Jane Doe v. Zucker
Defendant: L. Oliver Robinson, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Shenendehowa Central School District, Shenendehowa Central School District, Andrew Hills, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Arongen Elementary School, Shenendehowa Central School District and Sean Gnat, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Koda Middle School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Defendant / Appellee: Penfield Central School District, Lorri Whiteman, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Elementary School, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Coxsackie-Athens School District, BR. David Migliorino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, St. Anthony's High School, South Huntington School District, South Huntington School District, Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Health for the State of New York, Dr. Thomas Putman, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Penfield Central School District, Albany City School District, Three Village Central School District, Susan Eschbach, acting in her official capcity as Principal, Beverly J. Martin Elementary School, Ithaca City School District, Lansing Central School District, Christine Rebera, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Middle School, Lansing Central School District, Michael Paolino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, William S. Hackett Middle School, Albany City School District; and all others similarly situated, Chris Pettograsso, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Lansing Central School District, Corinne Keane, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Paul J. Gelinas Jr. High School, Three Village Central School District, Cheryl Pedisich, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Three Village Central School District, DR. Luvelle Brown, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Ithaca City School District, Kaweeda G. Adams, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Albany City School District, Ithaca City School District, Coxsackie-Athens School District, David P. Bennardo, Dr., acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, South Huntington School District, Randall Squier, Superintendent, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Coxsackie-Athens School District, M.D. Elizabeth Rausch-Phung, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Immunizations at the New York State Department of Health and New York State Department of Health
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jane Doe, on behalf of herself and her minor child, Jane Joe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child, Childrens Health Defense, John Coe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor children, Jane Boe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child, Jane Goe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child, Jane Coe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor children, Jane Loe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child and John Foe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor child
Case Number: 21-537
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 05/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3091193] [21-537] [Entered: 05/01/2021 01:49 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Meishin Riccardulli for David Migliorino, in case 21-537, [ # 52 ], ADDED.[3087625] [21-537] [Entered: 04/27/2021 01:09 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 04/27/2021 by CM/ECF. [3087577] [21-537] [Entered: 04/27/2021 12:27 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 51 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David Migliorino, FILED. Service date 04/27/2021 by CM/ECF.[3087566] [21-537] [Entered: 04/27/2021 12:21 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 47 EXPEDITED SCHEDULING ORDER re: Appellants' Brief due date as 05/14/2021; Joint Appendix due date as 05/14/2021; Appellees' Briefs due date as 06/18/2021, FILED.[3074699] [21-537] [Entered: 04/09/2021 04:40 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal [ # 43 ] filed by Appellants Jane Joe, Jane Doe, Jane Boe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Coe, Sr., John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Loe and Childrens Health Defense, FILED. [3074692][46] [21-537] [Entered: 04/09/2021 04:38 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 04/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3074463] [21-537] [Entered: 04/09/2021 02:10 PM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 41 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[3073210] [21-537] [Entered: 04/08/2021 09:25 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 04/02/2021 by CM/ECF.[3069356] [21-537] [Entered: 04/02/2021 01:45 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Gregg Tyler Johnson for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District David P. Bennardo Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District South Huntington School District, in case 21-537, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[3069049] [21-537] [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:01 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bennardo, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, Three Village Central School District and South Huntington School District, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by CM/ECF. [3068851] [21-537] [Entered: 04/01/2021 05:34 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by CM/ECF.[3068755] [21-537] [Entered: 04/01/2021 04:40 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, Michael Paolino, Ithaca City School District, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, South Huntington School District, David P. Bennardo, Three Village Central School District, Cheryl Pedisich and Corinne Keane, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by CM/ECF.[3068750] [21-537] [Entered: 04/01/2021 04:36 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE, to Appellees Coxsackie-Athens School District, Lansing Central School District, Freya Mercer, David Migliorino, Penfield Central School District, Chris Pettograsso, Thomas Putman, Christine Rebera, Randall Squier and Lorri Whiteman, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3068569] [21-537] [Entered: 04/01/2021 03:10 PM]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, dated 04/01/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/15/2021, unless Appellants Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, submit Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[3068547] [21-537] [Entered: 04/01/2021 03:00 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 28 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3060508] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/19/2021 05:30 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 27 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3060327] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/19/2021 03:50 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 42.1 Stipulations, [ # 3058559-2 ], [ # 3058683-2 ], [17], [ # 3059420-2 ], [23], on behalf of Appellants Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe in 20-3915, FILED.[3059986] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:42 AM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 25 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3059945] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/19/2021 11:07 AM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 23 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2021 by CM/ECF.[3059541] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:19 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 19 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jane Goe, Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 03/18/2021 by CM/ECF.