Giordani v. U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff / Appellant: Alan Giordani
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. Department of Justice, New York State, City of New York, Law Office of John Landers, Paul Giordani, Horwin Realty Inc., Greenfield Stein and Senior, LLP and John Does 1-100, names both known and unknown and will be further supplemented through amended complaint
Case Number: 22-3223
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 112 CURED DEFECTIVE, motion to reinstate the appeal, [ # 105 ], [ # 106 ], [ # 109 ], [ # 108 ], [ # 110 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3591671] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/20/2023 10:21 AM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for both Motion papers, Appendix and Appellant's Brief, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3589575] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/13/2023 03:52 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 109 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3589476] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/13/2023 01:45 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 108 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-194), on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3589475] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/13/2023 01:43 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 107 MOTION, to file supporting papers, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3589470] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/13/2023 01:29 PM]
November 13, 2023 Filing 106 MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3589469] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/13/2023 01:26 PM]
November 9, 2023 Filing 105 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to reinstate the appeal, [ # 104 ],[ # 104 ], [ # 103 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3588878] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/09/2023 08:42 AM]
November 8, 2023 Filing 104 MOTION, to reinstate appeal, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3588869] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/08/2023 11:00 PM]
November 8, 2023 Filing 103 MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3588616] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/08/2023 09:10 AM]
November 7, 2023 Filing 102 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for reconsideration as moot [ # 95 ] filed by Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. [3588152][102] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/07/2023 09:32 AM]
November 6, 2023 Filing 100 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[3587827] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/06/2023 11:55 AM]
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER, [ # 78 ] appeal dismissed for Appellant Alan Giordani failure to file brief and appendix, EFFECTIVE.[3587820] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/06/2023 11:45 AM]
November 6, 2023 Filing 96 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to reconsider [ # 94 ], [ # 95 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3587682] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/06/2023 09:25 AM]
November 3, 2023 Filing 95 MOTION, to reconsider, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3587583] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/03/2023 06:01 PM]
November 3, 2023 Filing 94 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to reconsider, [ # 93 ],[ # 93 ],[ # 93 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3587305] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/03/2023 11:48 AM]
November 2, 2023 Filing 93 MOTION, for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 1292(b)), for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 158(d)), to reconsider, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 11/02/2023 by CM/ECF. [3587142] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/02/2023 06:39 PM]
November 1, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to extend time [ # 87 ] filed by Appellant Alan Giordani, by WJN, FILED. [3586489][92] [22-3223] [Entered: 11/01/2023 12:12 PM]
October 31, 2023 Filing 88 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to extend time [ # 87 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3586160] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/31/2023 03:22 PM]
October 31, 2023 Filing 87 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 10/31/2023 by CM/ECF. [3586052] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/31/2023 11:49 AM]
October 31, 2023 Filing 86 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time, [ # 84 ], [ # 85 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3586011] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/31/2023 10:21 AM]
October 30, 2023 Filing 85 ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF THE NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD ORDER, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 10/30/2023 by CM/ECF.[3585919] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/30/2023 09:01 PM]
October 30, 2023 Filing 84 ANSWER TO APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF THE NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD ORDER, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 10/30/2023 by CM/ECF.[3585917] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/30/2023 08:34 PM]
October 26, 2023 Filing 80 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time, [79], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3584890] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/26/2023 12:26 PM]
October 26, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION, for___relief, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 10/26/2023 by CM/ECF. [3584833] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/26/2023 11:18 AM]
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER, dated 10/05/2023, it is hereby ordered that Appellants brief must be filed on or before 11/02/2023. The appeal is dismissed effective 11/02/2023, if the brief is not filed by that date, FILED.[3577920] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/05/2023 01:04 PM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 73 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION [ # 72 ], [ # 70 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3576222] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/02/2023 11:56 AM]
October 2, 2023 Filing 72 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, L.R. 32.1 Scheduling Notification, [ # 71 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3576209] [22-3223] [Entered: 10/02/2023 11:47 AM]
September 29, 2023 Filing 71 AMENDED , on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 09/29/2023 by CM/ECF.[3575600] [22-3223] [Entered: 09/29/2023 01:48 PM]
September 29, 2023 Filing 70 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, informing Court of proposed due date 11/27/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2023 by CM/ECF.[3575595] [22-3223] [Entered: 09/29/2023 01:41 PM]
August 11, 2023 Filing 68 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3555105] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/11/2023 09:18 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 65 CAPTION, removing Greenfield Stein and Senior, LLP, to match what is listed on district court record, AMENDED.[3551338] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 04:00 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 64 ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for New York State, as per letter at docket entry 28, TERMINATED.[3551326] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:52 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 63 CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 55 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551308] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:45 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 62 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C/A, [54], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551295] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:41 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 61 CURED DEFECTIVE Form D, [ # 53 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551292] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:40 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 60 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Corrected Form C, [51], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551285] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:36 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 59 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Corrected Form C/A, [ # 49 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551279] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:32 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 58 CURED DEFECTIVE Amended Form A, [ # 48 ], [ # 55 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551277] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:29 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 57 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amended Form A, [ # 48 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551272] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:26 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 56 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 47 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3551268] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 03:23 PM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 55 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3551001] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:15 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 54 FORM C/A, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550990] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 11:08 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 53 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550978] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:58 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550976] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:56 AM]
