Padilla v. Criminal District Court No. 5
Defendant / Appellee: City, Town or Municipality of Dallas Co., Dallas, Tx, 203rd District Court, Dallas Co, Courthouse, Federal Bank, for indigent defendants, United States District Court f, No of Tx, Fifth Court of Appeals and Criminal District Court No. 5, Dallas Coy, Courthouse
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ismael Padilla
Case Number: 20-562
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 04/10/2020, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2020, unless Appellant Ismael Padilla, submits a Signed Prisoner Authorization form, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[2817314] [20-562] [Entered: 04/10/2020 09:22 AM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 02/28/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2020, unless Appellant Ismael Padilla, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[2789292] [20-562] [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:31 AM]
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 02/28/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/20/2020, unless Appellant Ismael Padilla, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[2789267] [20-562] [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:23 AM]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 02/26/2020, dismissing appeal by 03/18/2020, unless Appellant Ismael Padilla, submits Form D-P, copy sent to pro se appellant, FILED.[2787703] [20-562] [Entered: 02/26/2020 03:12 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2777766] [20-562] [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:25 PM]
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2777764] [20-562] [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:23 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2777761] [20-562] [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:20 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/17/2020, RECEIVED.[2777755] [20-562] [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:18 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ismael Padilla, FILED. [2777743] [20-562] [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Padilla v. Criminal District Court No. 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City, Town or Municipality of Dallas Co., Dallas, Tx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 203rd District Court, Dallas Co, Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bank, for indigent defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States District Court f, No of Tx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fifth Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Criminal District Court No. 5, Dallas Coy, Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ismael Padilla
Represented By: Ismael Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?