Hodges v. Lutwin
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd.
Defendant / Appellee: Molly Kathleen Lutwin, Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., Keith L. Labis, Francis Academy of Irish Dance and James Early
Case Number: 22-974
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS INJURY-Assault Slander
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for the removal of this matter from the Expedited Appeals Calendar and for an extension of time [ # 41 ] filed by Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., by JON, FILED. [3326254][45] [22-974] [Entered: 06/03/2022 11:17 AM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/31/2022 by CM/ECF. [3323962] [22-974] [Entered: 05/31/2022 04:56 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 39 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 06/30/2022, appellee's brief due date as 08/04/2022,TRANSMITTED.[3322225] [22-974] [Entered: 05/26/2022 02:22 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 38 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3322219] [22-974] [Entered: 05/26/2022 02:18 PM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 35 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/15/2022, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3321589] [22-974] [Entered: 05/25/2022 06:47 PM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 31 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 13 ], [ # 29 ], on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED.[3321090] [22-974] [Entered: 05/25/2022 11:18 AM]
May 25, 2022 Filing 29 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3321018] [22-974] [Entered: 05/25/2022 10:19 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Francis Academy of Irish Dance and Molly Kathleen Lutwin, FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317558] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:31 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [15], [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellee James Early and Keith L. Labis, FILED.[3317379] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:43 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317363] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:27 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee James Early and Keith L. Labis, FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317353] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:18 PM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Daniel Seth Kotler for Molly Kathleen Lutwin Francis Academy of Irish Dance, in case 22-974, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[3317321] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:54 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Allee for Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., in case 22-974, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[3317319] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:52 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Russell Marc Yankwitt for Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., in case 22-974, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[3317318] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:50 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Allee for Keith L. Labis James Early, in case 22-974, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[3317317] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:49 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [15], on behalf of Appellee James Early and Keith L. Labis, FILED.[3317311] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:43 AM]
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Molly Kathleen Lutwin and Francis Academy of Irish Dance, FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF. [3317148] [22-974] [Entered: 05/18/2022 10:05 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3316605] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:29 PM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3316599] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:22 PM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Keith L. Labis and James Early, FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF. [3316574] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:03 PM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee James Early and Keith L. Labis, FILED. Service date 05/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3316568] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:58 PM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Adam Sherman for Jaime Hodges On The Move Ltd., in case 22-974, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3316040] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 08:25 AM]
May 17, 2022 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [10], on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED.[3316038] [22-974] [Entered: 05/17/2022 08:20 AM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant On The Move Ltd. and Jaime Hodges, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by US mail. [3315032] [22-974] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:04 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by US mail.[3314985] [22-974] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:44 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by US mail.[3314983] [22-974] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:43 PM]
May 13, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant On The Move Ltd. and Jaime Hodges, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by US mail.[3314978] [22-974] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:40 PM]
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Thomas Anthony Catalano for Appellee Molly Kathleen Lutwin, Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc. and Francis Academy of Irish Dance, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3307791] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 10:00 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3307786] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:57 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., district court receipt # ANYSDC-26082194, FILED.[3307785] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:57 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3307783] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:56 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3307772] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:49 AM]
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jaime Hodges and On The Move Ltd., FILED. [3307757] [22-974] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hodges v. Lutwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jaime Hodges
Represented By: Tom M. Fini Esq.
Represented By: Adam Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: On The Move Ltd.
Represented By: Tom M. Fini Esq.
Represented By: Adam Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Molly Kathleen Lutwin
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Catalano
Represented By: Daniel Seth Kotler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Irish Dancing Teachers Association of North America-Mid-Atlantic Region, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Catalano
Represented By: Benjamin Allee
Represented By: Russell Marc Yankwitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Keith L. Labis
Represented By: Russell Marc Yankwitt
Represented By: Benjamin Allee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Francis Academy of Irish Dance
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Catalano
Represented By: Daniel Seth Kotler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Early
Represented By: Russell Marc Yankwitt
Represented By: Benjamin Allee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?