Jimenez v. Lilley
Respondent: Lynn Lilley
Petitioner / Appellant: Rafael Jimenez
Respondent / Appellee: Tina M. Stanford, Chairperson of thel SO New York State Board of Parole
Case Number: 21-2582
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 41 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 12/06/2021 by CM/ECF.[3223789][41] [21-2582] [Entered: 12/06/2021 05:23 PM]
November 29, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 34 ] filed by Appellant Rafael Jimenez. Appellant's reply in support is due on or before December 6, 2021, by RJL, FILED. [3218414][38] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/29/2021 09:15 AM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3216365] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/22/2021 02:14 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for certificate of appealability [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellee Tina M. Stanford, FILED. Service date 11/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3216034] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/22/2021 10:21 AM]
November 18, 2021 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Matthew White for Tina M. Stanford, in case 21-2582, [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3214386] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:45 AM]
November 18, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Tina M. Stanford, FILED. Service date 11/18/2021 by email. [3214357] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:27 AM]
November 11, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3209437] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/11/2021 05:56 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Glenn A. Garber for Rafael Jimenez, in case 21-2582, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[3208446] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/09/2021 04:03 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 23 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED.[3208440] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/09/2021 04:02 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3208193] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/09/2021 01:47 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [20], on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED.[3208112] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/09/2021 12:47 PM]
November 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3208019] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/09/2021 11:41 AM]
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 NEW CASE MANAGER, Patrick Finn, ASSIGNED.[3206736] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/05/2021 04:06 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3206019] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 03:49 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3206006] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 03:42 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED.[3205955] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:58 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3205952] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:55 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [11], on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED.[3205949] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:47 PM]
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. Service date 11/04/2021 by CM/ECF.[3205946] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:45 PM]
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Jennifer Lynn Watson, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Nancy Killian, SUBSTITUTED.[3204627] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/03/2021 10:34 AM]
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 7 ], [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellee Tina M. Stanford, FILED.[3204624] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/03/2021 10:33 AM]
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Tina M. Stanford, FILED. Service date 11/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3204576] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/03/2021 10:07 AM]
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [6], on behalf of Appellee Tina M. Stanford, FILED.[3204551] [21-2582] [Entered: 11/03/2021 09:54 AM]
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Mr. Lynn Lilley, FILED. Service date 10/29/2021 by CM/ECF. [3202362] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/29/2021 12:48 PM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3193147] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:28 AM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25193564, FILED.[3193146] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:27 AM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3193142] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:27 AM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3193140] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:26 AM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Rafael Jimenez, FILED. [3193131] [21-2582] [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Rafael Jimenez
Represented By: Rebecca E. Freedman Esq.
Represented By: Glenn A. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lynn Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Tina M. Stanford, Chairperson of thel SO New York State Board of Parole
Represented By: Nancy Darragh Killian Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Watson Esq.
Represented By: Matthew White Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?