Martinez Roman v. Decker
Petitioner / Appellant: Marco Martinez Roman
Respondent / Appellee: Attorney General William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, Director Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement and Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 20-3004
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Joshua Kahane for Chad F. Wolf William P. Barr Thomas Decker, in case 20-3004 , [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2948333] [20-3004] [Entered: 10/08/2020 03:34 PM]
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2948114] [20-3004] [Entered: 10/08/2020 01:36 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Marco Martinez Roman Brief due date as 12/14/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 12/14/2020, FILED.[2938962] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:16 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, informing Court of proposed due date 12/14/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2938943] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:06 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jessica Mckenzie, ASSIGNED.[2938496] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/25/2020 10:45 AM]
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2935947] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/22/2020 12:50 PM]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 09/22/2020, dismissing appeal by 10/06/2020 unless Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2935656] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:35 AM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 7 ], [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED.[2933617] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:21 AM]
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED. Service date 09/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2933571] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:45 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [6], on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED.[2930663] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:52 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930540] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:40 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED. Service date 09/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2930513] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:39 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2929510] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/11/2020 07:56 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2924006] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:22 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2924002] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:20 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marco Martinez Roman, FILED. [2923995] [20-3004] [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Martinez Roman v. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Marco Martinez Roman
Represented By: Suchita Deolalikar Mathur Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Attorney General William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Director Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joshua Kahane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?