Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Defendant / Appellee: City of New York, NYPD Officer Saquoi Harris, Shield #2350, NYPD Officer Steven Perez, Shield 23485, NYPD Officer Liang Lin, NYPD Officer Robert Holmes, NYPD Officer Rodriguez, NYPD Sergeant Frank Amill, NYPD Captain Joseph Tompkins, NYPD Steve Ortiz, NYPD Jeffrey Peattie, NYPD Matthew Pereira, NYPD Michael Dano, NYPD Andrew Benjamin, NYPD John Doe, 1, NYPD John Doe, 2, NYPD John Doe, 3, NYPD John Doe, 4, NYPD John Doe, 5, NYPD John Doe, 6, NYPD John Doe, 7, Alexander Opoku-Agyemang, Judith Le, Jonathan Darche, Bill de Blasio, Lawrence Byrne, Jr., James O'Neil, Bronx Criminal Court Judge Jeffrey Zimmerman, Tara Collins, Neelam Chhikara, Darcel D. Clark, Alana Brady, Donovan Richards and United States Marshals Service
Case Number: 21-1952
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, [ # 13 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Towaki Komatsu failure to pay fee, EFFECTIVE.[3184446] [21-1952] [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:39 PM]
September 30, 2021 Filing 18 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[3184428] [21-1952] [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:19 PM]
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States Marshals Service, FILED. Service date 09/09/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3170515] [21-1952] [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:27 PM]
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee United States Marshals Service, informing the court that the federal appellees will not participate in the appeal unless requested to do so by the Court, RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3170508] [21-1952] [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:25 PM]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 08/31/2021, dismissing appeal by 09/21/2021, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3165603] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:59 PM]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 08/31/2021, dismissing appeal by 09/21/2021, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3165569] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:43 PM]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 08/31/2021, dismissing appeal by 09/21/2021, unless Appellant Towaki Komatsu, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3165545] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:30 PM]
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE, to Appellee Frank Amill, Andrew Benjamin, Alana Brady, Lawrence Byrne, Jr., Neelam Chhikara, City of New York, Darcel D. Clark, Tara Collins, Michael Dano, Jonathan Darche, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Saquoi Harris, Robert Holmes, Judith Le, Liang Lin, James O'Neil, Alexander Opoku-Agyemang, Steve Ortiz, Jeffrey Peattie, Matthew Pereira, Steven Perez, Donovan Richards, Rodriguez, Joseph Tompkins, United States Marshals Service, Jeffrey Zimmerman and Bill de Blasio, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3165536] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/31/2021 02:22 PM]
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[3152835] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/09/2021 02:03 PM]
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3152825] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:50 PM]
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/03/2021, RECEIVED.[3152823] [21-1952] [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:49 PM]
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. [3152820] [21-1952]--[Edited 08/31/2021 by PRM] [Entered: 08/09/2021 01:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Komatsu v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Towaki Komatsu
Represented By: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Saquoi Harris, Shield #2350
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Steven Perez, Shield 23485
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Liang Lin
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Robert Holmes
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Officer Rodriguez
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Sergeant Frank Amill
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Captain Joseph Tompkins
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Steve Ortiz
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Jeffrey Peattie
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Matthew Pereira
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Michael Dano
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD Andrew Benjamin
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 1
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 2
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 3
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 4
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 5
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 6
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NYPD John Doe, 7
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alexander Opoku-Agyemang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judith Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan Darche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill de Blasio
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lawrence Byrne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James O'Neil
Represented By: Georgia Mary Pestana Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bronx Criminal Court Judge Jeffrey Zimmerman
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tara Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Neelam Chhikara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Darcel D. Clark
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alana Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donovan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Marshals Service
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?