Marcial v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jasmin A. Marcial
Defendant / Appellee: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 22-925
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: SOC SEC-SSID Title XVI
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 23 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[3315075] [22-925] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:30 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 05/13/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3315074] [22-925] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:29 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 21 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[3315066] [22-925] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:26 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 17 LETTER, dated 05/13/2022, on behalf of Appellant Jasmin A. Marcial, confirming the Court Attorney for Appellant, Daniel Berger electronically signed his signature on the Stipulation dated 05/12/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3315014] [22-925] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:57 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 13 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3314792] [22-925] [Entered: 05/13/2022 01:40 PM]
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 05/12/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/26/2022, unless Appellant Jasmin A. Marcial submits Form D, FILED.[3314206] [22-925] [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:54 PM]
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 05/12/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/26/2022, unless Appellant Jasmin A. Marcial submits Form C, FILED.[3314200] [22-925] [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:48 PM]
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 05/12/2022, dismissing appeal by 05/26/2022, unless Appellant Jasmin A. Marcial, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[3314193] [22-925] [Entered: 05/12/2022 03:45 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Joseph A Pantoja for Commissioner of Social Security, in case 22-925 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[3307056] [22-925] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:06 PM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security, FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3307048] [22-925] [Entered: 05/02/2022 11:59 AM]
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commissioner of Social Security, FILED. Service date 04/28/2022 by CM/ECF.[3305406] [22-925] [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:47 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3304712] [22-925] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:42 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3304699] [22-925] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:34 PM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jasmin A. Marcial, FILED. [3304690] [22-925] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcial v. Commissioner of Social Securit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jasmin A. Marcial
Represented By: Daniel Berger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Joseph A. Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?