Matthews v. Barq
Defendant: Thoms
Defendant / Appellee: Correction Officer R. Rossy, Eastern Correctional Facility, Sergeant A.J. Ciorciari, Eastern Correctional Facility and Sergeant Barq, Eastern Correctional Facility
Plaintiff / Appellant: Hashim Matthews
Case Number: 21-1212
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Hashim Matthews, FILED. Service date 06/19/2021 by US mail.[3126938] [21-1212] [Entered: 06/28/2021 07:24 AM]
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Hashim Matthews, FILED. Service date 06/19/2021 by US mail.[3126939] [21-1212] [Entered: 06/28/2021 07:25 AM]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dated 06/22/2021, dismissing appeal by 07/12/2021, unless Appellant Matthews Hashim, submits signed Prisoner Authorization Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3123334] [21-1212] [Entered: 06/22/2021 05:00 AM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [12], on behalf of Appellant Hashim Matthews, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3113680] [21-1212] [Entered: 06/03/2021 07:38 PM]
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Hashim Matthews, FILED. Service date 05/18/2021 by US mail.[3113679] [21-1212] [Entered: 06/03/2021 07:37 PM]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 05/21/2021, dismissing appeal by 06/11/2021, unless Appellant Hashim Matthews submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3105402] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/21/2021 11:03 AM]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 05/21/2021, dismissing appeal by 06/11/2021, unless Appellant Hashim Matthews submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3105400] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/21/2021 11:02 AM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barq, A.J. Ciorciari and R. Rossy, FILED. Service date 05/18/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3103009] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/18/2021 01:00 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Brian D. Ginsberg, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3102618] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/18/2021 08:01 AM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barq, A.J. Ciorciari and R. Rossy, FILED. Service date 05/17/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3102511] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:24 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3101956] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/17/2021 11:23 AM]
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[3095402] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:09 PM]
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3095401] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:07 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3095395] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:04 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hashim Matthews, FILED. [3095392] [21-1212] [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Matthews v. Barq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Correction Officer R. Rossy, Eastern Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant A.J. Ciorciari, Eastern Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sergeant Barq, Eastern Correctional Facility
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian David Ginsberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hashim Matthews
Represented By: Hashim Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?