[3059417] [21-537] [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:58 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jane Goe, Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, FILED. Service date 03/18/2021 by CM/ECF.[3059407] [21-537] [Entered: 03/18/2021 02:52 PM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2021 by CM/ECF.[3058699] [20-3915, 21-537] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:02 PM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New York State Department of Health, Elizabeth Rausch-Phung and Howard Zucker, FILED. Service date 03/17/2021 by CM/ECF.[3058613] [21-537] [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:18 PM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Loraine Clare Jelinek for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District David P. Bennardo Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District South Huntington School District, in case 21-537, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[3055953] [21-537] [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:00 AM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, April Laws for Corinne Keane Luvelle Brown Ithaca City School District David P. Bennardo Three Village Central School District Susan Eschbach Michael Paolino Kaweeda G. Adams Cheryl Pedisich Albany City School District South Huntington School District, in case 21-537, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3055942] [21-537] [Entered: 03/15/2021 10:56 AM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bennardo, Luvelle Brown, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District and Three Village Central School District in 21-537, 20-3915, FILED. Service date 03/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054906] [21-537, 20-3915] [Entered: 03/12/2021 12:18 PM]
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kaweeda G. Adams, Albany City School District, David P. Bennardo, Susan Eschbach, Ithaca City School District, Corinne Keane, Michael Paolino, Cheryl Pedisich, South Huntington School District, Three Village Central School District and Luvelle Brown in 21-537, 20-3915, FILED. Service date 03/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054900] [21-537, 20-3915] [Entered: 03/12/2021 12:14 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTE: See lead case, 20-3915, containing complete set of docket entries.[3051239] [21-537, 20-3915] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:53 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Beenzly J. Kiernan, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[3051227] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:49 PM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York State Department of Health, Elizabeth Rausch-Phung and Howard Zucker, FILED. Service date 03/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3051225] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:46 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3051222] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:46 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5440448, FILED.[3051211] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:41 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/17/2021, RECEIVED.[3051206] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:39 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 02/17/2021, RECEIVED.[3051205] [21-537] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:38 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Jane Boe, Sr., Childrens Health Defense, Jane Coe, Sr., John Coe, Sr., Jane Doe, John Foe, Sr., Jane Goe, Sr., Jane Joe and Jane Loe in 21-537, FILED. [3051199] [21-537, 20-3915] [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Penfield Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorri Whiteman, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Elementary School, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Freya Mercer, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BR. David Migliorino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, St. Anthony's High School, South Huntington School District
Represented By: Philip Semprevivo Esq.
Represented By: Meishin Riccardulli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: South Huntington School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard Zucker, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Health for the State of New York
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. Thomas Putman, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Penfield Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Albany City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Susan Eschbach, acting in her official capcity as Principal, Beverly J. Martin Elementary School, Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christine Rebera, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Lansing Middle School, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Paolino, acting in his official capacity as Principal, William S. Hackett Middle School, Albany City School District; and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Pettograsso, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Lansing Central School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Corinne Keane, acting in her official capacity as Principal, Paul J. Gelinas Jr. High School, Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheryl Pedisich, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. Luvelle Brown, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kaweeda G. Adams, acting in her official capacity as Superintendent, Albany City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ithaca City School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David P. Bennardo, Dr., acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, South Huntington School District
Represented By: Gregg Tyler Johnson
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Represented By: April Laws Esq.
Represented By: Loraine Clare Jelinek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Randall Squier, Superintendent, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Coxsackie-Athens School District
Represented By: James Gerard Ryan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M.D. Elizabeth Rausch-Phung, in her official capacity as Director of the Bureau of Immunizations at the New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Beezly J. Kiernan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Oliver Robinson, acting in his official capacity as Superintendent, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hills, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Arongen Elementary School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Gnat, acting in his official capacity as Principal, Koda Middle School, Shenendehowa Central School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Doe, on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Joe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Childrens Health Defense
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Coe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor children
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Boe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Goe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor child
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Coe, Sr., on behalf of herself and her minor children
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Loe, on behalf of herself and her medically fragile child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John Foe, Sr., on behalf of himself and his minor child
Represented By: Sujata Sidhu Gibson Esq.
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?