Taylor v. Jepsen
Defendant: George Jepsen, Attorney General; official and individual capacities, Melendez, FOIA Liason; official and individual capacities, Joan Alexander, The Honorable; official and individual capacities, Steven R. Strom, official and individual capacities and Steven Storm, Asst. Atty. General; official and individual capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: Derrick Taylor
Defendant / Appellee: Rikel Lightner, HSA; official and individual capacities, Naqvi, Doctor; official and individual capacities and Coleman, Doctor; official and individual capacities
Case Number: 20-3833
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2989477] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/09/2020 08:58 AM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellee Coleman, Rikel Lightner and Naqvi, FILED.[2988383] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/07/2020 09:29 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Coleman, Rikel Lightner and Naqvi, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2987798] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/07/2020 11:51 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [11], on behalf of Appellee Coleman, Rikel Lightner and Naqvi, FILED.[2986796] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:27 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Coleman, Rikel Lightner and Naqvi, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2986726] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:46 AM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE, to Appellee Coleman, Rikel Lightner and Naqvi , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2986560] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/04/2020 10:03 AM]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 12/04/2020, dismissing appeal by 12/28/2020, unless Appellant Derrick Taylor, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2986548] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:58 AM]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 12/04/2020, dismissing appeal by 12/28/2020, unless Appellant Derrick Taylor, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2986530] [20-3833] [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:50 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2973860] [20-3833] [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:20 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2973854] [20-3833] [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:17 AM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2973845] [20-3833] [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:12 AM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/31/2020, RECEIVED.[2973821] [20-3833] [Entered: 11/13/2020 11:01 AM]
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Derrick Taylor, FILED. [2973806] [20-3833] [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Taylor v. Jepsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Jepsen, Attorney General; official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melendez, FOIA Liason; official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Alexander, The Honorable; official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Strom, official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Storm, Asst. Atty. General; official and individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Derrick Taylor
Represented By: Derrick Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rikel Lightner, HSA; official and individual capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Naqvi, Doctor; official and individual capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Coleman, Doctor; official and individual capacities
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?