Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Defendant: Angela Jacobson, Allison Valentine and Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: Ashfield Health LLC
Defendant / Appellant: Matthew Jacobson
Case Number: 21-1885
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Sandlin for Ashfield Health LLC, in case 21-1885 Benjamin Sandlin for Ashfield Health LLC, in case 21-1717 , [ # 40 ], ADDED.[3179905] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/24/2021 12:02 PM]
September 23, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 09/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3178872] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/23/2021 11:35 AM]
September 15, 2021 Filing 39 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee-Cross-Appellant Matthew Jacobson in 21-1717, Appellant Matthew Jacobson in 21-1885 Brief due date as 11/30/2021, FILED.[3174177] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/15/2021 12:29 PM]
September 1, 2021 Filing 33 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by US mail.[3173286] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:07 PM]
September 1, 2021 Filing 32 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by US mail.[3173285] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:06 PM]
September 1, 2021 Filing 31 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by US mail.[3173283] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:04 PM]
September 1, 2021 Filing 30 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 4, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by US mail.[3173280] [21-1717, 21-1885]--[Edited 09/14/2021 by BM] [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:03 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 24 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Matthew Jacobson in 21-1717, Appellant Matthew Jacobson in 21-1885, informing Court of proposed due date 11/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2021 by CM/ECF.[3165775] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/31/2021 04:51 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by CM/ECF. [3165597] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:57 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Confidential Joint Appendix, on behalf of Appellant Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1885, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by CM/ECF.[3165590] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:55 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-258), on behalf of Appellant Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717, Appellee Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1885, FILED. Service date 08/31/2021 by CM/ECF.[3165588] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:53 PM]
August 27, 2021 Filing 20 CAPTION, cross appeal designation added, AMENDED.[3164340] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/30/2021 09:11 AM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Ashfield Health LLC in 21-1717 Brief due date as 08/31/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 08/31/2021, FILED.[3157005] [21-1717, 21-1885] [Entered: 08/16/2021 03:20 PM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3156987] [21-1885, 21-1717] [Entered: 08/16/2021 03:08 PM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 CAMP ORDER (v), Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/10/2021, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Mediator: Karen Ash, ENTERED.[3156832] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/16/2021 01:12 PM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ashfield Health LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3156801] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/16/2021 12:30 PM]
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Jacobson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3156413] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/13/2021 04:21 PM]
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Jacobson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3156411] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/13/2021 04:19 PM]
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Jacobson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3156406] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/13/2021 04:17 PM]
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3148546] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:23 AM]
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Jacobson, district court receipt # ACTDC-6595883, FILED.[3148528] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:15 AM]
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3148518] [21-1885] [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:12 AM]
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Jacobson in 21-1885, FILED. [3148512] [21-1885, 21-1717] [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ashfield Health LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Brazzano
Represented By: Benjamin Sandlin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Matthew Jacobson
Represented By: Steven J. Zakrzewski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?