Geller v. Cuomo
Defendant / Appellee: Mayor Bill de Blasio, individually and in his official capacity as Mayor, City of New York, New York, Governor Andrew Cuomo, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of New York and Commissioner Dermot Shea, individually and in his official capacity as the Police Commissioner, City of New York, New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Pamela Geller
Case Number: 20-2561
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 104 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, in re: clarifying statement from previous letter, RECEIVED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944131] [20-2561]--[Edited 10/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:09 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 102 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, in re: supplemental letter responding to appellee's letter, RECEIVED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2943716] [20-2561]--[Edited 10/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:43 AM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 100 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, in re: supplemental letter requested by panel, RECEIVED. Service date 10/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2943508] [20-2561]--[Edited 10/01/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:46 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 98 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 61 ], on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 10/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2943212][98] [20-2561] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:59 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 93 REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2940812] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:49 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 90 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, in re: advising Court on availability for argument, RECEIVED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2940208] [20-2561]--[Edited 09/29/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:31 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 85 CURED DEFECTIVE SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION[ # 84 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2935000] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:43 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 84 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 38 ], [ # 65 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 09/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2934988][84] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:30 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 83 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, supplementary papers to motion[82], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2934919] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/21/2020 01:39 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 82 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 65 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 09/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2934492][82] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/18/2020 06:57 PM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 81 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter[80], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2934205] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:30 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 80 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, in re: FRAP28(j) letter, RECEIVED. Service date 09/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2932256] [20-2561]--[Edited 09/16/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:40 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 79 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2930601] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/15/2020 07:09 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 76 ATTORNEY, Zachary S. Shapiro for Dermot Shea Bill de Blasio, in case 20-2561 , [ # 75 ], ADDED.[2924953] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/08/2020 09:45 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2924596] [20-2561] [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:32 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 71 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, in re: advising Court of dates counsel cannot argue the motion, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2921897] [20-2561]--[Edited 09/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/02/2020 09:34 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 69 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, in re: advising Court of dates counsel cannot argue the motion, RECEIVED. Service date 09/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2921770] [20-2561]--[Edited 09/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/01/2020 09:35 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 61 ], [ # 60 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2920477][65] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:13 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 61 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for injunction [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 08/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915561] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:43 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 60 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for injunction [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, FILED. Service date 08/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915548] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:43 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Ingrid Gustafson for Dermot Shea Bill de Blasio, in case 20-2561 , [ # 58 ], ADDED.[2915490] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:58 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, FILED. Service date 08/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915481] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:55 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for Dermot Shea Bill de Blasio, in case 20-2561 , [ # 56 ], ADDED.[2915313] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 03:14 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio and Dermot Shea, FILED. Service date 08/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915268] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/24/2020 02:53 PM]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER, dated 08/13/2020, so-ordering parties' proposed schedule to submit papers on motion for an injunction, FILED.[2907342] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:21 PM]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, dated 08/13/2020, setting appellant's brief and appendix due date as 11/04/2020, FILED.[2907339] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/13/2020 02:19 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 50 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2906976] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:56 AM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 45 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [ # 41 ], [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2906210] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:32 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 44 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, informing Court of proposed due date 11/05/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2905993] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/12/2020 11:31 AM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 41 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [39], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2905124] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:09 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 39 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, requesting a briefing schedule, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2904639] [20-2561]--[Edited 08/11/2020 by HT] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:52 PM]
August 10, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2904616] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:42 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 37 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 08/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2903108] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:53 PM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 36 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 31 ], [ # 34 ], on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED.[2903019] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:30 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Brian David Ginsberg, [ # 34 ], in place of attorney David Lawrence III, SUBSTITUTED.[2903017] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:30 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 08/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2903004] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:20 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 33 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 17 ], [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2902982] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:09 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Robert Joseph Muise for Appellant Pamela Geller, in case 20-2561, [ # 30 ], ADDED.[2902979] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:08 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 31 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [29], on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED.[2902971] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 11:05 AM]
August 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2902924] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/07/2020 10:13 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2902395] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 03:42 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, FORM C, and FORM D, [ # 14 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], [ # 22 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 21 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2902174] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 02:06 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902158] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:58 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [20], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2902116] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:40 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902071] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:15 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902068] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:15 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2902059] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:12 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2901850] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:19 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [12], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2901841] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:15 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2901835] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:11 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 9 ], [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2901827] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:06 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED.[2901813] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:00 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2901794] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 10:53 AM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2901534] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/06/2020 07:31 AM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901465] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 07:12 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901464] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 07:11 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901461] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 07:04 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2901455] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 06:55 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Ashley Rebecca Garman, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney James Edward Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2901310] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 04:17 PM]
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Dermot Shea and Bill de Blasio, FILED. Service date 08/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2901280] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:59 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2901266] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:49 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 08/03/2020, RECEIVED.[2901265] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:49 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20991303, FILED.[2901263] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:48 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pamela Geller, FILED. [2901260] [20-2561] [Entered: 08/05/2020 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Geller v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mayor Bill de Blasio, individually and in his official capacity as Mayor, City of New York, New York
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Ingrid Gustafson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Governor Andrew Cuomo, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of New York
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner Dermot Shea, individually and in his official capacity as the Police Commissioner, City of New York, New York
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Garman Esq.
Represented By: Zachary S. Shapiro Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Ingrid Gustafson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pamela Geller
Represented By: David Eliezer Yerushalmi Esq.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Muise Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?