Tang v. Visnauskas
Plaintiff / Appellant: Hong Tang
Defendant / Appellee: Woody Pascal, Deputy Commissioner of the New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal and RuthAnne Visnauskas, Commissioner of the New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal
Case Number: 20-62
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 23 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Hong Tang Brief due date as 04/22/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 04/22/2020, copy to pro se, FILED.[2769702] [20-62] [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:15 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, copy to pro se, ASSIGNED.[2769668] [20-62] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:59 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Hong Tang, informing Court of proposed due date 04/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/22/2020 by US mail.[2768014] [20-62] [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:01 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 16 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Hong Tang, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by US mail.[2768012] [20-62] [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:00 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Hong Tang, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by US mail.[2768011] [20-62] [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:59 AM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2762934] [20-62] [Entered: 01/28/2020 11:49 AM]
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Woody Pascal and RuthAnne Visnauskas, FILED. Service date 01/28/2020 by US mail. [2762839] [20-62] [Entered: 01/28/2020 11:10 AM]
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE, to Appellee Woody Pascal and RuthAnne Visnauskas, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2761908] [20-62] [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:15 PM]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 01/27/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/18/2020, unless Appellant Hong Tang submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2761875] [20-62] [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:01 PM]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 01/27/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/18/2020, unless Appellant Hong Tang submits Form D-P, FILED.[2761858] [20-62] [Entered: 01/27/2020 12:56 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2748490] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:09 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2748480] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:07 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Hong Tang, district court receipt # 4653146998, FILED.[2748476] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:06 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2748473] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:04 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM & ORDER, dated 09/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2748469] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:03 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hong Tang, FILED. [2748447] [20-62] [Entered: 01/09/2020 03:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tang v. Visnauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hong Tang
Represented By: Hong Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Woody Pascal, Deputy Commissioner of the New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RuthAnne Visnauskas, Commissioner of the New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?