Malik v. City of New York
Defendant: Jane Doe 1, John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 2, as employees of the Kings County District Attorney's Office and individually, Kenneth P. Thompson and John Doe 1
Defendant / Appellee: Albina Zavadsky, Debra Jaroslawicz, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Glenn P. Kenny, City of New York and Robert Addonizio
Plaintiff / Appellant: Abdul Q. Malik
Case Number: 20-1969
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 45 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF AND APPENDIX[ # 44 ], [ # 43 ], on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED.[2913622] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/21/2020 08:45 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 44 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-309), on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 08/19/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2912315] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/19/2020 03:53 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 43 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 08/19/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2912306] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/19/2020 03:49 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 42 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief & appendix[41], on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED.[2909278] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:12 AM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 08/14/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2908815] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:12 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE, to Appellee Albina Zavadsky , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2901678] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/06/2020 09:52 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [ # 34 ] filed by Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, by JFB, FILED. [2900748][38] [20-1969] [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:11 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2897577] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/31/2020 03:35 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 CAMP ORDER, The Courts Order dated July 9, 2020 scheduling a mediation with the Civil Appeals Mediation Program (CAMP) for July 30, 2020 is hereby VACATED. [2890125] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/22/2020 02:59 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Addonizio, City of New York, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Debra Jaroslawicz and Glenn P. Kenny, in re: requesting to cancel the CAMP conference, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2888716] [20-1969]--[Edited 07/21/2020 by JW] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:17 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 08/14/2020, appellees' brief due date as 09/18/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2881370] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:09 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 28 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2881368] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:07 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Robert Addonizio, City of New York, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Debra Jaroslawicz and Glenn P. Kenny, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2880982] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:23 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/30/2020, Start Time: 11:00 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2880486] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:17 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2879008] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:14 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2879001] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:11 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2878983] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:01 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Robert Mahoney, [ # 15 ], in place of attorney Ryan G. Blanch, SUBSTITUTED.[2878657] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/07/2020 06:28 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2878538] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/07/2020 04:50 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for City of New York Eric Gonzalez Glenn P. Kenny Debra Jaroslawicz Robert Addonizio, in case 20-1969, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2877361] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:52 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Debra Jaroslawicz, Glenn P. Kenny and Robert Addonizio, FILED. Service date 07/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2877231] [20-1969] [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:32 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 CAPTION, changed party designation for Kenneth P. Thompson to defendant, AMENDED.[2873219] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:10 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, James E. Johnson, for defendant-appellee Kenneth P. Thompson, TERMINATED.[2873214] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:07 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Addonizio, City of New York, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Debra Jaroslawicz and Glenn P. Kenny, request that the Court strike this office and James E. Johnson as counsel for defendant-appellee Kenneth P. Thompson on the docket sheet in the above-referenced matter. Mr. Thompson passed away prior to the filing of this lawsuit and was never served with process. RECEIVED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2873170] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/29/2020 01:44 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Zachary S. Shapiro, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2872957] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:13 PM]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Eric Gonzalez, Esq., Debra Jaroslawicz, Glenn P. Kenny and Robert Addonizio, FILED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2872789] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:34 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2869573] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/24/2020 09:01 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12965539, FILED.[2869564] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/24/2020 08:54 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 05/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2869562] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/24/2020 08:54 AM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Abdul Q. Malik, FILED. [2869560] [20-1969] [Entered: 06/24/2020 08:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Malik v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Albina Zavadsky
Represented By: Christopher Scott Cardillo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Debra Jaroslawicz
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Gonzalez, Esq.
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Glenn P. Kenny
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Addonizio
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2, as employees of the Kings County District Attorney's Office and individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Abdul Q. Malik
Represented By: Eric Alvarez Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Gordon Blanch Esq.
Represented By: Robert Mahoney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?