Walker v. Town of Greenburgh
Defendant: Town of Greenburgh
Plaintiff / Appellee: Lakeisha Walker and Otte Armstrong
Defendant / Appellant: D. Jakasal, individually, E.M. Olson, individually, D.A. Valentine, individually, D.P. Omalley, individually, I. Yuan, individually, M.T. Pacino, individually and John and Jane Doe, 1-10, individually
Case Number: 22-1594
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 102 MOTION ORDER, granting Appellees' motion for an extension of time to 01/11/2024 to file the response brief [ # 98 ], filed by Appellee Lakeisha Walker and Otte Armstrong, by JAC, FILED. [3590157][102] [22-1594] [Entered: 11/14/2023 03:59 PM]
November 8, 2023 Filing 98 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, FILED. Service date 11/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3588802] [22-1594] [Entered: 11/08/2023 04:07 PM]
September 11, 2023 Filing 97 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker Brief due date as 11/27/2023, FILED.[3566942] [22-1594] [Entered: 09/11/2023 12:34 PM]
September 11, 2023 Filing 94 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, informing Court of proposed due date 11/27/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 09/11/2023 by CM/ECF.[3566789] [22-1594] [Entered: 09/11/2023 10:30 AM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to dismiss to the merits panel. Appellees to file a scheduling notification within 14 days, [ # 62 ] filed by Appellee Lakeisha Walker and Otte Armstrong, by ECL, FILED. [3561920][91] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/28/2023 02:00 PM]
August 16, 2023 Filing 85 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 81 ], on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, FILED. Service date 08/16/2023 by CM/ECF.[3557449][85] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/16/2023 06:54 PM]
August 1, 2023 Filing 81 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 62 ], on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 08/01/2023 by CM/ECF. [3549573] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/01/2023 09:37 AM]
July 5, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION ORDER, staying decision on motion to dismiss and directing Appellants to file supplemental declaration within 28 days of the present order. It is further ORDERED that, within 14 days after the filing of Appellants supplemental declaration, Appellees respond to the declaration [ # 62 ], filed by Appellee Lakeisha Walker and Otte Armstrong, by MP, FILED. [3536840][79] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/05/2023 09:30 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 71 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 66 ], on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, FILED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF.[3455592][71] [22-1594] [Entered: 01/19/2023 05:22 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 66 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 62 ], on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, John and Jane Doe, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 01/12/2023 by CM/ECF. [3451626] [22-1594] [Entered: 01/12/2023 02:27 PM]
January 2, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, FILED. Service date 01/02/2023 by CM/ECF. [3444927] [22-1594] [Entered: 01/02/2023 08:37 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 58 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker Brief due date as 01/23/2023, FILED.[3410792] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:25 PM]
October 31, 2022 Filing 55 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, informing Court of proposed due date 01/23/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 10/31/2022 by CM/ECF.[3410769] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/31/2022 03:06 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 49 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF. [3406704] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 06:28 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for DVD Exhibit (Helmet Camera Recording), on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3406703] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 06:28 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 47 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 753-967), on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3406702] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 06:26 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 46 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 509-752), on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3406701] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 06:25 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 45 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, (pp. 215-508), on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3406678] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 05:19 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 44 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 4, (pp. 1-214), on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3406677] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/24/2022 05:18 PM]
October 19, 2022 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Daniel A. Seymour for D. Jakasal, I. Yuan, E.M. Olson, D.A. Valentine, and M.T. Pacino, D.P. Omalley, in case 22-1594, [ # 42 ], ADDED.[3403676] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/19/2022 02:46 PM]
October 19, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 10/19/2022 by CM/ECF. [3403626] [22-1594] [Entered: 10/19/2022 02:03 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 40 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant John and Jane Doe, informing a brief will not be filed on behalf of the Appellant John and Jane Doe, RECEIVED. Service date 08/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3373309] [22-1594]--[Edited 08/29/2022 by RW] [Entered: 08/29/2022 03:28 PM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 39 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan Brief due date as 10/24/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 10/24/2022, FILED.[3373052] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/29/2022 11:18 AM]
August 25, 2022 Filing 35 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3371471] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/25/2022 11:21 AM]
August 24, 2022 Filing 30 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant John and Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/24/2022 by CM/ECF.[3370611] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/24/2022 10:36 AM]
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, dated 08/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 09/06/2022, unless Appellants John and Jane Does 1-10, submit Form D, FILED.[3369991] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/23/2022 01:46 PM]
August 22, 2022 Filing 27 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant John and Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/22/2022 by CM/ECF.[3369154] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:08 PM]
August 22, 2022 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, William H. Bave, [ # 25 ], in place of attorney Daniel A. Seymour, SUBSTITUTED.[3369027] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/22/2022 12:56 PM]
August 22, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant John and Jane Doe, FILED. Service date 08/22/2022 by CM/ECF. [3368922] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/22/2022 11:49 AM]
August 12, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lakeisha Walker and Otte Armstrong, FILED. Service date 08/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3364757] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/12/2022 04:16 PM]
August 12, 2022 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker, FILED. Service date 08/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3364746] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/12/2022 04:12 PM]
August 11, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE, to Appellees Otte Armstrong and Lakeisha Walker , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3363845] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/11/2022 02:26 PM]
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 08/11/2022, dismissing appeal by 08/25/2022, unless Appellants John and Jane Doe, 1-10, submit Form C, FILED.[3363838] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/11/2022 02:19 PM]
August 4, 2022 Filing 19 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, informing Court of proposed due date 10/24/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 08/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3359975] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/04/2022 12:45 PM]
August 4, 2022 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 08/04/2022 by CM/ECF.[3359954] [22-1594] [Entered: 08/04/2022 12:32 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 15 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 07/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3355417] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 02:07 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 14 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 07/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3355414] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 02:05 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 12 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellants D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED.[3355396] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 01:58 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, William H. Bave, Jr., [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Daniel A. Seymour, SUBSTITUTED.[3355392] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 01:57 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, John and Jane Doe, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 07/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3355262] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 12:09 PM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance as substitute counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellants D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED.[3355206] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 11:35 AM]
July 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant D. Jakasal, John and Jane Doe, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. Service date 07/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3355200] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/27/2022 11:31 AM]
July 25, 2022 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Daniel A. Seymour, Esq. for Appellants John and Jane Doe, D. Jakasal, E.M. Olson, D.A. Valentine, D.P. Omalley, I. Yuan and M.T. Pacino, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3353396] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:22 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3353391] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:20 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3353388] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:18 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants D. Jakasal, John and Jane Doe, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26405792, FILED.[3353382] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:16 AM]
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants D. Jakasal, John and Jane Doe, E.M. Olson, D.P. Omalley, M.T. Pacino, D.A. Valentine and I. Yuan, FILED. [3353379] [22-1594] [Entered: 07/25/2022 11:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walker v. Town of Greenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lakeisha Walker
Represented By: Lissa Green-Stark Esq.
Represented By: Brett Harris Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Otte Armstrong
Represented By: Lissa Green-Stark Esq.
Represented By: Brett Harris Klein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Greenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: D. Jakasal, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: E.M. Olson, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: D.A. Valentine, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: D.P. Omalley, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: I. Yuan, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: M.T. Pacino, individually
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John and Jane Doe, 1-10, individually
Represented By: Daniel A. Seymour Esq.
Represented By: William Harold Bave Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?