Davis v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Plaintiff / Appellant: Kathryn Louise Davis
Defendant / Appellee: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 22-215
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: SOC SEC-SSID Title XVI
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, [23], on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3280714] [22-215] [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:03 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D-P, [22], on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3280683] [22-215] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:50 PM]
March 18, 2022 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [21], on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3280634] [22-215] [Entered: 03/18/2022 02:22 PM]
March 16, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, FILED. No service.[3279965] [22-215] [Entered: 03/17/2022 03:25 PM]
March 16, 2022 Filing 22 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, FILED. No service.[3279941] [22-215] [Entered: 03/17/2022 03:12 PM]
March 16, 2022 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, FILED. No service.[3279929] [22-215] [Entered: 03/17/2022 03:06 PM]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 02/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 03/16/2022, unless Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3266387] [22-215] [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:35 PM]
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 02/23/2022, dismissing appeal by 03/16/2022, unless Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3266333] [22-215] [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:04 PM]
February 8, 2022 Filing 17 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/04/2022, granting IFP, RECEIVED.[3257321] [22-215] [Entered: 02/08/2022 10:57 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Joseph A Pantoja for Commissioner of Social Security, in case 22-215 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[3256509] [22-215] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:08 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security, FILED. Service date 02/07/2022 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3256451] [22-215] [Entered: 02/07/2022 10:28 AM]
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3255894] [22-215] [Entered: 02/04/2022 11:49 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[3255389] [22-215] [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:36 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security, FILED. Service date 02/03/2022 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3255174] [22-215] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:11 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3254716] [22-215] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:57 PM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3254709] [22-215] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:51 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/08/2021, RECEIVED.[3254699] [22-215] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:48 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/08/2021, RECEIVED.[3254692] [22-215] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:46 PM]
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kathryn Louise Davis, FILED. [3254669] [22-215] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kathryn Louise Davis
Represented By: Kathryn Louise Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joseph A. Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?