Jane Doe v. Zucker
Plaintiff: Jane Goe, Sr.
Defendant: L. Oliver Robinson, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Shenendehowa Central School District, Shenendehowa Central School District, Andrew Hills, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Arongen Elementary School, Shenendehowa Central School District and Sean Gnat, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Koda Middle School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Defendant / Appellee: Penfield Central School District, Lorri Whiteman, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Elementary School, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Coxsackie-Athens School District, BR. David Migliorino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, St. Anthony's High School, South Huntington School District, South Huntington School District, Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Health for the State of New York, Dr. Thomas Putman, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Penfield Central School District, Albany City School District, David P. Bernando, Dr., acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, South Huntington School District, Three Village Central School District, Susan Eschbach, acting in her official capcity as Principal, Beverly J. Martin Elementary School, Ithaca City School District, Lansing Central School District, Christine Rebera, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Middle School, Lansing Central School District, Michael Paolino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, William S. Hackett Middle School, Albany City School District; and all others similarly situated, Chris Pettograsso, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Lansing Central School District, Corinne Keane, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Paul J. Gelinas Jr. High School, Three Village Central School District, Cheryl Pedisich, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Three Village Central School District, DR. Luvelle Brown, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Ithaca City School District, Kaweeda G. Adams, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Albany City School District, Ithaca City School District, Coxsackie-Athens School District, Randall Squier, Superintendent, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Coxsackie-Athens School District, M.D. Elizabeth Rausch-Phung, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Immunizations at the New York State Department of Health and New York State Department of Health
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jane Doe, on behalf of herself and her minor child, Jane Joe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child, John Coe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor children, Jane Boe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child, Jane Coe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor children, Childrens Health Defense, and all others similarly situated, Jane Loe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child and John Foe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor child
Case Number: 20-3915
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 67 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3007979] [20-3915] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:07 AM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 01/06/2021, to NDNY (SYRACUSE), ISSUED.[3006936] [20-3915] [Entered: 01/06/2021 07:46 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for injunction [ # 21 ] filed by Appellant Jane Joe, Jane Doe, Jane Boe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Coe, Sr., John Foe, Sr., Jane Loe and Childrens Health Defense, by GC, RR, DC, FILED. [3006660][63] [20-3915] [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:21 PM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 61 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2999503] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/22/2020 06:27 PM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 43 ], [ # 39 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 12/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2992335][55] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:26 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Meishin Riccardulli for David Migliorino, in case 20-3915, [ # 47 ], ADDED.[2988925] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:49 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 48 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 41 ], [ # 46 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED.[2988916] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:46 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988907] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:42 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 46 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988861] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/08/2020 12:54 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 43 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for injunction [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988317] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/07/2020 06:21 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2987326] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 07:26 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 41 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM C, [35], on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED.[2987278] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:26 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 39 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bernando, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District and Three Village Central School District, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987241] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 04:52 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 38 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellee New York State Department of Health, Elizabeth Rausch-Phung and Howard Zucker, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987138] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 03:56 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Michael H. Sussman for John Coe Sr. John Foe Sr. Jane Coe Sr. Jane Loe Jane Joe Jane Boe Sr. Childrens Health Defense Jane Doe, in case 20-3915, [ # 34 ], ADDED.[2986860] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 01:11 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 36 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986848] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 01:00 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 35 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2986847] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:59 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe, Jane Loe and Jane Boe, Sr., FILED. Service date 12/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2986843] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/04/2020 12:58 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Gregg Tyler Johnson for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District David P. Bernando South Huntington School District, in case 20-3915, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2985304] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:14 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bernando, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District and Three Village Central School District, FILED. Service date 12/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2984296] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:23 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, April Laws for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District David P. Bernando South Huntington School District, in case 20-3915 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[2983872] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:50 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Loraine Clare Jelinek for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District David P. Bernando South Huntington School District, in case 20-3915 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2983871] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/01/2020 11:47 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bernando, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District and Three Village Central School District, FILED. Service date 12/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2983705] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:37 AM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District, Three Village Central School District and David P. Bernando, FILED. Service date 12/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2983696] [20-3915] [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:33 AM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 25 ], [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, FILED.[2982881] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/30/2020 11:00 AM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, FILED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2982871] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:52 AM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [24], on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, FILED.[2982839] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:27 AM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Randall Squier, Freya Mercer, Lansing Central School District, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera and Lorri Whiteman, FILED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2982794] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/30/2020 09:57 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, for injunction [ # 19 ], [ # 21 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED.[2982173] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:47 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2982162] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:43 PM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 15 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED.[2981850] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:53 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for injunction, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED.[2981846] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:48 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 11/25/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981821] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:30 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2981453] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/24/2020 05:24 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Albany City School District, Kaweeda G. Adams, Michael Paolino, Ithaca City School District, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, South Huntington School District, David P. Bernando, Three Village Central School District, Cheryl Pedisich and Corinne Keane, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981019] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/24/2020 01:25 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [14], on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED.[2980875] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:50 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2980825] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:15 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Sujata Sidhu Gibson for John Coe Sr. John Foe Sr. Jane Coe Sr. Jane Loe Jane Joe Jane Boe Sr. Childrens Health Defense Jane Doe, in case 20-3915 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2979857] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:14 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Philip C. Semprevivo, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Meishin Riccardulli, SUBSTITUTED.[2979851] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:11 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Beezly J. Kiernan, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2979841] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/23/2020 11:05 AM]
November 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe, Jane Loe and Jane Goe, Sr., FILED. Service date 11/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979566] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/21/2020 12:32 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979394] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 05:32 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York State Department of Health, Elizabeth Rausch-Phung and Howard Zucker, FILED. Service date 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979217] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:31 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Meishin Riccardulli, Esq. for Appellee David Migliorino, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2979035] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:55 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2979032] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:53 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5316654, FILED.[2979031] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:52 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/22/2020, RECEIVED.[2979029] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:50 PM]
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. [2979024] [20-3915] [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Penfield Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorri Whiteman, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Elementary School, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Freya Mercer, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BR. David Migliorino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, St. Anthony's High School, South Huntington School District
Represented By: Philip Semprevivo Esq.
Represented By: Meishin Riccardulli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: South Huntington School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Health for the State of New York
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Thomas Putman, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Penfield Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Albany City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David P. Bernando, Dr., acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, South Huntington School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Eschbach, acting in her official capcity as Principal, Beverly J. Martin Elementary School, Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christine Rebera, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Middle School, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Paolino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, William S. Hackett Middle School, Albany City School District; and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Pettograsso, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Corinne Keane, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Paul J. Gelinas Jr. High School, Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheryl Pedisich, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. Luvelle Brown, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kaweeda G. Adams, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Albany City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Randall Squier, Superintendent, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M.D. Elizabeth Rausch-Phung, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Immunizations at the New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Oliver Robinson, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hills, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Arongen Elementary School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Gnat, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Koda Middle School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Doe, on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Joe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Coe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor children
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Boe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Coe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor children
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Childrens Health Defense, and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Loe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Foe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Goe, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?