Robinson v. US Dept. Justice US DEA
Defendant: John Doe 1-10, Police Officers/State Troopers sued in ficticious capacities and names as their identities are unkown and as Police Officers/State Troopers and individually, Saratoga County Sheriff Michael Zurlo, Saratoga County Sheriff's Office, Saratoga County District Attorney's Office, Sergeant Keith Clinton, New York State Trooper, United States Marshals Service, Saratoga County District Attorney Karen Heggen and Their Officers, Agents, and Employees
Plaintiff / Appellant: Keisha Robinson, on behalf of K.F., a minor and Keisha Robinson, for herself
Defendant / Appellee: Office of the United States Attorney, United States Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Agency and New York State Police
Case Number: 20-3956
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 21 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3008463] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:12 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York State Police, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3008268] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:31 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to hold appeal in abeyance, [19], on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, FILED.[3008087] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 11:00 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, FILED. Service date No Service by US mail.[3008078] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:57 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER, dated No Date, on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, outlining the jurisdiction and federal statute, RECEIVED. Service date No Service by US mail.[3008074] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:56 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER, dated 01/04/2021, on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, informing the court that all documents be mailed to 348 South 9th Avenue, Mount Vernon, NY 10550, RECEIVED. Service date No Service by US mail.[3008071] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:53 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Apearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, FILED.[3008057] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:43 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Keisha Robinson, FILED. Service date 01/07/2020 by US mail.[3007993] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:15 AM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Office of the United States Attorney and United States Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Agency, FILED. Service date 01/06/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3007776] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:54 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE, to Appellee New York State Police, Office of the United States Attorney and United States Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Agency , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3006852] [20-3956] [Entered: 01/05/2021 05:45 PM]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 12/15/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/05/2021 unless Appellant Keisha Robinson submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2993821] [20-3956] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:58 AM]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 12/15/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/05/2021 unless Appellant Keisha Robinson submits Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2993809] [20-3956] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:55 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, district court receipt # 465401270416, FILED.[2984790] [20-3956] [Entered: 12/02/2020 11:44 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2982015] [20-3956] [Entered: 11/25/2020 12:13 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2981979] [20-3956] [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:52 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2981977] [20-3956] [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:51 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Keisha Robinson and Keisha Robinson, FILED. [2981970] [20-3956] [Entered: 11/25/2020 11:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Robinson v. US Dept. Justice US DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10, Police Officers/State Troopers sued in ficticious capacities and names as their identities are unkown and as Police Officers/State Troopers and individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga County Sheriff Michael Zurlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Keith Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Trooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshals Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga County District Attorney Karen Heggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Their Officers, Agents, and Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Keisha Robinson, on behalf of K.F., a minor
Represented By: Keisha Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Keisha Robinson, for herself
Represented By: Keisha Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Office of the United States Attorney
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Agency
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Police
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?