Barber v. Steuben County
Defendant: Department Social Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: Tracy Anthony Barber
Defendant / Appellee: Steuben County
Case Number: 22-45
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 45 PAPERS, duplicate Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Form D-P, and scheduling notification, RECEIVED.[3271145] [22-45] [Entered: 03/03/2022 01:28 PM]
March 1, 2022 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. Service date 02/23/2022 by US mail.[3271142][44] [22-45] [Entered: 03/03/2022 01:26 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 41 PAPERS, duplicate Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Form D-P, and scheduling notification, RECEIVED.[3268585] [22-45] [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:07 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. Service date 02/16/2022 by US mail.[3268581][39] [22-45] [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:02 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 34 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION [ # 20 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED.[3262105] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:47 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 33 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED.[3262104] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:45 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 32 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D-P [ # 19 ], [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED.[3262103] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:42 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 31 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel [ # 17 ], [ # 23 ], [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED.[3262102] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:42 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. Service date 02/09/2022 by US mail.[3262101] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:41 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 29 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, informing Court of proposed due date 02/24/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 02/09/2022 by US mail.[3262100] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:40 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 28 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. Service date 02/09/2022 by US mail.[3262099] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:38 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. Service date 02/09/2022 by US mail.[3262098] [22-45] [Entered: 02/15/2022 11:37 PM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 26 PAPERS, copy of MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, FORM C, RECEIVED.[3260056] [22-45] [Entered: 02/11/2022 04:05 PM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [24], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3256583] [22-45] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:45 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 24 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, informing Court of proposed due date 02/08/2022, RECEIVED. No service.[3256576] [22-45] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:42 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, [21], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3256544] [22-45] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:28 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 22 PAPERS, FORM C, RECEIVED.[3256532] [22-45] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:24 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. No Service.[3256529] [22-45] [Entered: 02/07/2022 11:22 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [15], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3255097] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:23 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D-P, [14], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3255081] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:11 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [13], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3255073] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:08 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, [12], on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3255064] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:02 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE, to Appellee Steuben County , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3255011] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:37 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, informing Court of no proposed date given, RECEIVED. No Service.[3255008] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:37 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. No Service.[3254971] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:28 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. No Service.[3254967] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:27 AM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. No Service.[3254963] [22-45] [Entered: 02/03/2022 09:26 AM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3240694] [22-45] [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:47 AM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3240683] [22-45] [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:43 AM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3240669] [22-45] [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:38 AM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 12/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3240665] [22-45] [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:36 AM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Tracy Anthony Barber, FILED. [3240644] [22-45] [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Barber v. Steuben County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tracy Anthony Barber
Represented By: Tracy Anthony Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steuben County
Represented By: Brooks Baker Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?