J.T. v. de Blasio
Plaintiff: J.T., individually and on behalf of D.T. and all others similarly situated
Defendant: Warner Unified School District, Cobb County School District, Fulton County School District, Minnesota State Department of Education, Washington State School for the Deaf, Solana Beach Elementary School District, McCabe Union School District, Atlanta Independent School System, Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District, Town of Plymouth and Plymouth Board of Education, Certain School Districts Located in the State of Virginia, Lakeside Joint School District, Jamul-Dulzura Union School District, Pennsylvania Department of Education, Washington State School for the Blind, San Pasqual Union Elementary School District, Town of Stratford Board of Education, Town of Groton and Groton Board of Education, Julian Union School District, Town of Clinton and Clinton Board of Education, City of Bridgeport Board of Education, West Orange Public Schools, Seymour Board of Education, Town of Wallingford and Wallingford Board of Education, Spencer Valley Elementary School District, Bonsall Union School District, Chula Vista Elementary School District, Rancho Santa Fe Elementary School District, San Pasqual Valley Unified School District, Martha's Vineyard High School, Cherry Hill Public Schools, Pomfret CT School District, Austin Indepenent School District, Pentucket Regional High School, Del Mar Union School District, Dehesa School District, Omaha Public School District, San Dieguito Union High School District, Julian Union High School District, Borrego Springs Unified School District, Vallecitos Elementary School District, State of Washington, South Carolina Department of Education, Clayton County Public Schools, Grossmont Union High School District, Marietta City Schools, City of Norwalk Board of Education, Certain School Districts Located in the State of California, Town of Watertown and Watertown Board of Education, La MesaSpring Valley School District, Connecticut Regional School District No. 10 (Harwinton & Burlington), Ramona Unified School District, Coronado Unified School District, Escondido Union High School District, Carlsbad Unified School District, City of Bristol School District, Cardiff Elementary School District, Town of Branford School District, Middletown Township Public Schools, Mountain Empire Unified School District, Alpine Union School District, San Diego County Office of Education, City of Stamford Board of Education, Sweetwater Union High School District, Santee School District, DeKalb County School District, Town of Windham and Windham Board of Education, Readington Township Public Schools, Lemon Grove School District, San Marcos Unified School District, Town of Plainville and Plainville Board of Education, Fallbrook High School Union District, Fallbrook Union Elementary School District, Encinitas Union School District and Escondido Union Elementary School District
Defendant / Appellee: Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of New York City, School Districts in the United States, New York City Department of Education, State Departments of Education in the United States, Richard Carranza, in his official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education and La Mesa-Spring Valley School District
Plaintiff / Appellant: C.N., individually and on behalf of V.N. and all others similarly situated, J.J., indivudally and on behalf of Z.J. and all others similarly situated and K.M., individually and on behalf of M.M. and S.M., and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 20-4128
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 128 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M. Brief due date as 03/30/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 03/30/2021, FILED.[3029775] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/04/2021 11:22 AM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 125 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., informing Court of proposed due date 03/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 02/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3029321] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:57 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 123 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[3028737] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:34 AM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 122 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Certain School Districts Located in the State of California, Certain School Districts Located in the State of Virginia, Cherry Hill Public Schools, Middletown Township Public Schools, Readington Township Public Schools and West Orange Public Schools, FILED. Service date 02/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3028298] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:26 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 119 ATTORNEY, R. July Simpson for State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind, and Washington State School for the Deaf, in case 20-4128, [ # 116 ], ADDED.[3027002] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:03 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 118 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 116 ], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026997] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:01 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 117 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 113 ], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026994] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:00 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Washington State School for the Deaf, Washington State School for the Blind and State of Washington, FILED. Service date 02/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3026910] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:06 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 115 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [114], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026325] [20-4128] [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:53 AM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 114 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3026066] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:40 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 113 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3026064] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:39 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 112 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [111], on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED.[3026033] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:10 PM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 111 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State of Washington, Washington State School for the Blind and Washington State School for the Deaf, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3026002] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:56 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 110 ATTORNEY, Jill M. O'Toole for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 108 ], ADDED.[3021309] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:58 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 109 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 108 ], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3021304] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:57 PM]
January 26, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020958] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:36 AM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 106 ATTORNEY, Martha J. Casserly, for Appellee Minnesota State Department of Education, TERMINATED.[3020525] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:54 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 105 LETTER, dated 01/25/2021, on behalf of Appellee Minnesota State Department of Education, informing the Court they will not be participating on this appeal and requests to reserve the right to participate as amici curiae, RECEIVED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3020524] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:53 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 104 ATTORNEY, Lewis R. Silverman for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 98 ], ADDED.[3020522] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:51 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 103 ATTORNEY, Caroline B. Lineen for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 99 ], ADDED.[3020521] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:50 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 102 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 98 ], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3020517] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:39 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 101 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 99 ], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3020513] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:38 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 100 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [44], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3020509] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:32 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020365] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:57 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020359] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:54 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 97 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [95], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3020329] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:39 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 96 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [94], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3020321] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 03:36 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3019942] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 12:16 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/25/2021 by CM/ECF. [3019938] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/25/2021 12:14 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 93 ATTORNEY, Amy Dawn Demmler for Austin Indepenent School District, in case 20-4128, [ # 92 ], ADDED.[3017507] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/21/2021 08:34 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Austin Indepenent School District, FILED. Service date 01/20/2021 by CM/ECF. [3017324] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:17 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 90 ATTORNEY, Joseph Kevin Scully for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 88 ], ADDED.