Capstone Logistics Holdings, I v. Navarrete
Plaintiff: Capstone Logistics, LLC, Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc. and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C.
Counter Claimant: Steven Willis, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Humano LLC and Mario Rojas
Case Number: 20-2301
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 59 CURED DEFECTIVE Brief and Supplemental Appendix [ # 52 ], [ # 53 ], [ # 54 ], on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 20-2301, FILED.[2925000] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:06 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis in 18-3500, 20-2301, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2924323] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:16 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 54 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 18-3500, 20-2301, FILED. Service date 09/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2921639] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:39 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 18-3500, 20-2301, FILED. Service date 09/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2921635] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:37 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 52 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Brief and Supplemental Appendix, [50], on behalf of Appellees Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., FILED.[2921374] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 09/01/2020 02:29 PM]
August 28, 2020 Filing 50 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 20-2301, 18-3500, FILED. Service date 08/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [2919729] [20-2301, 18-3500] [Entered: 08/28/2020 06:22 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis in 18-3500, 20-2301, FILED. Service date 08/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2908471] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 08/14/2020 01:35 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 43 CURED DEFECTIVE Supplemental Brief [ # 40 ], [ # 2902852-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 18-3500, FILED.[2903313] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:11 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Stephen Moses, for Appellants Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, TERMINATED.[2903306] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:08 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 40 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Supplemental Brief, [ # 2896881-2 ], on behalf of Appellees Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 18-3500, FILED.[2901992] [18-3500, 20-2301] [Entered: 08/06/2020 12:35 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 39 CURED DEFECTIVE Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 34 ], [ # 36 ], [ # 37 ], on behalf of Appellees Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 20-2301, FILED.[2901348] [20-2301, 18-3500] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:45 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEYS, Robert Brian Milligan, Robert J. Carty Jr. for Capstone Logistics, LLC Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc. Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., in case 20-2301, [ # 36 ], [ # 37 ], ADDED.[2901344] [20-2301] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:44 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2901299] [20-2301] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:10 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 20-2301, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2900949] [20-2301, 18-3500] [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:53 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2900900] [20-2301] [Entered: 08/05/2020 12:02 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 34 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [32], [33], on behalf of Appellees Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C. in 18-3500, FILED.[2900775] [20-2301, 18-3500] [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:37 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2898959] [20-2301] [Entered: 08/03/2020 03:34 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc., Capstone Logistics, LLC and Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C., FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2898949] [20-2301] [Entered: 08/03/2020 03:30 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket no. 20-2301, ASSIGNED.[2898734] [20-2301, 18-3500] [Entered: 08/03/2020 01:17 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 28 EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Per Order dated 07/31/2020, by JAC, FILED.[2897553] [18-3500, 20-2301]--[Edited 07/31/2020 by WD] [Entered: 07/31/2020 03:25 PM]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, dated 07/31/2020, setting briefing schedule limited to arguing the June 23, 2020 permanent injunction, by JAC, FILED.[2897540] [18-3500, 20-2301]--[Edited 07/31/2020 by WD]--[Edited 07/31/2020 by WD] [Entered: 07/31/2020 03:20 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Jennifer R. Lucas for Pedro Navarrete, Steven Willis, Humano LLC, David Poffenberger, and Mario Rojas, in case 20-2301, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2897371] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:11 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2897366] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:06 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2897359] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:59 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 CAPTION, as per the motion order filed on 07/31/2020 please refer to the caption on docket number 18-3500, AMENDED.[2897208] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:43 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTE: See lead case, 18-3500, containing complete set of docket entries.[2897201] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:40 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals, [ # 10 ], filed by Appellant Mario Rojas, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Steven Willis and Humano LLC, by JAC, FILED. [2897198][17] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/31/2020 11:39 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2896727] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:17 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2896725] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:16 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. Service date 07/24/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2892349] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:25 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2890152] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:09 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20722333, FILED.[2890146] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:07 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/23/2020, RECEIVED.[2890144] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:06 PM]
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Humano LLC, Pedro Navarrete, David Poffenberger, Mario Rojas and Steven Willis, FILED. [2890132] [20-2301] [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Capstone Logistics Holdings, I v. Navarrete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Steven Willis
Represented By: Steven Klepper Esq.
Represented By: Eric A. Savage
Represented By: Michelle Ferber Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Pedro Navarrete
Represented By: Steven Klepper Esq.
Represented By: Eric A. Savage
Represented By: Michelle Ferber Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: David Poffenberger
Represented By: Steven Klepper Esq.
Represented By: Eric A. Savage
Represented By: Michelle Ferber Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Humano LLC
Represented By: Steven Klepper Esq.
Represented By: Eric A. Savage
Represented By: Michelle Ferber Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mario Rojas
Represented By: Steven Klepper Esq.
Represented By: Eric A. Savage
Represented By: Michelle Ferber Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone Logistics, LLC
Represented By: James Yu Esq.
Represented By: Christine Baran Esq.
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Carty Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James Yu Esq.
Represented By: Christine Baran Esq.
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Carty Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Workforce Logistics, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Yu Esq.
Represented By: Christine Baran Esq.
Represented By: Robert Brian Milligan Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Carty Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?