEY, Richard F. Albert for Shailen Pau, in case 20-1759 , [ # 94 ], ADDED.[2872188] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:25 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Shailen Pau, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF. [2872126] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:53 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 93 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Shailen Pau, FILED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2872121] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:50 PM]
June 26, 2020 Filing 90 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, informing Court of proposed due date 09/14/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2872034] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 01:18 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 89 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2871060] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/25/2020 02:37 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 86 ATTORNEY, Rachel Jovita Corrigan for Nomura Securities International, Inc., in case 20-1759, [ # 85 ], ADDED.[2870717] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:12 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nomura Securities International, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870677] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/25/2020 10:49 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 84 CURED DEFECTIVE, Form C, [ # 57 ], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2869728] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/24/2020 11:02 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 83 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [45], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2869726] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/24/2020 11:00 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 82 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Amandeep Singh Manku, FILED. Service date 06/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2869458] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 06:23 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 81 ATTORNEY, Bradley Stuart Lui for Gary McDonald, in case 20-1759 , [ # 80 ], ADDED.[2869280] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:03 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Gary McDonald, FILED. Service date 06/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2869140] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:34 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 79 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868504] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 11:04 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE, to Appellee Bank of America, N.A., Deutsche Bank AG, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2868495] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 10:58 AM]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER, dated 06/23/2020, dismissing appeal by 07/07/2020, unless Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2868412] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/23/2020 10:17 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 76 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868104] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/22/2020 07:45 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, James Sigel for Gary McDonald, in case 20-1759, [ # 74 ], ADDED.[2865897] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:57 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Gary McDonald, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2865769] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:33 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Gary McDonald, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2865761] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:31 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 71 ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Credit Suisse International Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759, [ # 67 ], ADDED.[2864870] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:23 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 70 ATTORNEY, Sheila Ramesh for Credit Suisse International Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759, [ # 66 ], ADDED.[2864866] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:21 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse International Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759, [ # 65 ], ADDED.[2864864] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:20 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 68 ATTORNEY, David G. Januszewski, [ # 64 ], in place of attorney Adam S. Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2864860] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:15 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864569] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 03:00 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864565] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 02:58 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864557] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 02:53 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 06/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2864552] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/17/2020 02:50 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nomura Securities International, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2863735] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:51 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 57 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2863714] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:24 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY, David Mitchell for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 55 ], ADDED.[2863618] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:19 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2863586] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:03 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Barry Gordon Sher for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Securities Limited Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Services Limited, in case 20-1759, [ # 53 ], ADDED.[2863547] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:47 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited and Barclays Services Limited, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2863459] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 02:50 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited and Barclays Services Limited, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2863451] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/16/2020 02:46 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 51 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2862514] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/15/2020 05:14 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2861855] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:06 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 46 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2861739] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/15/2020 11:09 AM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 45 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2861734] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/15/2020 11:08 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2861294] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 06:30 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 43 CAPTION, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Defendant-Appellee, Credit Agricole S.A., Defendant, AMENDED.[2861240] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 05:28 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, in case 20-1759, [ # 41 ], ADDED.[2861235] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 05:25 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860821] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 01:44 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 40 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2860798] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 01:37 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 39 CURED DEFECTIVE, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 33 ], [ # 35 ], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2860693] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:28 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Andrew Love for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 35 ], ADDED.[2860690] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:27 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Susan Katina Alexander for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2860688] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:24 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Robert Gerard King for The Toronto-Dominion Bank TD Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2860686] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:21 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860683] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:19 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, James H.R. Windels for The Toronto-Dominion Bank TD Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759, [ # 31 ], ADDED.[2860682] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:18 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860679] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:17 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee TD Securities (USA) LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860663] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:06 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee TD Securities (USA) LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, FILED. Service date 06/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2860654] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:02 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 30 CAPTION, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citigroup Inc., Defendant-Appellee, AMENDED.[2860142] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:51 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of -- Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2860103] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:12 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Karen Hoffman Lent for Citigroup Inc. Citigroup Global Markets Limited Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 20-1759, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2859624] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:58 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Jay B Kasner for Citigroup Inc. Citigroup Global Markets Limited Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 20-1759, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2859619] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:56 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2859591] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:45 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2859578] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:42 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee TD Securities (USA) LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, FILED. Service date 06/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2859524] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:13 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Christopher Seck for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2859133] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:34 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Stephanie Solomon for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2859124] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:32 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Thomas Lepri for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2859121] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:26 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Jeremy Andersen for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2859114] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:24 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Daniel L. Brockett for Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, in case 20-1759, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2859109] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:20 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney James H.R. Windels, SUBSTITUTED.[2859105] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:17 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858553] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:16 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858548] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:13 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858547] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:10 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858538] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:05 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858528] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:01 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee TD Securities (USA) LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858266] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:56 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2858201] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:17 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2858190] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:03 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858014] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/09/2020 05:13 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858010] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/09/2020 05:11 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2857047] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:33 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20059954., FILED.[2857046] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:33 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2857045] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:31 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. [2857041] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: SSA Bonds Antitrust Lit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhardeep Singh Heer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amandeep Singh Manku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Agricole S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Richard McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shailen Pau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: David G. Januszewski Esq.
Represented By: Sheila Ramesh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all otrhers similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Bristol Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and in a representative capacity, on behalf of all similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbestos Workers Philadelphia Welfare and Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension Relief Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Retirement System, On behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Atlanta Firefighters Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KBC Asset Management NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter-Local Pension Fund Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, on behalf of itself, and, in a representative capacity, on behalf of all those similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Jeremy Andersen
Represented By: Stephanie Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Daniel L. Brockett
Represented By: Thomas Lepri Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Seck Esq.
Represented By: David Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Jeremy Andersen
Represented By: Stephanie Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Daniel L. Brockett
Represented By: Thomas Lepri Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Seck Esq.
Represented By: David Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Jeremy Andersen
Represented By: Stephanie Solomon Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Daniel L. Brockett
Represented By: Thomas Lepri Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Seck Esq.
Represented By: David Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: John Francis Terzaken Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner Esq.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas S.A.
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner Esq.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner Esq.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner Esq.
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: James H.R. Windels Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Robert Gerard King Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Wasserman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RBC Europe Limited
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hiren Gudka
Represented By: Wesley Railey Powell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Toronto-Dominion Bank
Represented By: James H.R. Windels Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Robert Gerard King Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin D. Wasserman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Alexander John Willscher
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Stein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: David G. Januszewski Esq.
Represented By: Sheila Ramesh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?