Borelli v. de Blasio
Plaintiff: Joseph Borelli, Individually, Michele Baione, Individually, Janet Nichols, Individually, Erin Ulitto, Individually and Maria Hart, Individually
Defendant / Appellee: Dr. David Chokshi, in his Official Capacity of Health Commissioner of the City of New York, New York City Department of Education, Bill de Blasio, in his Official Capacity as Mayor of the City of New York, City of New York, Richard A. Carranza, in his Official Capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, in her Official Capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff / Appellant: Stephanie Denaro, Gaetano La Mazza, Children's Health Defense, Adriana Aviles, Christine Kalikazaros and Crystal J. Lisa, Individually
Case Number: 21-721
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 93 Appellant Crystal J. Lisa, TERMINATED.[3098222] [21-721] [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:20 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw Appellant Crystal Lia as party [ # 79 ] filed by Appellant Crystal J. Lisa, Gaetano La Mazza, Children's Health Defense, Christine Kalikazaros, Adriana Aviles and Stephanie Denaro; denying motion for injunction Appellants have failed to meet the requisite standard, [ # 17 ] filed by Appellant Crystal J. Lisa, Gaetano La Mazza, Children's Health Defense, Christine Kalikazaros, Adriana Aviles and Stephanie Denaro, by JON, GC, RSP, FILED. [3098218][92] [21-721] [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:18 PM]
May 3, 2021 Filing 87 REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3091524] [21-721] [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:57 AM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION, to withdraw as party, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/30/2021 by CM/ECF. [3090384] [21-721] [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:08 AM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 76 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, regarding oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 04/30/2021 by CM/ECF.[3090246] [21-721]--[Edited 04/30/2021 by JB] [Entered: 04/30/2021 12:54 AM]
April 29, 2021 Filing 75 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 61 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3090096][75] [21-721] [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:23 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 74 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3087404] [21-721] [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:47 AM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 71 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa Brief due date as 07/07/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 07/07/2021, FILED.[3085468] [21-721] [Entered: 04/23/2021 03:39 PM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION ORDER, the extent the motion seeks a temporary injunction pending determination of the motion by a three-judge panel, the injunction is denied. The motion is referred to a three-judge motions panel. [ # 17 ] filed by Appellant Crystal J. Lisa, Gaetano La Mazza, Children's Health Defense, Christine Kalikazaros, Adriana Aviles and Stephanie Denaro, by DC, FILED. [3085275][68] [21-721] [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:45 PM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 65 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, informing Court of proposed due date 07/07/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 04/23/2021 by CM/ECF.[3085065] [21-721] [Entered: 04/23/2021 01:22 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 61 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for injunction [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee David Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 04/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3084438] [21-721] [Entered: 04/22/2021 05:58 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 60 ATTORNEY, Richard Dearing for City of New York Meisha Porter David Chokshi Bill de Blasio New York City Department of Education, in case 21-721 , [ # 58 ], ADDED.[3083450] [21-721]--[Edited 04/22/2021 by JB] [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:20 AM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Daniel Matza-Brown for City of New York Meisha Porter David Chokshi Bill de Blasio New York City Department of Education, in case 21-721 , [ # 57 ], ADDED.[3083447] [21-721] [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:18 AM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, City of New York and David Chokshi, FILED. Service date 04/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3083420] [21-721] [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:13 AM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, City of New York and David Chokshi, FILED. Service date 04/22/2021 by CM/ECF. [3083412] [21-721] [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:11 AM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 56 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [ # 46 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3081547] [21-721] [Entered: 04/20/2021 12:21 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 55 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[3081543] [21-721] [Entered: 04/20/2021 12:19 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 52 CAPTION, order changed, AMENDED.[3081480] [21-721] [Entered: 04/20/2021 11:20 AM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION ORDER, denying request to hold decision on Appellants' motion for injunctive relief in abeyance as moot, granting motion to extend time [ # 42 ] filed by Appellee City of New York, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Education, David Chokshi and Meisha Porter, by RSP, FILED. [3078081][50] [21-721] [Entered: 04/15/2021 11:57 AM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 46 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, informing the court in regards to an update in the Motion for preliminary injuntion in the district court, RECEIVED. Service date 04/14/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3077386] [21-721] [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:44 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee David Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 04/09/2021 by CM/ECF. [3074372] [21-721] [Entered: 04/09/2021 01:27 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 40 CAPTION, pursuant to FRAP 43(c)(2), AMENDED.[3074112] [21-721] [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:57 AM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 39 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTER, [34], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3074107] [21-721] [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:52 AM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 38 RICHARD A. CARRANZA, APPELLEE, replaced by Meisha Porter, Appellee SUBSTITUTED.[3074097] [21-721] [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:46 AM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 36 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24330195, FILED.