Thomas-Tupper v. Catholic Charities
Defendant: County of Suffolk and County of Suffolk Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff / Appellant: Theresa Thomas-Tupper, individually and on behalf of her son R.K., a minor and Robert Kellett
Defendant / Appellee: Catholic Charities, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., The Stanan Group and Rockville Centre Diocese
Case Number: 22-689
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Accommodations
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Filing 139 CERTIFIED order receipt, RETURNED.[3575662] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 09/29/2023 02:35 PM]
September 29, 2023 Filing 138 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/29/2023, to EDNY (CENTRAL ISLIP), ISSUED.[3575620] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 09/29/2023 02:09 PM]
September 29, 2023 Filing 137 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese, The Stanan Group and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. in 22-689, -- Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, The Stanan Group and Appellant Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. in 22-812, FILED.[3575616] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 09/29/2023 02:07 PM]
July 7, 2023 Filing 134 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3538642] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/07/2023 03:01 PM]
June 28, 2023 Filing 132 OPPOSITION TO ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [ # 128 ], [ # 130 ], on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED. Service date 06/28/2023 by CM/ECF. [3534871] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 06/28/2023 11:13 AM]
June 27, 2023 Filing 130 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/27/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3534386] [22-689] [Entered: 06/27/2023 03:19 PM]
June 20, 2023 Filing 128 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group, FILED. Service date 06/20/2023 by US mail.[3531088] [22-689] [Entered: 06/20/2023 12:15 PM]
June 16, 2023 Filing 126 CAPTION, pursuant to SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, AMENDED.[3530165] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 06/16/2023 10:07 AM]
June 16, 2023 Filing 125 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[3530159] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 06/16/2023 10:03 AM]
June 16, 2023 Filing 124 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the judgment of the district court, by RSP, RCW, MHP, FILED.[3530155] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 06/16/2023 10:00 AM]
May 24, 2023 Filing 122 CASE, before RSP, RCW, MHP, HEARD.[3520509] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 05/24/2023 10:03 AM]
May 23, 2023 Filing 121 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/23/2023 by CM/ECF. [3520152] [22-689] [Entered: 05/23/2023 02:19 PM]
May 23, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group, FILED. Service date 05/23/2023 by CM/ECF. [3520079] [22-689] [Entered: 05/23/2023 01:20 PM]
May 23, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. Service date 05/23/2023 by CM/ECF. [3520071] [22-689] [Entered: 05/23/2023 01:12 PM]
May 15, 2023 Filing 117 INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3515741] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 05/15/2023 03:28 PM]
March 29, 2023 Filing 116 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3491406] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 03/29/2023 03:04 PM]
March 27, 2023 Filing 115 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/24/2023, SET.[3489966] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 03/27/2023 03:19 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 114 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/22/2023, PROPOSED.[3475401] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 02/28/2023 10:49 AM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 110 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. in 22-689, FILED. Service date 12/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3444847] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/30/2022 09:55 AM]
December 23, 2022 Filing 107 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, FILED. Service date 12/23/2022 by CM/ECF. [3442464] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/23/2022 10:58 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 106 CURED DEFECTIVE: ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT, [ # 105 ], on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED.[3440284] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/20/2022 12:00 PM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 105 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Maia Goodell, Esq. for Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper and Attorney Ms. Maia Goodell, Esq. for Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Attorney Ms. Maia Goodell, Esq. for Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED. Service date 12/20/2022 by CM/ECF. [3440269] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/20/2022 11:47 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 103 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT, [101], on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED.[3440252] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/20/2022 11:28 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 102 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Hillary Jacobs Raimondi for Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. in 22-689, Attorney Hillary Jacobs Raimondi for Appellant Catholic Charities, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Rockville Centre Diocese in 22-812, FILED. Service date 12/20/2022 by CM/ECF. [3440220] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/20/2022 11:04 AM]
December 20, 2022 Filing 101 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Maia Goodell, Esq. for Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Attorney Ms. Maia Goodell, Esq. for Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED. Service date 12/20/2022 by CM/ECF. [3440146] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/20/2022 10:26 AM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 99 CURED DEFECTIVE: ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, FILED.[3435253] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:43 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 98 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT, [96], on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, FILED.[3435247] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:40 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 97 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Cheryl F. Korman for Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, Attorney Cheryl F. Korman for Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435243] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:35 PM]
December 12, 2022 Filing 96 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Cheryl F. Korman for Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, Attorney Cheryl F. Korman for Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435205] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/12/2022 02:57 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 94 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, FILED. Service date 12/09/2022 by CM/ECF. [3434035] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:11 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 91 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780 22, 812, Brief due date as 12/09/2022, FILED.[3401995] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 10/17/2022 04:38 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 90 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, informing Court of proposed due date 12/09/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 10/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3401972] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 10/17/2022 04:14 PM]
October 11, 2022 Filing 84 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. and Rockville Centre Diocese in 22-689, FILED. Service date 10/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3397193] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 10/11/2022 01:47 PM]
October 11, 2022 Filing 83 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, FILED. Service date 10/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3396665] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 10/11/2022 10:05 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 76 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee-Cross-Appellant Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. Brief due date as 10/11/2022, FILED.[3347334] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/13/2022 03:33 PM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 73 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc. in 22-689, informing Court of proposed due date 10/11/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3347126] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/13/2022 12:00 PM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 72 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee-Cross-Appellant The Stanan Group Brief due date as 10/11/2022, FILED.[3347049] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:04 AM]
July 13, 2022 Filing 69 CURED DEFECTIVE: LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [ # 68 ], on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, FILED.[3346864] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/13/2022 09:26 AM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 68 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, informing Court of proposed due date 10/11/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3346664] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/12/2022 05:03 PM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 67 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [66], on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, FILED.[3346650] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/12/2022 04:51 PM]
