Doe v. Decker
Petitioner: John Doe
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Director of the New York Field Office of U.S. Immigrations & Customs Enforcement and William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 20-3449
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf Brief due date as 01/19/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/19/2021, FILED.[2966295] [20-3449] [Entered: 11/03/2020 10:17 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jessica Mckenzie, ASSIGNED.[2966280] [20-3449] [Entered: 11/03/2020 10:13 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, informing Court of proposed due date 01/19/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 11/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2965585] [20-3449] [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:20 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 11/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2965577] [20-3449] [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:16 PM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 11/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2965569] [20-3449] [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:15 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Melissa A. Childs for Chad F. Wolf, William P. Barr and Thomas Decker, in case 20-3449, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2961920] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/28/2020 12:45 AM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 10/27/2020 by CM/ECF. [2961831] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/27/2020 05:25 PM]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 10/26/2020, dismissing appeal by 11/09/2020, unless Apppellants Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf and William P. Bar, submit Form D, FILED.[2960273] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:58 PM]
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, dated 10/26/2020, dismissing appeal by 11/09/2020, unless Appellants Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf and WIlliam P. Barr, submit Form C, FILED.[2960268] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:54 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Zoey Jones for John Doe, in case 20-3449, [ # 5 ], ADDED.[2959018] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/23/2020 12:17 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John Doe, FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2959006] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/23/2020 12:05 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 10/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958636] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/22/2020 06:58 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2948020] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/08/2020 12:33 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Thomas Decker, Chad F. Wolf and William P. Barr, FILED. [2948015] [20-3449] [Entered: 10/08/2020 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Doe v. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Melissa A. Childs Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Director of the New York Field Office of U.S. Immigrations & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Melissa A. Childs Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Melissa A. Childs Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Doe
Represented By: Bridget P. Kessler Esq.
Represented By: Zoey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?