Brady v. Friedlander
Defendant / Appellee: Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Esq., The Law Firm of Mark S. Friedlander, Keith R.M. Roussel, Esq., Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP and Mark S. Friedlander, Esq.
Plaintiff / Appellant: James H. Brady
Case Number: 20-3715
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2982027] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:19 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 11/25/2020, determining the appeal docketed under 20-3715 only, to SDNY, copy to pro se Appellant, ISSUED.[Mandate][2982025] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:18 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 23 APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 11/25/2020, WITHDRAWN.[2982020] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:17 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal docketed under 20-3715 [ # 2981531-2 ] filed by Appellant James H. Brady. The lead appeal docketed under 20-3515 will proceed in the ordinary course, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED. [2982016][22] [20-3715, 20-3515] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:13 PM]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 11/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 12/08/2020, unless Appellant James H. Brady, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2976233] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/17/2020 01:24 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED.[2968706] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:45 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by US mail.[2968086] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:22 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Joseph Salvo for Kenneth Andrew McLellan Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP Keith R.M. Roussel, in case 20-3715, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2968050] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:39 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED.[2968042] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:35 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by US mail. [2967824] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:20 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [12], on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED.[2967605] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 12:06 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Keith R.M. Roussel and Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2967581] [20-3715] [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:53 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to withdraw appeal, [10], on behalf of Appellant James H. Brady, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2964930] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:29 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mark S. Friedlander and The Law Firm of Mark S. Friedlander, FILED. Service date 10/30/2020 by US mail.[2964754] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:25 PM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2964619] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:15 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant James H. Brady, FILED. No service.[2964921] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:26 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3515, containing complete set of docket entries.[2964840] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 03:59 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2964613] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:12 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2964600] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 02:05 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James H. Brady, FILED. [2964591] [20-3715] [Entered: 10/30/2020 01:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brady v. Friedlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth Andrew McLellan, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Salvo Esq.
Represented By: John Tyler Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Law Firm of Mark S. Friedlander
Represented By: William L. Schleifer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith R.M. Roussel, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Salvo Esq.
Represented By: John Tyler Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Winget, Spadafora, Schwartz, LLP
Represented By: Joseph Salvo Esq.
Represented By: John Tyler Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark S. Friedlander, Esq.
Represented By: William L. Schleifer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James H. Brady
Represented By: James H. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?