Horn v. Medical Marijuana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Harp-Horn
Defendant: Dixie Botanicals
Plaintiff / Appellant: Douglas J. Horn
Defendant / Appellee: Medical Marijuana, Inc., Dixie Holdings, LLC, AKA Dixie Elixirs and Red Dice Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 22-349
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-RICO

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 21, 2023 Summary Horn v. Medical Marijuana, Inc.
August 22, 2023 Summary Horn v. Medical Marijuana, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3568224] [22-349] [Entered: 09/13/2023 02:12 PM]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED JUDGMENT, FILED.[3559774] [22-349] [Entered: 08/22/2023 02:51 PM]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED OPINION, by JMW, GEL, BR, FILED.[3559509] [22-349] [Entered: 08/22/2023 09:15 AM]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JUDGMENT, FILED.[3559172] [22-349] [Entered: 08/21/2023 02:29 PM]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[3558829] [22-349] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:07 AM]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/21/2023, to WDNY, ISSUED.[3558828] [22-349] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:06 AM]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION, vacating the district courts order granting Appellees motion for summary judgment, and remanding for further proceedings consistent with this Opinion, by JMW, GEL, BR, FILED.[3558822] [22-349] [Entered: 08/21/2023 09:03 AM]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CASE, to JMW, GEL, BR, SUBMITTED.[3472347] [22-349] [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:04 AM]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3471875] [22-349] [Entered: 02/21/2023 01:09 PM]
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, informing the Court the parties have waived the right to participate in Oral Argument scheduled 02/22/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 02/21/2023 by CM/ECF.[3471703] [22-349]--[Edited 02/21/2023 by RW] [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:01 AM]
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3468333] [22-349] [Entered: 02/13/2023 03:34 PM]
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3439500] [22-349] [Entered: 12/19/2022 12:40 PM]
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 02/22/2023, SET.[3435550] [22-349] [Entered: 12/13/2022 09:45 AM]
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 11/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3421666] [22-349] [Entered: 11/17/2022 12:18 PM]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 02/21/2023, PROPOSED.[3415914] [22-349] [Entered: 11/08/2022 09:57 AM]
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to 11/17/2022 to file a reply brief [ # 71 ], filed by Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. [3413307][76] [22-349] [Entered: 11/03/2022 10:46 AM]
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Jeffrey M. Benjamin, Esq. for Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 10/21/2022 by CM/ECF. [3405293] [22-349] [Entered: 10/21/2022 12:37 PM]
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 10/19/2022 by CM/ECF. [3403894] [22-349] [Entered: 10/19/2022 04:50 PM]
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JOINDER LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Dixie Holdings, LLC, informing they join in the brief filed by Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 09/30/2022 by CM/ECF.[3391648] [22-349]--[Edited 09/30/2022 by RW] [Entered: 09/30/2022 01:52 PM]
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/29/2022 by CM/ECF. [3391050] [22-349] [Entered: 09/29/2022 04:20 PM]
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Dixie Holdings, LLC, Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC Brief due date as 09/30/2022, FILED.[3356384] [22-349] [Entered: 07/29/2022 08:58 AM]
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 09/30/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 07/28/2022 by CM/ECF.[3355935] [22-349] [Entered: 07/28/2022 12:22 PM]
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 07/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3348716] [22-349] [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:33 PM]
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-285), on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 07/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3348706] [22-349] [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:26 PM]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for an extension to 07/15/2022 to file opening brief [ # 49 ], filed by Appellant Douglas J. Horn, by JAC, FILED. [3316809][53] [22-349] [Entered: 05/17/2022 04:15 PM]
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314421] [22-349] [Entered: 05/13/2022 09:03 AM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ATTORNEY, Scott Mancuso for Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, in case 22-349, [ # 45 ], ADDED.[3290853] [22-349] [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:27 PM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 45 ], on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED.[3290851] [22-349] [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:26 PM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3290752] [22-349] [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:07 PM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [43], on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED.[3290671] [22-349] [Entered: 04/04/2022 03:48 PM]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/04/2022 by CM/ECF. [3290343] [22-349] [Entered: 04/04/2022 01:55 PM]
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, dated 04/01/2022, setting 05/31/2022 as Appellant Douglas J. Horn's brief due date, FILED.[3289227] [22-349] [Entered: 04/01/2022 09:23 AM]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, informing Court of proposed due date 05/30/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 03/31/2022 by CM/ECF.[3288865] [22-349] [Entered: 03/31/2022 01:34 PM]
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3288387] [22-349] [Entered: 03/30/2022 04:53 PM]
March 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 03/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3285532] [22-349] [Entered: 03/27/2022 07:38 AM]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, dated 03/15/2022, dismissing appeal by 03/29/2022, unless Appellant Douglas J. Horn, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, FILED.[3277855] [22-349] [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:57 AM]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 13 ], [ # 18 ], [ # 24 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3277792] [22-349] [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:34 AM]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 03/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3275575] [22-349] [Entered: 03/10/2022 12:17 PM]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Hanoch Sheps for Dixie Holdings, LLC, in case 22-349, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[3274254] [22-349] [Entered: 03/09/2022 08:42 AM]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [22], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3274244] [22-349] [Entered: 03/09/2022 08:35 AM]
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Dixie Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/08/2022 by CM/ECF. [3273678] [22-349] [Entered: 03/08/2022 11:11 AM]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 03/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3272527] [22-349] [Entered: 03/07/2022 08:56 AM]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3271124] [22-349] [Entered: 03/03/2022 01:11 PM]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D[ # 14 ], [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3271121] [22-349] [Entered: 03/03/2022 01:09 PM]
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [16], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3271118] [22-349] [Entered: 03/03/2022 01:04 PM]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 03/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3270375] [22-349] [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:21 PM]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 03/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3270374] [22-349] [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:20 PM]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Medical Marijuana, Inc. and Red Dice Holdings, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3269560] [22-349] [Entered: 03/01/2022 02:22 PM]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [12], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3269221] [22-349] [Entered: 03/01/2022 10:25 AM]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED.[3269209] [22-349] [Entered: 03/01/2022 10:19 AM]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 02/28/2022 by CM/ECF, email.[3268622] [22-349] [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:41 PM]
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. Service date 02/28/2022 by CM/ECF, email.[3268621] [22-349] [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:40 PM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, district court receipt # ANYWDC-4504453, FILED.[3265827] [22-349] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:11 AM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT INTERIM JUDGMENT, dated 01/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3265826] [22-349] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:10 AM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3265823] [22-349] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:10 AM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3265821] [22-349] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:09 AM]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Douglas J. Horn, FILED. [3265815] [22-349] [Entered: 02/23/2022 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Horn v. Medical Marijuana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Harp-Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Douglas J. Horn
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Benjamin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Medical Marijuana, Inc.
Represented By: Roy A. Mura Esq.
Represented By: Scott Mancuso Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dixie Holdings, LLC, AKA Dixie Elixirs
Represented By: Jean-Claude Mazzola Esq.
Represented By: Hanoch Sheps Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Red Dice Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Roy A. Mura Esq.
Represented By: Scott Mancuso Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Botanicals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?