August 3, 2023 Filing 51 CORRECTED FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550969] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/03/2023 10:50 AM]
August 2, 2023 Filing 50 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/02/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550673] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/02/2023 03:30 PM]
August 1, 2023 Filing 49 CORRECTED FORM C/A, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/01/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550042] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/01/2023 05:46 PM]
August 1, 2023 Filing 48 AMENDED FORM A, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 08/01/2023 by CM/ECF.[3550030] [22-3223] [Entered: 08/01/2023 05:01 PM]
July 31, 2023 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 07/31/2023 by CM/ECF.[3549171] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/31/2023 12:37 PM]
July 31, 2023 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3549011] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:57 AM]
July 31, 2023 Filing 45 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [ # 43 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3549004] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/31/2023 09:52 AM]
July 25, 2023 Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 07/25/2023 by CM/ECF.[3546795] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/25/2023 07:15 PM]
July 25, 2023 Filing 43 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 07/25/2023 by CM/ECF.[3546792] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/25/2023 07:07 PM]
July 25, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice. Appellant is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order. [ # 37 ], by MP, FILED. [3546154][42] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/25/2023 09:57 AM]
July 11, 2023 Filing 39 CURED DEFECTIVE Motion, for admission pro hac vice, [ # 35 ], [ # 37 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3539609] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/11/2023 08:51 AM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. Service date 07/10/2023 by US mail.[3539606] [22-3223] [Entered: 07/11/2023 08:47 AM]
June 22, 2023 Filing 35 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for pro hac vice, [ # 34 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3532859] [22-3223] [Entered: 06/22/2023 09:14 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. No service. [3532858] [22-3223] [Entered: 06/22/2023 09:09 PM]
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, dated 02/15/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2023, unless Appellant Alan Giorani, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, FILED.[3469757] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/15/2023 01:00 PM]
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, dated 02/15/2023, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2023, unless Appellant Alan Giordani, submits Form D-P, FILED.[3469746] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/15/2023 12:50 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 33 LETTER, dated 02/10/2023, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, requesting that it no longer be identified as counsel for defendant-appellee City of New York., RECEIVED. Service date 02/10/2023 by US mail.[3469848] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/15/2023 02:06 PM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 30 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Paul Giordani, regarding Greenfield Stein & Senior listing on the docket, RECEIVED. Service date 02/02/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3463099] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/02/2023 02:02 PM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 29 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Paul Giordani, regarding the Law Firm of John Landers and requesting that the firm be removed as defendant-appellee, RECEIVED. Service date 02/02/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3463035] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/02/2023 12:53 PM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 28 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee New York State, informing the Court that the New York State Attorney Generals Office does not currently represent the state defendant, and thus cannot appear as counsel or file an appellees brief. They further request to be removed as counsel., RECEIVED. Service date 02/01/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3462206] [22-3223] [Entered: 02/01/2023 11:31 AM]
January 18, 2023 Filing 27 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Mr. Alan Vincent Giordani, Esq. for Appellant Alan Giordani, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3454075] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/18/2023 10:52 AM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Angelo Grasso for Paul Giordani, in case 22-3223, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3451912] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/12/2023 05:54 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Seth LeMaster, for Greenfield Stein and Senior, LLP, TERMINATED.[3451903] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/12/2023 05:43 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Paul Giordani, FILED. Service date 01/12/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3451873] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/12/2023 04:58 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 23 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Paul Giordani, requesting caption change, RECEIVED. Service date 01/12/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3451802] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/12/2023 04:07 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Paul Giordani, FILED. Service date 01/12/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3451643] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/12/2023 02:40 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE, to Appellee Law Office of John Landers, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[3445671] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:24 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 20 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 17 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED.[3445664] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:23 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 19 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [ # 16 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED.[3445662] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:22 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [12], on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED.[3445650] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:18 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED.[3445644] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:14 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Philip Rudolph DePaul for U.S. Department of Justice, in case 22-3223, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[3445641] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 03:11 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 01/03/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3445554] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 02:05 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 01/03/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3445548] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 01:58 PM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 01/03/2023 by US mail. [3445304] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 11:37 AM]
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 01/03/2023 by US mail.[3445281] [22-3223] [Entered: 01/03/2023 11:27 AM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Seth LeMaster, Esq. for Appellee Paul Giordani and Greenfield Stein and Senior, LLP, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3444606] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:54 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 8 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3444601] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:51 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3444596] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:49 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, district court receipt # 100003686, FILED.[3444594] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:48 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/09/2022, RECEIVED.[3444592] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:47 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/07/2022, RECEIVED.[3444590] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:45 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alan Giordani, FILED. [3444583] [22-3223] [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Giordani v. U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan Giordani
Represented By: Alan Giordani
Represented By: Alan Vincent Giordani Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Varuni Nelson
Represented By: Philip Rudolph DePaul Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York State
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Sylvia Hinds-Radix Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Law Office of John Landers
Represented By: Law Office of John Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Giordani
Represented By: Seth LeMaster Esq.
Represented By: Angelo Grasso Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Horwin Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Greenfield Stein and Senior, LLP
Represented By: Seth LeMaster Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does 1-100, names both known and unknown and will be further supplemented through amended complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?