[3017144] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:33 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 89 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Alpine Union School District, Bonsall Union School District, Borrego Springs Unified School District, Cardiff Elementary School District, Carlsbad Unified School District, Chula Vista Elementary School District, Coronado Unified School District, Dehesa School District, Del Mar Union School District, Encinitas Union School District, Escondido Union Elementary School District, Escondido Union High School District, Fallbrook High School Union District, Fallbrook Union Elementary School District, Grossmont Union High School District, Jamul-Dulzura Union School District, Julian Union High School District, Julian Union School District, La Mesa-Spring Valley School District, Lakeside Joint School District, Lemon Grove School District, McCabe Union School District, Mountain Empire Unified School District, Ramona Unified School District, Rancho Santa Fe Elementary School District, San Diego County Office of Education, San Dieguito Union High School District, San Marcos Unified School District, San Pasqual Union Elementary School District, San Pasqual Valley Unified School District, Santee School District, Solana Beach Elementary School District, Spencer Valley Elementary School District, Sweetwater Union High School District, Vallecitos Elementary School District, Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District and Warner Unified School District, FILED. Service date 01/20/2021 by CM/ECF.[3017116] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:02 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/20/2021 by email. [3017044] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/20/2021 12:54 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 86 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Departments of Education in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/20/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016591] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/20/2021 08:11 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 85 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 83 ], on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., FILED.[3016424] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:15 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 84 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [82], on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., FILED.[3016416] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:11 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 83 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant J.J., C.N., and K.M., FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016411] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:08 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 82 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant K.M., FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3016345] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:35 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 81 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Town of Stratford Board of Education, FILED. Service date 01/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3015916] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 12:42 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 79 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 74 ], on behalf of Appellee Omaha Public School District, FILED.[3015506] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:40 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 78 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [71], on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., FILED.[3015499] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:35 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Jonathan Brush, [ # 70 ], in place of attorney Amy Dawn Demmler, SUBSTITUTED.[3015490] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:29 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 74 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Omaha Public School District, FILED. Service date 01/15/2021 by email, US mail.[3015050] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 04:33 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 73 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., FILED. Service date 01/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3014870] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:54 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 72 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J. and K.M., FILED. Service date 01/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3014631] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:28 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 71 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant K.M., J.J. and C.N., FILED. Service date 01/15/2021 by CM/ECF.[3014618] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:18 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Austin Indepenent School District, FILED. Service date 01/15/2021 by CM/ECF. [3014597] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 12:09 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION ORDER, granting Michael J. Scarinci admission pro hac vice [ # 61 ]; Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order; filed by Appellee Pennsylvania Department of Education, by SLC, FILED. [3014487][69] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 10:59 AM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 67 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [63], on behalf of Appellee Omaha Public School District, FILED.[3014236] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/15/2021 08:25 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 65 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of Bridgeport Board of Education, FILED. Service date 01/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3013573] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:39 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 64 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee South Carolina Department of Education, FILED. Service date 01/14/2021 by CM/ECF.[3013343] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/14/2021 09:45 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 63 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Omaha Public School District, FILED. Service date 01/13/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3012721] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/13/2021 02:30 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Pennsylvania Department of Education, FILED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3011755] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:01 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 59 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of Stamford Board of Education, FILED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3011697] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:34 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee City of Norwalk Board of Education, FILED. Service date 01/12/2021 by CM/ECF.[3011695] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/12/2021 02:33 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 57 CAPTION, changed Defendant designations to Appellee to reflect district court docket, AMENDED.[3011527] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:54 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 55 CAPTION, edited designation of Plaintiff J.T. to reflect the order withdrawing party as an appellant, AMENDED.[3007742] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/06/2021 05:01 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appellant J.T. as party on the appeal [ # 51 ], filed by Appellant J.T., FILED. [3007722][54] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:40 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION, to withdraw as party, on behalf of Appellant J.T., FILED. Service date 01/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3006894] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 07:10 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3006175] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 12:05 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 48 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [45], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3006065] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 11:21 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 47 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [44], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3006056] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 11:19 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [41], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3006017] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 11:07 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3005993] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:57 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3005992] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:56 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF. [3005099] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:11 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 41 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3005096] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:09 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 40 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [35], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3005066] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:54 AM]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, dated 01/04/2021, dismissing appeal by 01/19/2021, unless Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., submit the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[3005054] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:48 AM]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, dated 01/04/2021, dismissing appeal by 01/19/2021, unless Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., submit Form D, FILED.[3005044] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:43 AM]
