Sierra v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Maria E. Sierra
Defendant / Appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Case Number: 22-1574
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS INJURY-Fed Emplr Liabil
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 62 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[3591122] [22-1574] [Entered: 11/17/2023 09:21 AM]
November 17, 2023 Filing 61 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/17/2023, to SDNY, ISSUED.[3591121] [22-1574] [Entered: 11/17/2023 09:21 AM]
November 17, 2023 Filing 60 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, vacating judgment of the district court granting summary judgment and remanding the action to the district court for trial proceedings, by ECL, MP, SALM, FILED.[3591119] [22-1574] [Entered: 11/17/2023 09:18 AM]
May 31, 2023 Filing 59 CASE, to ECL, MP, SALM, SUBMITTED.[3523197] [22-1574] [Entered: 05/31/2023 10:06 AM]
March 31, 2023 Filing 58 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3493110] [22-1574] [Entered: 03/31/2023 05:21 PM]
March 31, 2023 Filing 57 CASE CALENDARING, on submission for 05/31/2023, SET.[3492535] [22-1574] [Entered: 03/31/2023 10:47 AM]
March 9, 2023 Filing 56 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/30/2023, PROPOSED.[3480789] [22-1574] [Entered: 03/09/2023 11:01 AM]
February 13, 2023 Filing 55 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Sophia Ree for Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp., FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3468244] [22-1574] [Entered: 02/13/2023 02:26 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 54 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Steven L. Barkan, Esq. for Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 02/10/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467296] [22-1574] [Entered: 02/10/2023 12:19 PM]
January 30, 2023 Filing 51 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp., FILED. Service date 01/30/2023 by CM/ECF. [3460860] [22-1574] [Entered: 01/30/2023 02:59 PM]
November 2, 2022 Filing 49 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp. Brief due date as 01/30/2023, FILED.[3412332] [22-1574] [Entered: 11/02/2022 10:12 AM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 42 EXHIBITS, six CD-ROMs containing Exhibit L to Declaration of Sophia Ree, dated January 5, 2022 - Audio Statement of Plaintiff, dated July 11, 2018, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 10/31/2022 by US mail.[3411452] [22-1574] [Entered: 11/01/2022 12:09 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 39 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp., informing Court of proposed due date 01/30/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF.[3410985] [22-1574] [Entered: 10/31/2022 05:50 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 38 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF. [3410776] [22-1574] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:09 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Audio Exhibit, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3410774] [22-1574] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:08 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 36 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 237-399), on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF.[3410773] [22-1574] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:08 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 35 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-236), on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF.[3410770] [22-1574] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:06 PM]
August 24, 2022 Filing 32 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Maria E. Sierra Brief due date as 10/31/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 10/31/2022, FILED.[3370417] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/24/2022 08:26 AM]
August 15, 2022 Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Scheduling Notice [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3365555] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/15/2022 04:26 PM]
August 15, 2022 Filing 28 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, informing Court of proposed due date 10/31/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 08/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3365547] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/15/2022 04:19 PM]
August 12, 2022 Filing 27 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION [26], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3364350] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/12/2022 11:07 AM]
August 10, 2022 Filing 26 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, informing Court of proposed due date 08/10/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3363134] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/10/2022 02:08 PM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3362560] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/09/2022 05:09 PM]
August 9, 2022 Filing 24 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended-Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/09/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3362231] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/09/2022 01:24 PM]
August 5, 2022 Filing 21 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/30/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3361153] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/05/2022 04:56 PM]
August 5, 2022 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3361040] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:42 PM]
August 5, 2022 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 08/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3361001] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/05/2022 03:20 PM]
August 5, 2022 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp., FILED. Service date 08/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3360901] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:17 PM]
August 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE, to Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corp., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3360719] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:26 AM]
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D, [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3359538] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/03/2022 05:10 PM]
August 3, 2022 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 08/03/2022 by CM/ECF.[3359306] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/03/2022 02:15 PM]
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 08/03/2022 by CM/ECF.[3359304] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/03/2022 02:14 PM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [8], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3358412] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/02/2022 01:43 PM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [9], on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED.[3358401] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/02/2022 01:38 PM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 08/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3358351] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/02/2022 12:59 PM]
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. Service date 08/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3358346] [22-1574] [Entered: 08/02/2022 12:57 PM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3352224] [22-1574] [Entered: 07/21/2022 05:26 PM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26443190, FILED.[3352222] [22-1574] [Entered: 07/21/2022 05:24 PM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3352220] [22-1574] [Entered: 07/21/2022 05:23 PM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM ORDER AND DECISION, dated 06/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3352218] [22-1574] [Entered: 07/21/2022 05:23 PM]
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Maria E. Sierra, FILED. [3352215] [22-1574] [Entered: 07/21/2022 05:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sierra v. National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maria E. Sierra
Represented By: Steven L. Barkan
Represented By: Steven L. Barkan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Railroad Passenger Corp.
Represented By: Sophia Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?