Oberlander v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: Salaman Oberlander, individually and as Trustee of The Ader I Trust dated December 11, 2014
Defendant / Appellee: American General Life Insurance Company, Marc Frohlich and Frohlich Financial Group, LLC
Case Number: 22-1533
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CONTRACT-Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Filing 114 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/22/2023, to EDNY, ISSUED.[3559736] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:17 PM]
August 22, 2023 Filing 113 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED.[3559734] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:16 PM]
May 1, 2023 Filing 110 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3507561] [22-1533] [Entered: 05/01/2023 08:48 AM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 108 OPPOSITION TO ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [ # 105 ], on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 04/24/2023 by CM/ECF. [3504277] [22-1533] [Entered: 04/24/2023 05:08 PM]
April 11, 2023 Filing 107 CERTIFIED copy of Summary Order filed 04/10/2023 receipt, RETURNED.[3497180] [22-1533] [Entered: 04/11/2023 09:57 AM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 105 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 04/10/2023 by CM/ECF.[3496645] [22-1533] [Entered: 04/10/2023 11:45 AM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 103 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[3496471] [22-1533] [Entered: 04/10/2023 09:29 AM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 102 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 04/10/2023, to EDNY (BROOKLYN), ISSUED.[3496469] [22-1533] [Entered: 04/10/2023 09:28 AM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 101 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, vacating the judgment of the district court and remanding the case for further proceedings consistent with this order, by DAL, RSP, RDS, FILED.[3496452] [22-1533]--[Edited 04/10/2023 by YL] [Entered: 04/10/2023 09:18 AM]
March 29, 2023 Filing 99 CASE, to DAL, RSP, RDS, SUBMITTED.[3491051] [22-1533] [Entered: 03/29/2023 10:14 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 98 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3487084] [22-1533] [Entered: 03/21/2023 02:46 PM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 97 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for appeal to be placed on submission, [ # 93 ] filed by Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. [3486968][97] [22-1533] [Entered: 03/21/2023 01:17 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 96 INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3486374] [22-1533] [Entered: 03/20/2023 03:27 PM]
March 17, 2023 Filing 93 MOTION to have appeal heard on submission on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 03/17/2023 by CM/ECF. [3485759] [22-1533]--[Edited 03/20/2023 by BM] [Entered: 03/17/2023 06:33 PM]
February 24, 2023 Filing 91 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT [ # 87 ], on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED.[3474214] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:32 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 90 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 02/10/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467471] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/10/2023 02:08 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 02/10/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467423] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/10/2023 01:35 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 87 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, [86], on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED.[3467402] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/10/2023 01:20 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 86 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 02/10/2023 by CM/ECF.[3467326] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/10/2023 12:39 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 85 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 02/10/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467083] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/10/2023 09:56 AM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 84 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3466778] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/09/2023 03:41 PM]
February 7, 2023 Filing 83 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/29/2023, SET.[3465261] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/07/2023 04:01 PM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 81 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Zachary Winthrop Silverman, Esq. for Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 02/02/2023 by CM/ECF. [3462893] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/02/2023 11:07 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 79 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Christina Rieker, Esq. for Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 02/02/2023 by CM/ECF. [3462847] [22-1533] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:28 AM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 74 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/27/2023, PROPOSED.[3446492] [22-1533] [Entered: 01/04/2023 02:20 PM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 73 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 12/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3444872] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/30/2022 01:55 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 70 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Baruch Gottesman, Esq. for Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 12/28/2022 by CM/ECF. [3444081] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:52 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 69 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Christina Rieker, Esq. for Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 12/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3443382] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:44 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 67 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Zachary Winthrop Silverman, Esq. for Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 12/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3443345] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:28 PM]
December 13, 2022 Filing 62 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 12/13/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435792] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/13/2022 12:14 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 60 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Marc Frohlich and Frohlich Financial Group, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF. [3433749] [22-1533] [Entered: 12/09/2022 08:56 AM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 54 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 11/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3416633] [22-1533] [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:35 PM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 53 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 177-320), on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 11/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3416632] [22-1533] [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:35 PM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 52 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-176), on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 11/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3416631] [22-1533] [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:34 PM]
October 5, 2022 Filing 50 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/07/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3394177] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/05/2022 02:56 PM]
October 4, 2022 Filing 48 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/08/2022, appellee's brief due date as 12/13/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3393590] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/04/2022 05:03 PM]
October 4, 2022 Filing 47 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/08/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3393543] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/04/2022 04:29 PM]
October 4, 2022 Filing 45 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3393266] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/04/2022 12:56 PM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 42 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, informing Court of proposed due date 10/03/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 10/03/2022 by CM/ECF.[3392487] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/03/2022 01:19 PM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to reinstate appeal [ # 19 ] filed by Appellant Salaman Oberlander, by BR, FILED. [3392402][34] [22-1533] [Entered: 10/03/2022 12:04 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 30 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 09/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3387155] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:20 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 28 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 09/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3387149] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:17 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 26 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 09/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3386571] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/22/2022 09:35 AM]
September 21, 2022 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Zachary Winthrop Silverman for American General Life Insurance Company, in case 22-1533 , [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3386143] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/21/2022 02:13 PM]
September 20, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF. [3385660] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/20/2022 05:38 PM]
September 13, 2022 Filing 21 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 09/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3381236] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/13/2022 02:22 PM]
September 13, 2022 Filing 20 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 09/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3381234] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/13/2022 02:21 PM]
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 09/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3380723] [22-1533] [Entered: 09/12/2022 11:21 PM]
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, [ # 13 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Salaman Oberlander failure to file C & D, EFFECTIVE. [3374768] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/31/2022 01:23 PM]
August 18, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. Service date 08/18/2022 by CM/ECF, email.[3367548] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/18/2022 02:35 PM]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, dated 08/04/2022, dismissing appeal by 08/18/2022, unless Appellant Salaman Oberlander, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[3360222] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/04/2022 03:35 PM]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 08/04/2022, dismissing appeal by 08/18/2022, unless Appellant Salaman Oberlander, submits Forms C, and D, FILED.[3360215] [22-1533] [Entered: 08/04/2022 03:31 PM]
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 9 ], [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellee Marc Frohlich and Frohlich Financial Group, LLC, FILED.[3357038] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/29/2022 04:44 PM]
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 07/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3356799] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/29/2022 02:06 PM]
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [8], on behalf of Appellee Marc Frohlich and Frohlich Financial Group, LLC, FILED.[3356544] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/29/2022 10:59 AM]
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Frohlich Financial Group, LLC and Marc Frohlich, FILED. Service date 07/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3356499] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/29/2022 10:19 AM]
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee American General Life Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 07/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3356480] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/29/2022 09:57 AM]
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Christina Marie Rieker, Esq. for Appellee Marc Frohlich and Frohlich Financial Group, LLC, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3349373] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:34 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3349370] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:31 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/17/2022, RECEIVED.[3349367] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:30 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/16/2022, RECEIVED.[3349365] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:29 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15753774, FILED.[3349364] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:29 PM]
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Salaman Oberlander, FILED. [3349360] [22-1533] [Entered: 07/18/2022 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Oberlander v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Salaman Oberlander, individually and as Trustee of The Ader I Trust dated December 11, 2014
Represented By: Baruch Gottesman Esq.
Represented By: Baruch S. Gottesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew P. Fishkin Esq.
Represented By: Zachary Winthrop Silverman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marc Frohlich
Represented By: Christina Marie Rieker Esq.
Represented By: Christina Rieker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frohlich Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Christina Marie Rieker Esq.
Represented By: Christina Rieker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?