Garlick v. Miller
Petitioner: James Garlick
Respondent: Superintendent William Lee, Eastern Correctional Facility
Case Number: 20-1796
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 11, 2021 Summary Garlick v. Lee

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Joshua Weiss for William Lee, in case 20-1796, [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2871279] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:42 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2871182] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:47 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee James Garlick, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870358] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/24/2020 06:58 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 25 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant William Lee Brief due date as 08/31/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 08/31/2020, FILED.[2869604] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/24/2020 09:33 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, informing Court of proposed due date 08/31/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2869570] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/24/2020 08:59 AM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 NEW CASE MANAGER, Patrick Finn, ASSIGNED.[2866649] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/19/2020 03:25 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2865870] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 04:42 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2865763] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 03:31 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Robert Christopher McIver for William Lee, in case 20-1796, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2865555] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 01:23 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 13 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED.[2865551] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 01:22 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2865431] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:20 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional, [12], on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED.[2865401] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 12:00 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2865382] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/18/2020 11:53 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NTOICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 9 ], [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED.[2863055] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/16/2020 11:02 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2862937] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:19 AM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [8], on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED.[2862624] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/15/2020 08:36 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. Service date 06/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2862091] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/15/2020 02:20 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Matthew Bova for Appellee James Garlick, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2860504] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:45 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2860489] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:39 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20174843, FILED.[2860479] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:35 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/03/2020, RECEIVED.[2860474] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:33 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2860469] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:31 AM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William Lee, FILED. [2860463] [20-1796] [Entered: 06/12/2020 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Garlick v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent William Lee, Eastern Correctional Facility
Represented By: Robert Christopher McIver Esq.
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Weiss Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Garlick
Represented By: Matthew Bova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?