Martinez Roman v. Decker
Petitioner: Marco Antonio Martinez Roman
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement and William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 20-3974
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION ORDER, granting Government's motion to hold appeal in abeyance pending final decision in Velasco Lopez v. Decker, 19-2284, [ # 11 ], filed by Appellants Chad F. Wolf, Thomas Decker and William P. Barr, FILED. [2992036][15] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/11/2020 11:34 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Marco Antonio Martinez Roman, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988767] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/08/2020 11:54 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Decker, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2988645] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/08/2020 10:36 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Decker, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988640] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/08/2020 10:31 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Decker, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2988639] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/08/2020 10:31 AM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Brandon Matthew Waterman for Chad F. Wolf, William P. Barr and Thomas Decker, in case 20-3974, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2987832] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:16 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Decker, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 12/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2987827] [20-3974] [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:13 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. Service date 11/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2983289] [20-3974] [Entered: 11/30/2020 03:32 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2982568] [20-3974] [Entered: 11/26/2020 02:42 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/25/2020, RECEIVED.[2982566] [20-3974] [Entered: 11/26/2020 02:41 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/25/2020, RECEIVED.[2982565] [20-3974] [Entered: 11/26/2020 02:39 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants William P. Barr, Thomas Decker and Chad F. Wolf, FILED. [2982564] [20-3974] [Entered: 11/26/2020 02:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Martinez Roman v. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Decker, in his official capacity as Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr, in his official capacity as Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Antonio Martinez Roman
Represented By: Zoe Levine Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?