In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd.
Defendant / Appellee: Clifford J. White, III, in his capacity as Director of the United States Trustee Program, The United States Trustee Program, William K. Harrington, in his official capacity as United States Trustee for Region 2 and Clifford J. White, III, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Trustee Program
Plaintiff / Appellant: MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator
Case Number: 20-3863
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 01/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3014110] [20-3863] [Entered: 01/14/2021 06:04 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Peter Aronoff for Clifford J. White III The United States Trustee Program William K. Harrington, in case 20-3863, [ # 28 ], ADDED.[3009673] [20-3863] [Entered: 01/08/2021 02:40 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee William K. Harrington, The United States Trustee Program and Clifford J. White, III, FILED. Service date 01/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3009184] [20-3863] [Entered: 01/08/2021 10:19 AM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to have appeals 20-3863 and 20-3867 heard in tandem, have oversized briefing, and have opening brief filed on or before January 21, 2021, [ # 23 ] filed by Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., by SJM, FILED. [2996855][27] [20-3863] [Entered: 12/18/2020 02:39 PM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2993398] [20-3863] [Entered: 12/14/2020 04:54 PM]
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 NEW CASE MANAGER, Sarah Jean-Charles, ASSIGNED.[2985953] [20-3863] [Entered: 12/03/2020 02:23 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2983462] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/30/2020 05:22 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2983461] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/30/2020 05:20 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2982545] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:27 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., district court receipt # 51585, FILED.[2982544] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/25/2020 08:27 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee William K. Harrington, The United States Trustee Program and Clifford J. White, III, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981017] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/24/2020 01:24 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Jane Rue Wittstein for MF Global Holdings Ltd., in case 20-3863, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2980129] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:55 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Bruce S. Bennett for MF Global Holdings Ltd., in case 20-3863, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2980128] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:54 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2980112] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:42 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2980108] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/23/2020 01:39 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2978335] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/19/2020 03:34 PM]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, directing appeal, 20-3867, to be heard in tandem, FILED.[2975747] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:22 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION, dated 06/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2975741] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:13 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/16/2020, RECEIVED.[2975740] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:11 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2975738] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:10 AM]
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant MF Global Holdings Ltd., FILED. [2975449] [20-3863] [Entered: 11/16/2020 04:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: MF Global Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clifford J. White, III, in his capacity as Director of the United States Trustee Program
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The United States Trustee Program
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Peter Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William K. Harrington, in his official capacity as United States Trustee for Region 2
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Peter Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clifford J. White, III, in his official capacity as Director of the United States Trustee Program
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Peter Aronoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MF Global Holdings Ltd., as Plan Administrator
Represented By: Christopher DiPompeo Esq.
Represented By: Bruce S. Bennett Esq.
Represented By: Jane Rue Wittstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?