Concepcion v. Barr
Petitioner: Danilo Concepcion
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal, William P. Barr, United States Attorney General and Jeffrey Searls, Facility Director Buffalo Federal Detention
Case Number: 21-658
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3064458] [21-658] [Entered: 03/26/2021 11:35 AM]
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3062847] [21-658] [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:17 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/22/2021, RECEIVED.[3062836] [21-658] [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:12 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/21/2021, RECEIVED.[3062831] [21-658] [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:10 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jeffrey Searls, FILED. [3062824] [21-658] [Entered: 03/24/2021 01:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Concepcion v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr, United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Searls, Facility Director Buffalo Federal Detention
Represented By: David Michael Coriell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danilo Concepcion
Represented By: Danilo Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?