[3074086] [21-721] [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:40 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Richard A. Carranza, David Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073442] [21-721] [Entered: 04/08/2021 11:45 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 34 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073081] [21-721] [Entered: 04/08/2021 03:04 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 33 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073080] [21-721] [Entered: 04/08/2021 02:49 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 32 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073079] [21-721] [Entered: 04/08/2021 02:47 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073078] [21-721] [Entered: 04/08/2021 02:46 AM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, James Mermigis for Christine Kalikazaros Gaetano La Mazza Crystal J. Lisa Children's Health Defense Adriana Aviles Stephanie Denaro, in case 21-721, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[3072031] [21-721] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:12 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 24 ], [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3072028] [21-721] [Entered: 04/06/2021 04:11 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Crystal J. Lisa, Gaetano La Mazza and Christine Kalikazaros, FILED. Service date 04/06/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3071976] [21-721] [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:52 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [23], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3071878] [21-721] [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:19 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros and Gaetano La Mazza, FILED. Service date 04/06/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3071588] [21-721] [Entered: 04/06/2021 01:24 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Richard A. Carranza, David Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, requestiing that this Court hold appellants motion in abeyance pending resolution of the district court motion, RECEIVED. Service date 04/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3070432] [21-721] [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:14 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, for injunction [ # 13 ], [ # 16 ], [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3069558] [21-721] [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:19 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/02/2021 by fax, US mail. [3069552] [21-721] [Entered: 04/02/2021 04:15 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for injunction, [15], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3069430] [21-721] [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:00 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/02/2021 by email, US mail. [3069421] [21-721] [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:52 PM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for injunction, [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3068965] [21-721] [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:18 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by email. [3068880] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 10:00 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Ray L. Flores, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney James Mermigis, SUBSTITUTED.[3068295] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:02 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3068290] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:00 PM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by email. [3068283] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:53 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [7], on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED.[3068254] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:36 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. Service date 04/01/2021 by email. [3068250] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:32 AM]
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, James E. Johnson, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney Philip W. Young, SUBSTITUTED.[3067984] [21-721] [Entered: 04/01/2021 08:46 AM]
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Richard A. Carranza, David Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio and New York City Department of Education, FILED. Service date 03/31/2021 by CM/ECF. [3067777] [21-721] [Entered: 03/31/2021 04:14 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney James Mermigis, Esq. for Appellant Crystal J. Lisa, Gaetano La Mazza, Children's Health Defense, Christine Kalikazaros, Adriana Aviles and Stephanie Denaro, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3065393] [21-721] [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:36 AM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3065385] [21-721] [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:33 AM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/02/2021, RECEIVED.[3065381] [21-721] [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:33 AM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Adriana Aviles, Children's Health Defense, Stephanie Denaro, Christine Kalikazaros, Gaetano La Mazza and Crystal J. Lisa, FILED. [3065374] [21-721] [Entered: 03/29/2021 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Borelli v. de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dr. David Chokshi, in his Official Capacity of Health Commissioner of the City of New York
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Matza-Brown Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Matza-Brown Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill de Blasio, in his Official Capacity as Mayor of the City of New York
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Matza-Brown Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Matza-Brown Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard A. Carranza, in his Official Capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Meisha Porter, in her Official Capacity as Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Philip W. Young Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Matza-Brown Esq.
Represented By: Richard Paul Dearing Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stephanie Denaro
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Represented By: James Mermigis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gaetano La Mazza
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Represented By: James Mermigis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Children's Health Defense
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Represented By: James Mermigis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Adriana Aviles
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Represented By: James Mermigis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Christine Kalikazaros
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Represented By: James Mermigis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Crystal J. Lisa, Individually
Represented By: Ray L. Flores Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Borelli, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Baione, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Nichols, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Ulitto, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hart, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?