Sun v. New York City Police Departmen
Defendant: Threadtex Inc. and Scott Richman
Defendant / Appellee: Hugh H. Mo, New York City Police Department, John Doe 1, Asian Police Officer who worked at 25 Precinct in Manhattan at 2:30 A.M. on, The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo, P.C., Administration for Children's Services, of the City of New York and John Doe 2, about 7-8 cops who worked at 25 Precinct NYPD in Manhattan at 2:30 A.M on
Plaintiff / Appellant: Yi Sun
Case Number: 20-2782
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION ORDER, denying request for briefing extension as unnecessary, granting Appellant extension to file filing fee until 11/02/2020 [ # 39 ] filed by Appellant Yi Sun, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2955044][51] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:49 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 47 LETTER, dated 10/13/2020, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, informing the Court of missing payments and missing documents, RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2020 by US mail.[2952582] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:25 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2952569] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:21 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 45 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2952564] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:16 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 44 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/10/2020, RECEIVED.[2952561] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:15 AM]
October 9, 2020 Filing 43 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED.[2952556] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:13 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 42 PAPERS, Amended Notice of Appeal, RECEIVED.[2945264] [20-2782] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:42 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 41 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to extend time, [ # 35 ], [ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED.[2940849] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:08 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by US mail.[2940845] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:05 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 38 PAPERS, Defective Document Notice, and Certificate of Service, RECEIVED.[2940836] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:58 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, Form D-P, Pro se Scheduling Notification, and Motion to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by US mail.[2940825] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/29/2020 01:54 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, [34], on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2936935] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:08 PM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 33 PAPERS, copy of Form D-P, RECEIVED.[2936462] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:58 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE, to Appellee Hugh H. Mo and New York City Police Department , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2935361] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/22/2020 02:18 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 31 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to stay, [26], on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2935273] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/21/2020 05:15 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 26 EMERGENCY MOTION, for temporary stay pending appeal pending consideration of a motion, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/18/2020 by US mail.[2934810] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/21/2020 12:12 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. No Service.[2936930] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/23/2020 01:06 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 25 PAPERS, Copy of Acknowledgment and notice of appearance form, RECEIVED.[2932689] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/17/2020 06:30 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Appellant is GRANTED an extension of time to October 13, 2020 to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The request for an extension of time to file the brief is DENIED as unnecessary as there is no briefing schedule in place. Appellants request to amend the district courts opinion and order will be determined by a three-judge panel in the ordinary course [ # 18 ] copy to pro se, FILED. [2931484][24] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:13 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2930791] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:42 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2930788] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:41 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED.[2930786] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:39 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION, to extend time, for add, amend, correct findings of facts in memorandum opinion and order, relief, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by US mail.[2930773] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:34 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, informing Court of proposed due date 11/25/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 09/08/2020 by US mail.[2930754] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:29 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by US mail.[2930736] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:24 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Yi Sun, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by US mail.[2930722] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:20 AM]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dated 09/08/2020, dismissing appeal by 09/29/2020 unless Appellant Yi Sun submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2924844] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:36 AM]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 09/08/2020, dismissing appeal by 09/29/2020 unless Appellant Yi Sun submits fee or moves for informa pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2924843] [20-2782] [Entered: 09/08/2020 05:30 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, James Edward Johnson, for John Doe 1 and John Doe 2, TERMINATED.[2920146] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/31/2020 11:14 AM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Administration for Children's Services and New York City Police Department, informing the Court that The New York City Law Department respectfully requests that this office no longer be identified as counsel for defendants-appellees John Doe 1 and John Doe 2, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2920084] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/31/2020 10:31 AM]
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Jonathan A. Popolow, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2919395] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:22 PM]
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Administration for Children's Services and New York City Police Department, FILED. Service date 08/28/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2919391] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:18 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2914608] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/24/2020 07:08 AM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2914607] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/24/2020 07:06 AM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/06/2020, RECEIVED.[2914604] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/24/2020 07:01 AM]
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yi Sun, FILED. [2914603] [20-2782] [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sun v. New York City Police Departmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hugh H. Mo
Represented By: Pedro Medina Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Police Department
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 1, Asian Police Officer who worked at 25 Precinct in Manhattan at 2:30 A.M. on
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Law Firm of Hugh H. Mo, P.C.
Represented By: Pedro Medina Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Administration for Children's Services, of the City of New York
Represented By: Jonathan A. Popolow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 2, about 7-8 cops who worked at 25 Precinct NYPD in Manhattan at 2:30 A.M on
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Threadtex Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Yi Sun
Represented By: Yi Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?