Harris v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, a New York corporation, Scottrade Inc., an Arizona corporation, TD Ameritrade, Inc., a New York corporation, Depository Trust Company, a New York corporation, Cede & Co., a New York partnership and TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc., a Nebraska corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jan Harris
Case Number: 20-1960
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 55 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Scottrade Inc. Brief due date as 10/13/2020, FILED.[2895762] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 05:46 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 54 CURED DEFECTIVE Scheduling notification, [ # 52 ], on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED.[2895761] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 05:44 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 53 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 10/13/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2895645] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:08 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 52 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [51], on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED.[2895466] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:33 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 51 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 10/13/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2895181] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:51 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 50 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Depository Trust Company and Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation Brief due date as 10/13/2020, FILED.[2894828] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/29/2020 09:20 AM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 49 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Cede & Co., Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation and Depository Trust Company, informing Court of proposed due date 10/13/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2894511] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:22 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 47 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc. and TD Ameritrade, Inc. Brief due date as 10/13/2020, FILED.[2893445] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/27/2020 05:23 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 46 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee TD Ameritrade, Inc. and TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 10/13/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/27/2020 by CM/ECF.[2893438] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/27/2020 05:16 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 40 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 37 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellees Cede & Co., Depository Trust Company and Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, FILED.[2892278] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:08 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Zachary Wagner Klinger for Cede & Co. Depository Trust Company Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, in case 20-1960, [ # 38 ], ADDED.[2892269] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:04 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cede & Co., Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation and Depository Trust Company, FILED. Service date 07/24/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2892162] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:22 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 37 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [36], on behalf of Appellees Cede & Co., Depository Trust Company and Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, FILED.[2891545] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/24/2020 09:43 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, Depository Trust Company and Cede & Co., FILED. Service date 07/23/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2891160] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/23/2020 03:19 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Appellant's brief, addendum, and appendix, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, FILED. Service date 07/19/2020 by 3rd party.[2888916] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/21/2020 12:04 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 34 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-138), on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, FILED. Service date 07/14/2020 by email.[2885556] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/15/2020 05:45 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 33 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, FILED. Service date 07/14/2020 by email. [2885554] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/15/2020 05:43 PM]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, dated 07/14/2020, setting Appellant Jan Harris's brief and appendix filing date for on or before 08/31/2020, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2884037] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:53 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 29 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2883214] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:19 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 23 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, district court receipt # 465401261164, FILED.[2879416] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/08/2020 01:24 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 22 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, informing Court of proposed due date 08/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 06/30/2020 by email.[2875636] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/01/2020 02:40 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2875427] [20-1960] [Entered: 07/01/2020 11:39 AM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Jan Harris, FILED. Service date 06/30/2020 by email.[2874110] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/30/2020 11:10 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, FILED. Service date 06/30/2020 by US mail.[2874032] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/30/2020 10:40 AM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Robert J. Walker, in place of attorney Michael R. Walker, SUBSTITUTED.[2873400] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:56 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cede & Co., Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation and Depository Trust Company, FILED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2873329] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:11 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [ # 15 ], on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED.[2871124] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:17 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2871104] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:05 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [13], on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2871087] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/25/2020 02:51 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED. Service date 06/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870803] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:52 AM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Laith J. Hamdan for TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc. TD Ameritrade, Inc., in case 20-1960 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2870438] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/25/2020 07:50 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc. and TD Ameritrade, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870226] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:06 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee TD Ameritrade, Inc. and TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870219] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:02 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [8], on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2870169] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:36 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Scottrade Inc., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870148] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/24/2020 03:25 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2869519] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/24/2020 07:34 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2869300] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:11 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Michael Robert Walker, Esq. for Appellee Scottrade Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2869296] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:10 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2869269] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:01 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER, dated 06/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2869266] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/23/2020 04:00 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jan Harris, FILED. [2869252] [20-1960] [Entered: 06/23/2020 03:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Harris v. TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Depository Trust and Clearing Corporation, a New York corporation
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg Esq.
Represented By: Zachary Wagner Klinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scottrade Inc., an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Michael Robert Walker Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Walker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade, Inc., a New York corporation
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Represented By: Laith J. Hamdan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Depository Trust Company, a New York corporation
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg Esq.
Represented By: Zachary Wagner Klinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cede & Co., a New York partnership
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg Esq.
Represented By: Zachary Wagner Klinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Ameritrade Clearing Inc., a Nebraska corporation
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Represented By: Laith J. Hamdan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jan Harris
Represented By: Jan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?