Schroeder v. Department of Veteran Affairs
Defendant / Appellee: United States of America and Department of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff / Appellant: Paul S. Schroeder
Case Number: 20-2963
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2929508] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/11/2020 07:53 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Danielle J. Levine for United States of America, in case 20-2963, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2925221] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:57 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America and Department of Veteran Affairs, FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2925192] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:45 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2922467] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:28 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2922458] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:25 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/12/2020, RECEIVED.[2922454] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:24 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 08/11/2020, RECEIVED.[2922451] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/02/2020 03:23 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Paul S. Schroeder, FILED. [2922409] [20-2963] [Entered: 09/02/2020 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Schroeder v. Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Danielle J. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Department of Veteran Affairs
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paul S. Schroeder
Represented By: Paul S. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?