Rev. Steven Soos v. Cuomo
Plaintiff / Appellee: Reverend Steven Soos, Reverend Nicholas Stamos, Mayer Mayerfeld, Elchanan Perr and Daniel Schonbrun
Intervenor: Justin G. Crawford, James R. Young, Kevin J. Fritschler, Matt Shaw, Bradley M. Markowski, August N. Santore, Jr. and Jenna M. DiMartile
Defendant / Appellant: Bill de Blasio, Mayor of the City of New York, in his official capacity, Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, in his official capacity and Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York in her official capacity
Not Yet Classified: Kenneth McGuire, Law Offices of Kenneth McGuire
Case Number: 20-2414
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 49 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Bill de Blasio Brief due date as 11/09/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 11/09/2020, FILED.[2908012] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:46 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 46 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, 20-2418, informing Court of proposed due date 11/09/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2907176] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:57 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 45 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James Brief due date as 11/09/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 11/09/2020, FILED.[2906610] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:51 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 42 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2906526] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:04 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 41 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James in 20-2414, informing Court of proposed due date 11/09/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2906466] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/12/2020 03:32 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Christopher A. Ferrara, for Appellees Mayer Mayerfeld, Elchanan Perr, Daniel Schonbrun, Steven Soos and Nicholas Stamos, as per letter filed on 08/10/2020, [ # 36 ], TERMINATED.[2905022] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:58 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER, dated 08/10/2020, on behalf of Appellees Mayer Mayerfeld, Elchanan Perr, Daniel Schonbrun, Steven Soos and Nicholas Stamos in 20-2414, 20-2418, informing the Court that counsel Christopher A. Ferrara should not be designated as counsel for appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2905016] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:50 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Stephen M. Crampton for Daniel Schonbrun Mayer Mayerfeld Steven Soos Elchanan Perr Nicholas Stamos, in case 20-2414; Stephen M. Crampton for Daniel Schonbrun Mayer Mayerfeld Steven Soos Elchanan Perr Nicholas Stamos, in case 20-2418, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2904521] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:59 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 32 ], [ # 33 ], on behalf of Appellees Mayer Mayerfeld, Elchanan Perr, Daniel Schonbrun, Steven Soos and Nicholas Stamos in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED.[2904516] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:55 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mayer Mayerfeld, Elchanan Perr, Daniel Schonbrun, Steven Soos and Nicholas Stamos in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2904502] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:49 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 32 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [31], on behalf of Appellees Daniel Schonbrun, Steven Soos and Nicholas Stamos in 20-2414, Appellees Mayer Mayerfeld and Elchanan Perr in 20-2418, FILED.[2904458] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/10/2020 03:31 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nicholas Stamos, Daniel Schonbrun and Steven Soos in 20-2414, Appellee Mayer Mayerfeld and Elchanan Perr in 20-2418, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2904359] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/10/2020 02:45 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 28 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904142] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:59 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 27 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904131] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:55 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2903603] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/10/2020 01:50 AM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2903602] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/10/2020 01:47 AM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio, FILED. Service date 08/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2899520] [20-2414] [Entered: 08/04/2020 10:11 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for Bill de Blasio, in case 20-2414 Richard Paul Dearing for Bill de Blasio, in case 20-2418, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2899004] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 03:55 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2898993] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 03:51 PM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Zachary S. Shapiro, [ # 18 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2898448] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:17 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED.[2898441] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:15 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2898423] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 11:11 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Substitute Counsel, [16], on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, FILED.[2898371] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 10:54 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2414, 20-2418, FILED. Service date 08/03/2020 by CM/ECF. [2898357] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 08/03/2020 10:50 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2897431] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/31/2020 01:54 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Brian D. Ginsberg, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2897285] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:26 PM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James in 20-2414, FILED. Service date 07/31/2020 by CM/ECF. [2897275] [20-2414, 20-2418] [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:22 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 CAPTION, added the Appellant designation to Defendant Bill de Blasio as per the Notice of Appeal that was processed as docket number 20-2418, AMENDED.[2896515] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:32 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTE: See lead case, 20-2414, containing complete set of docket entries.[2896502] [20-2418, 20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:26 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2896490] [20-2418] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:22 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bill de Blasio in 20-2418, FILED. [2896472] [20-2418, 20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:15 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2896406] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:51 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5185883, FILED.[2896402] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:49 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2896397] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:48 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Andrew M. Cuomo and Letitia James, FILED. [2896387] [20-2414] [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rev. Steven Soos v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Reverend Steven Soos
Represented By: Michael McHale Esq.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Crampton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Reverend Nicholas Stamos
Represented By: Michael McHale Esq.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Crampton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mayer Mayerfeld
Represented By: Michael McHale Esq.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Crampton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elchanan Perr
Represented By: Michael McHale Esq.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Crampton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Daniel Schonbrun
Represented By: Michael McHale Esq.
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferrara Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Crampton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Justin G. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: James R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kevin J. Fritschler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Matt Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Bradley M. Markowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: August N. Santore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jenna M. DiMartile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Bill de Blasio, Mayor of the City of New York, in his official capacity
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, in his official capacity
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York in her official capacity
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kenneth McGuire, Law Offices of Kenneth McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?