Francois v. New York City Department of Ed
Plaintiff / Appellant: Eugenie Francois
Defendant / Appellee: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 21-601
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 36 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 05/24/2021, appellee's brief due date as 06/28/2021,TRANSMITTED.[3080628] [21-601] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:37 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 35 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3080469] [21-601] [Entered: 04/19/2021 12:17 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 28 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 24 ], [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED.[3079741] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:56 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 25 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3079710] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:30 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3079708] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:29 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3079704] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:28 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Bryan David Glass for Eugenie Francois, in case 21-601 , [ # 19 ], ADDED.[3079617] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:40 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3079614] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:37 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [17], on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED.[3079612] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:34 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3079585] [21-601] [Entered: 04/16/2021 02:13 PM]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, dated 04/01/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/22/2021, unless Appellant Eugenie Francois, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3068359] [21-601] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:37 PM]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, dated 04/01/2021, dismissing appeal by 04/22/2021, unless Appellant Eugenie Francois, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3068306] [21-601] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:10 PM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Diana Lawless, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney James Edward Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[3066140] [21-601] [Entered: 03/30/2021 05:41 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 PAPERS, FORMS C and FORM D, RECEIVED.[3066137] [21-601] [Entered: 03/30/2021 05:33 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by US mail. [3065929] [21-601] [Entered: 03/29/2021 04:30 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, district court receipt # 465401276013 , FILED.[3059661] [21-601] [Entered: 03/19/2021 05:40 AM]
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3057756] [21-601] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:12 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3057755] [21-601] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:10 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3057754] [21-601] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:08 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3057753] [21-601] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:07 AM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Eugenie Francois, FILED. [3057752] [21-601] [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:03 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Francois v. New York City Department of Ed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eugenie Francois
Represented By: Eugenie Francois
Represented By: Bryan David Glass Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: James Edward Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Diana Lawless Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?