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, dated 01/04/2021, dismissing appeal by 01/19/2021, unless Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., submit Form C, FILED.[3005032] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:38 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 01/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3004847] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:01 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 34 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [31], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3004799] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:29 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Johanna Zelman for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 30 ], ADDED.[3004793] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:26 AM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Adam I. Kleinberg for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3004786] [20-4128] [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:22 AM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[3004382] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/30/2020 05:26 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [3004182] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:11 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Bryce L. Friedman for School Districts in the United States, in case 20-4128 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[3004010] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:55 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [3003264] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/29/2020 07:30 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Kyle J. Kaiser, for School Districts in the United States and State Departments of Education in the United States, TERMINATED.[3003149] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:25 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER, dated 12/29/2020, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States and State Departments of Education in the United States, counsel for the Utah Office of the Attorney General informs they will not be participating on this appeal, but would like to reserve the right to participate as amici curiae, RECEIVED. Service date 12/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[3003145] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:23 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [3001459] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:59 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [22], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3000996] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:25 AM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [3000498] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/23/2020 05:49 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [17], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[3000378] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:18 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [15], on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED.[2999993] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/23/2020 12:04 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2999844] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:46 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2999119] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/22/2020 01:48 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Diana Lawless, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2998251] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:50 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Richard Carranza, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 12/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2997806] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:06 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2995514] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:08 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State Departments of Education in the United States, FILED. Service date 12/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2995506] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:01 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Jacqueline Wilson, for Appellee School Districts in the United States, TERMINATED.[2995428] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:14 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER, dated 12/16/2020, on behalf of Appellee School Districts in the United States, Attorney Jacqueline Wilson informing she will not be participating on this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2995424] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:13 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Fredric Paul Gallin, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States, Kyle Kaiser, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States and State Departments of Education in the United States, Bryan L. LeClerc, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States and Jacqueline Wilson, Esq. for Appellee School Districts in the United States, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2994963] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:05 PM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2993811] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:55 AM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., district court receipt # ANYSDC-23000056, FILED.[2993807] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:54 AM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 11/13/2020, RECEIVED.[2993802] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:53 AM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant C.N., J.J., J.T. and K.M., FILED. [2993789] [20-4128] [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: J.T. v. de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota State Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State School for the Deaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solana Beach Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Independent School System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Center-Pauma Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Plymouth and Plymouth Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain School Districts Located in the State of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Joint School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamul-Dulzura Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State School for the Blind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Pasqual Union Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Stratford Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Groton and Groton Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Clinton and Clinton Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bridgeport Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Orange Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seymour Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wallingford and Wallingford Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Valley Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonsall Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chula Vista Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancho Santa Fe Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Pasqual Valley Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha's Vineyard High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Hill Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomfret CT School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Indepenent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentucket Regional High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Mar Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dehesa School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Public School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Dieguito Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borrego Springs Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallecitos Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton County Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossmont Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marietta City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Norwalk Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain School Districts Located in the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Watertown and Watertown Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La MesaSpring Valley School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Regional School District No. 10 (Harwinton & Burlington)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coronado Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escondido Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlsbad Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bristol School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiff Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Branford School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middletown Township Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Empire Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Office of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stamford Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater Union High School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santee School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Windham and Windham Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Readington Township Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemon Grove School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Marcos Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Plainville and Plainville Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallbrook High School Union District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallbrook Union Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encinitas Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escondido Union Elementary School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of New York City
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Diana Lawless Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: School Districts in the United States
Represented By: Fredric Paul Gallin Esq.
Represented By: Mohammad Shihabi Esq.
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: Bryan L. LeClerc Esq.
Represented By: Caroline B. Lineen Esq.
Represented By: Dennis Michael Rothman Esq.
Represented By: Kyle Kaiser Esq.
Represented By: Jill M. O'Toole Esq.
Represented By: Jacqueline Wilson Esq.
Represented By: Joseph Kevin Scully Esq.
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Johanna Zelman Esq.
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Diana Lawless Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State Departments of Education in the United States
Represented By: Darren P. Cunningham Esq.
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Kyle Kaiser Esq.
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Carranza, in his official capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Diana Lawless Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: La Mesa-Spring Valley School District
Represented By: Randall L. Winet Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: C.N., individually and on behalf of V.N. and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.J., indivudally and on behalf of Z.J. and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K.M., individually and on behalf of M.M. and S.M., and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Peter Glenn Albert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T., individually and on behalf of D.T. and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?