Marano v. The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Defendant / Appellee: The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lawrence Marano
Case Number: 20-3104
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 86 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 10/04/2021, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 21-6, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[3186576] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/05/2021 09:52 AM]
July 7, 2021 Filing 85 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 07/06/2021, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 21-6, RECEIVED.[3133119] [20-3104] [Entered: 07/07/2021 03:29 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 84 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 05/05/2021, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[3093898] [20-3104] [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:53 AM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 83 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED.[3093887] [20-3104] [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:51 AM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 81 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3084896] [20-3104] [Entered: 04/23/2021 11:45 AM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 79 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3079392] [20-3104] [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:27 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 77 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming judgment of the district court, by JMW, WJN, J. SINATRA Jr., FILED.[3068984] [20-3104] [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:28 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 76 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[3068973] [20-3104] [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:23 AM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 74 CASE, before WJN, JMW, J. SINATRA, HEARD.[3060817] [20-3104] [Entered: 03/22/2021 10:54 AM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 03/04/2021 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3049366] [20-3104] [Entered: 03/04/2021 06:43 PM]
March 4, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 03/04/2021 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3048829] [20-3104] [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:01 AM]
March 1, 2021 Filing 71 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3046219] [20-3104] [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:46 AM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 70 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/22/2021, SET.[3025288] [20-3104] [Entered: 01/29/2021 09:45 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 67 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/22/2021, PROPOSED.[3009835] [20-3104] [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:16 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 65 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. James H. Freeman, Esq. for Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF. [3008739] [20-3104] [Entered: 01/07/2021 04:27 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 12/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [3000574] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/23/2020 11:53 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix [ # 57 ] filed by Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. [2999789][62] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:12 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 58 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Linda Jane Steinman, Esq. for Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2999485] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/22/2020 05:52 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2999483] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/22/2020 05:49 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2989695] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:44 AM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 51 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2989680] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:40 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 50 ATTORNEYS, Abigail Everdell, James E. Doherty for The Metropolitan Museum of Art, in case 20-3104 , [ # 49 ], [ # 48 ], ADDED.[2986867] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/04/2020 01:14 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2986794] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:26 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2986759] [20-3104] [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:09 PM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 40 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF[ # 39 ], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED.[2971916] [20-3104] [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:16 PM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 39 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 11/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2971181] [20-3104] [Entered: 11/09/2020 08:57 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 37 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief[35], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED.[2968273] [20-3104] [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:12 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 36 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-120), on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2968161] [20-3104] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:53 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 35 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2968159] [20-3104] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:46 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 32 CURED DEFECTIVE CORRECTED FORM C[ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED.[2956817] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:58 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 31 CORRECTED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 10/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2956630] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/20/2020 07:27 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 30 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, form C[29], on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED.[2951346] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/14/2020 08:42 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2951126] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/13/2020 06:25 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file corrected Form C within 3 days of the date of this order [ # 25 ] filed by Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. [2950864][28] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:39 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION, to amend document, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 10/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2949862] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/12/2020 08:23 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 24 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 10/30/2020, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2942355] [20-3104] [Entered: 10/01/2020 09:16 AM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/04/2020, appellee's brief due date as 12/09/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2942037] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:49 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2942032] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:47 PM]
September 29, 2020 Filing 15 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 09/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2940461] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:40 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2940261] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:14 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2939946] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:40 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 09/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2939806] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/28/2020 01:19 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Linda Steinman, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Jim Doherty, SUBSTITUTED.[2939351] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:04 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, James H. Freeman, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Richard P. Liebowitz, SUBSTITUTED.[2939349] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:02 AM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Metropolitan Museum of Art, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2938861] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:25 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. Service date 09/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2938855] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:18 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2931025] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:24 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, district court receipt # ANYSDC-21640402, FILED.[2931021] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:23 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2931020] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:23 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2931016] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:21 AM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lawrence Marano, FILED. [2931004] [20-3104] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marano v. The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Represented By: James E. Doherty Esq.
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman Esq.
Represented By: Abigail Everdell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lawrence Marano
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz Esq.
Represented By: James H. Freeman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?