July 12, 2022 Filing 66 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group in 22-689, informing Court of proposed due date 10/11/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2022 by CM/ECF.[3346561] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/12/2022 03:53 PM]
July 11, 2022 Filing 65 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, FILED. Service date 07/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3345450] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:11 PM]
July 11, 2022 Filing 64 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 251-460), on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED. Service date 07/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3345448] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:10 PM]
July 11, 2022 Filing 63 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-250), on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-689, Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper in 22-780, 22-812, FILED. Service date 07/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3345446] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 07/11/2022 12:09 PM]
May 11, 2022 Filing 59 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3313018] [22-812] [Entered: 05/11/2022 11:44 AM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE, to Appellee Theresa Thomas-Tupper, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3312010] [22-812] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:45 AM]
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER, dated 05/10/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/24/2022, unless Appellant Catholic Charities, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc and Rockville Centre Diocese, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form,, FILED.[3311941] [22-812] [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:06 AM]
May 3, 2022 Filing 53 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3308063] [22-780] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:50 AM]
April 29, 2022 Filing 50 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/12/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3306231] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 04/29/2022 12:09 PM]
April 29, 2022 Filing 49 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/12/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3306230] [22-812] [Entered: 04/29/2022 12:06 PM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 47 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/12/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3305710] [22-689, 22-780] [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:50 PM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 46 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/12/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3305706] [22-780] [Entered: 04/28/2022 03:48 PM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Cheryl F. Korman for The Stanan Group, in case 22-780, [ # 3305102-2 ], ADDED.[3305164] [22-780] [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:32 AM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 43 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 42 ], [ # 3305102-2 ], on behalf of Appellant The Stanan Group, FILED.[3305161] [22-780] [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:30 AM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 42 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [41], on behalf of Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, The Stanan Group in 22-812, FILED.[3305062] [22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 04/28/2022 09:15 AM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, The Stanan Group in 22-812, FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304646] [22-780, 22-689, 22-812] [Entered: 04/27/2022 01:34 PM]
April 18, 2022 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3298293] [22-812] [Entered: 04/18/2022 08:39 AM]
April 15, 2022 Filing 38 CAPTION, 22-812 cross-appeal party designations added, AMENDED.[3297883] [22-689, 22-780, 22-812] [Entered: 04/15/2022 01:47 PM]
April 15, 2022 Filing 36 NOTE: See lead case, 22-689, containing complete set of docket entries.[3297877] [22-812, 22-689] [Entered: 04/15/2022 01:45 PM]
April 15, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Catholic Charities, Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc and Rockville Centre Diocese in 22-812, FILED. [3297867] [22-812, 22-689] [Entered: 04/15/2022 01:40 PM]
April 14, 2022 Filing 33 CAPTION, cross-appeal party designations added, AMENDED.[3296774] [22-689] [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:13 AM]
April 14, 2022 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3296770] [22-780] [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:11 AM]
April 14, 2022 Filing 31 NOTE: See lead case, 22-689, containing complete set of docket entries.[3296768] [22-780, 22-689] [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:10 AM]
April 13, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant The Stanan Group in 22-780, FILED. [3296753] [22-780, 22-689] [Entered: 04/14/2022 11:02 AM]
April 13, 2022 Filing 28 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper Brief due date as 07/11/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 07/11/2022, FILED.[3295845] [22-689] [Entered: 04/13/2022 09:45 AM]
April 13, 2022 Filing 25 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3295774] [22-689] [Entered: 04/13/2022 08:57 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 22 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/12/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[3294867] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 04:40 PM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 19 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 15 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED.[3294559] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 12:27 PM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. Service date 04/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3294509] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:34 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, informing Court of proposed due date 07/11/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 04/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3294493] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:22 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [13], on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED.[3294444] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:45 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. Service date 04/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3294435] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:38 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. Service date 04/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3294432] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:37 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. Service date 04/11/2022 by CM/ECF.[3294418] [22-689] [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:27 AM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Catholic Charities, Rockville Centre Diocese and Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/07/2022 by CM/ECF.[3293104] [22-689] [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:04 PM]
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Cheryl F. Korman for The Stanan Group, in case 22-689, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3292178] [22-689] [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:04 AM]
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group, FILED. Service date 04/06/2022 by CM/ECF. [3292171] [22-689] [Entered: 04/06/2022 10:54 AM]
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Stanan Group, FILED. Service date 04/06/2022 by CM/ECF.[3292169] [22-689] [Entered: 04/06/2022 10:52 AM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3289920] [22-689] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:53 AM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert Kellett and Theresa Thomas-Tupper, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15431560, FILED.[3289918] [22-689] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:53 AM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3289915] [22-689] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:52 AM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/04/2022, RECEIVED.[3289911] [22-689] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:52 AM]
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert Kellett and Theresa Thomas-Tupper, FILED. [3289896] [22-689] [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas-Tupper v. Catholic Charities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Theresa Thomas-Tupper, individually and on behalf of her son R.K., a minor
Represented By: Maia Goodell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Robert Kellett
Represented By: Maia Goodell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Catholic Charities
Represented By: Hillary Jacobs Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thea Bowman F.S.P.A. Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hillary Jacobs Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Stanan Group
Represented By: Janice J. DiGennaro
Represented By: Cheryl F. Korman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rockville Centre Diocese
Represented By: Hillary Jacobs Raimondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Suffolk Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?