Weaver v. Schiavo
Defendant: Bradford Kendall, in his official capacity as, Clerk of Dutchess County
Defendant / Appellee: Salvatore Farruto, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, Maria G. Rosa, in her official capacity as Justice of the Supreme Court, County of Dutchess, Hogan Lovells US LLP, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as trustee of CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust 1, Patrick Overturf, OneWest Bank, FSB, Nicole E. Schiavo and Caryn Edwards
Plaintiff / Appellant: Everette Weaver
Case Number: 20-770
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER, vacating previous order [ # 14 ] dated 03/16/2020, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2825185] [20-770] [Entered: 04/23/2020 03:32 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY, Leah Edmunds for Nicole E. Schiavo, in case 20-770 , [ # 36 ], ADDED.[2812182] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:44 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY, Leah Edmunds for Salvatore Farruto, in case 20-770 , [ # 35 ], ADDED.[2812167] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:32 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Leah Edmunds for Caryn Edwards, in case 20-770 , [ # 34 ], ADDED.[2812166] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:31 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Leah Edmunds for Hogan Lovells US LLP, in case 20-770 , [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2812163] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:29 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Leah Edmunds for OneWest Bank, FSB, in case 20-770 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2812158] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:27 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, Allison Marie Funk for Nicole E. Schiavo, in case 20-770 , [ # 31 ], ADDED.[2812145] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:14 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Allison Marie Funk for Salvatore Farruto, in case 20-770 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[2812144] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:13 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Allison Marie Funk for Caryn Edwards, in case 20-770 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[2812140] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:12 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Allison Marie Funk for Hogan Lovells US LLP, in case 20-770 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2812135] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:10 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Allison Marie Funk for OneWest Bank, FSB, in case 20-770 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[2812132] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:07 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nicole E. Schiavo, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812120] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:57 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Farruto, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812118] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:57 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Caryn Edwards, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812114] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:55 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hogan Lovells US LLP, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812113] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:55 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee OneWest Bank, FSB, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812109] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:53 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nicole E. Schiavo, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812098] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:49 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Farruto, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812096] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:48 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Caryn Edwards, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812093] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:47 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hogan Lovells US LLP, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812092] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:45 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee OneWest Bank, FSB, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail. [2812090] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:44 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nicole E. Schiavo, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail.[2812086] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:42 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Salvatore Farruto, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail.[2812065] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:27 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Caryn Edwards, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail.[2812063] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:25 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Hogan Lovells US LLP, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail.[2812060] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:24 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee OneWest Bank, FSB, FILED. Service date 03/20/2020 by US mail.[2812055] [20-770] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:18 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 21 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Everette Weaver, informing Court of proposed due date 05/28/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2020 by US mail.[2805925] [20-770] [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:14 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 20 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Everette Weaver, FILED. Service date 03/18/2020 by US mail.[2805924] [20-770] [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:11 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Everette Weaver, FILED. Service date 03/18/2020 by US mail.[2805923] [20-770] [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:06 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE, to Appellee Caryn Edwards, Salvatore Farruto, Hogan Lovells US LLP, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC, OneWest Bank, FSB, Patrick Overturf, Nicole E. Schiavo and U.S. Bank Trust National Association , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2805554] [20-770] [Entered: 03/19/2020 01:02 PM]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, dated 03/19/2020, dismissing appeal by 04/09/2020 unless Appellant Everette Weaver, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2805548] [20-770] [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:52 PM]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, dated 03/16/2020, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2020 unless Appellant Everette Weaver, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED.[2802946] [20-770] [Entered: 03/16/2020 06:03 PM]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dated 03/16/2020, dismissing appeal by 04/06/2020, unless Appellant Everette Weaver, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2802944] [20-770] [Entered: 03/16/2020 05:56 PM]
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2800232] [20-770] [Entered: 03/12/2020 02:12 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2794644] [20-770] [Entered: 03/05/2020 02:25 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Maria G. Rosa, FILED. Service date 03/05/2020 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2794383] [20-770] [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:59 AM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE, to Appellee U.S. Bank Trust National Association, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2792448] [20-770] [Entered: 03/04/2020 08:26 AM]
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2792412] [20-770] [Entered: 03/04/2020 06:30 AM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2792411] [20-770] [Entered: 03/04/2020 06:28 AM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 01/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2792407] [20-770] [Entered: 03/04/2020 06:25 AM]
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Everette Weaver, FILED. [2792406] [20-770] [Entered: 03/04/2020 06:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Weaver v. Schiavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Salvatore Farruto
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal Esq.
Represented By: Leah Edmunds Esq.
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway, LLC
Represented By: Matthew William Lizotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maria G. Rosa, in her official capacity as Justice of the Supreme Court, County of Dutchess
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hogan Lovells US LLP
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal Esq.
Represented By: Leah Edmunds Esq.
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as trustee of CVI LCF Mortgage Loan Trust 1
Represented By: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patrick Overturf
Represented By: Nicole E. Schiavo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal Esq.
Represented By: Leah Edmunds Esq.
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nicole E. Schiavo
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal Esq.
Represented By: Leah Edmunds Esq.
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Caryn Edwards
Represented By: Allison J. Schoenthal Esq.
Represented By: Leah Edmunds Esq.
Represented By: Allison Marie Funk Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Everette Weaver
Represented By: Everette Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Kendall, in his official capacity as, Clerk of Dutchess County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?