Community Housing Improvement v. City of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Vermyck LLC, Cindy Realty LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Community Housing Improvement Program and Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Cecilia Joza, J. Scott Walsh, Sheila Garcia, David Reiss, Patti Stone, Rent Guidelines Board, German Tejeda, May Yu, City of New York, Alex Schwarz, Leah Goodridge and RuthAnne Visnauskas
Intervenor: Community Voices Heard (CVH), Coalition for the Homeless and N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Case Number: 20-3366
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Sophie Lipman for Coalition for the Homeless N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) Community Voices Heard (CVH), in case 20-3366 , [ # 62 ], ADDED.[2981600] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:07 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 64 ATTORNEY, Babak Ghafarzade for Coalition for the Homeless N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) Community Voices Heard (CVH), in case 20-3366 , [ # 61 ], ADDED.[2981598] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:03 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 63 ATTORNEY, Michael Duke for Coalition for the Homeless N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) Community Voices Heard (CVH), in case 20-3366 , [ # 60 ], ADDED.[2981597] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:02 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) and Coalition for the Homeless, FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979809] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:47 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) and Coalition for the Homeless, FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979795] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:43 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Community Voices Heard (CVH), N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N) and Coalition for the Homeless, FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979778] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:37 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 59 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC Brief due date as 01/15/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/15/2021, FILED.[2972967] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/12/2020 01:36 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 58 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION [ # 56 ], on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2972965] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/12/2020 01:33 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 57 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 01/15/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 11/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2970113] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/06/2020 06:13 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 56 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [52], on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2969997] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:55 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Robert William Hamburg for Community Housing Improvement Program M&G Mycak LLC Danielle Realty LLC Mycak Associates LLC Forest Realty, LLC Vermyck LLC Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. Constance Nugent-Miller Cindy Realty LLC, in case 20-3366 , [ # 51 ], ADDED.[2969983] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:47 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Timothy S. Bishop for Community Housing Improvement Program M&G Mycak LLC Danielle Realty LLC Mycak Associates LLC Forest Realty, LLC Vermyck LLC Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. Constance Nugent-Miller Cindy Realty LLC, in case 20-3366 , [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2969978] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:42 PM]
November 6, 2020 Filing 52 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 11/06/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 11/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2969774] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:53 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED. Service date 11/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2966059] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/02/2020 06:54 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED. Service date 11/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2966041] [20-3366] [Entered: 11/02/2020 06:10 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for the removal of this matter from the Courts Expedited Calendar [ # 44 ] filed by Appellee RuthAnne Visnauskas. Appellants must file a scheduling notification letter within 7 days of the date of this order by RKW, FILED. [2964768][48] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:34 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2959254] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:24 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 41 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/25/2020, appellee's brief due date as 12/30/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2957173] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:50 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 40 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2956346] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/20/2020 03:20 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 36 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2955511] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:18 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Intervenor Coalition for the Homeless, Community Voices Heard (CVH) and N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N), FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2955434] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:31 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 33 CAPTION, N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N), Community Voices Heard (CVH) and Coalition for the Homeless were added as Intervenors, AMENDED.[2955359] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:58 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh and May Yu, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2955254] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:55 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2954817] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:51 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 27 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Community Housing Improvement Program, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Constance Nugent-Miller, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Cindy Realty LLC, Danielle Realty LLC and Forest Realty, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954811] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:45 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 26 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2954805] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:44 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Community Housing Improvement Program, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Constance Nugent-Miller, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Cindy Realty LLC, Danielle Realty LLC and Forest Realty, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954801] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:41 AM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [21], on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2954568] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/17/2020 02:00 PM]
October 17, 2020 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [20], on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED.[2954567] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/17/2020 01:52 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954539] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/16/2020 08:54 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954536] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/16/2020 08:47 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Community Housing Improvement Program, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc., Constance Nugent-Miller, Mycak Associates LLC, Vermyck LLC, Cindy Realty LLC, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC and M&G Mycak LLC, FILED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954534] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/16/2020 08:38 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Claude S. Platton for City of New York, Leah Goodridge, May Yu, Alex Schwarz, J. Scott Walsh, Sheila Garcia, Cecilia Joza, Patti Stone, Rent Guidelines Board, German Tejeda and David Reiss, in case 20-3366, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2951267] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:45 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Richard Paul Dearing for City of New York, Leah Goodridge, May Yu, Alex Schwarzm J. Scott Walsh, Sheila Garcia, Cecilia Joza, Patti Stone, Rent Guidelines Board, German Tejeda and David Reiss, in case 20-3366, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2951266] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:43 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Rent Guidelines Board, David Reiss, Cecilia Joza, Alex Schwarz, German Tejeda, May Yu, Patti Stone, J. Scott Walsh, Leah Goodridge and Sheila Garcia, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2950717] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:42 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Rent Guidelines Board, David Reiss, Cecilia Joza, Alex Schwarz, German Tejeda, May Yu, Patti Stone, J. Scott Walsh, Leah Goodridge and Sheila Garcia, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2950705] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:39 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellees City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh and May Yu, FILED.[2950313] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:15 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Jesse A. Townsend, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2950304] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:11 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh and May Yu, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2950298] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:07 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [10], on behalf of Appellees City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh and May Yu, FILED.[2950248] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:46 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, Sheila Garcia, Leah Goodridge, Cecilia Joza, David Reiss, Rent Guidelines Board, Alex Schwarz, Patti Stone, German Tejeda, J. Scott Walsh and May Yu, FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2950196] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:24 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2945641] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:04 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Ester Murdukhayeva, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2945086] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 12:01 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 10/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2945066] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:52 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-13460607, FILED.[2944621] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:13 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2944620] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:12 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 09/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2944619] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:11 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Cindy Realty LLC, Community Housing Improvement Program, Danielle Realty LLC, Forest Realty, LLC, M&G Mycak LLC, Mycak Associates LLC, Constance Nugent-Miller, Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc. and Vermyck LLC, FILED. [2944618] [20-3366] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Community Housing Improvement v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Vermyck LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cindy Realty LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mycak Associates LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M&G Mycak LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Forest Realty, LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Danielle Realty LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Constance Nugent-Miller
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Community Housing Improvement Program
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Rent Stabilization Association of N.Y.C., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus Esq.
Represented By: Robert William Hamburg Esq.
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cecilia Joza
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Scott Walsh
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sheila Garcia
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Reiss
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patti Stone
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rent Guidelines Board
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: German Tejeda
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: May Yu
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex Schwarz
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leah Goodridge
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Claude S. Platton
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Represented By: Jesse A. Townsend Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RuthAnne Visnauskas
Represented By: Ester Murdukhayeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Community Voices Heard (CVH)
Represented By: Sophie Lipman Esq.
Represented By: Michael Duke Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: Babak Ghafarzade Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Coalition for the Homeless
Represented By: Sophie Lipman Esq.
Represented By: Michael Duke Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: Babak Ghafarzade Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: N.Y. Tenants and Neighbors (T&N)
Represented By: Sophie Lipman Esq.
Represented By: Michael Duke Esq.
Represented By: Caitlin Joan Halligan Esq.
Represented By: Babak Ghafarzade Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?