Johnson v. Saba Capital Management, L.P.
Defendant: First Coast Results, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Charles B. Johnson, as Trustee of the Johnson Family Trust and Templeton Global Income Fund
Defendant / Appellee: Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., Boaz R. Weinstein, Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt and Anatoly Nakum
Case Number: 23-134
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Secur Comm Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion to stay [ # 5 ] filed by Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. [3469529][73] [23-134] [Entered: 02/15/2023 10:08 AM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 70 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/14/2023, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3469279] [23-134] [Entered: 02/14/2023 05:34 PM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 69 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[3469278] [23-134] [Entered: 02/14/2023 05:31 PM]
February 14, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION ORDER, dismissing the appeal with prejudice [ # 60 ] filed by Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, and vacating the previously entered administrative stay, by RDS, SLC, AJN, FILED. [3469276][67] [23-134] [Entered: 02/14/2023 05:30 PM]
February 13, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3468451] [23-134] [Entered: 02/13/2023 05:00 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 53 CURED DEFECTIVE Opposition to Motion, [ # 51 ], [ # 52 ], on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED.[3466133] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 04:51 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 52 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3466044] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 03:56 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 51 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MEMORANDUM BRIEF,, [47], on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED.[3465943] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 03:05 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Jacob W. Buchdahl for Saba Capital Management, L.P. Boaz R. Weinstein Saba Capital Management GP, LLC Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., in case 23-134 , [ # 46 ], ADDED.[3465931] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 02:56 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 49 ATTORNEY, Mark Musico for Saba Capital Management, L.P. Boaz R. Weinstein Saba Capital Management GP, LLC Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., in case 23-134 , [ # 45 ], ADDED.[3465919] [23-134]--[Edited 02/08/2023 by RD] [Entered: 02/08/2023 02:50 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 48 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3465675] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 12:02 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., Saba Capital Management, L.P. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF.[3465663] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 11:57 AM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3465455] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 09:31 AM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., Saba Capital Management, L.P. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3465449] [23-134] [Entered: 02/08/2023 09:28 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Noah Gillespie for Anatoly Nakum Saba Capital Management, L.P. Boaz R. Weinstein Mark Hammitt Ketu Desai Saba Capital Management GP, LLC Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. Karen Caldwell, in case 23-134, [ # 38 ], ADDED.[3464191] [23-134] [Entered: 02/06/2023 09:45 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, George Rowe for Anatoly Nakum Saba Capital Management, L.P. Boaz R. Weinstein Mark Hammitt Ketu Desai Saba Capital Management GP, LLC Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. Karen Caldwell, in case 23-134, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[3464188] [23-134] [Entered: 02/06/2023 09:42 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Andrew Gladstein for Anatoly Nakum Saba Capital Management, L.P. Boaz R. Weinstein Mark Hammitt Ketu Desai Saba Capital Management GP, LLC Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. Karen Caldwell, in case 23-134, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[3464162] [23-134] [Entered: 02/06/2023 09:24 AM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3464066] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 06:21 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3464064] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 06:17 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3464063] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 06:14 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 35 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P. and Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD., FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3464058] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 06:05 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3464034] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 05:25 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Marley Brumme for Templeton Global Income Fund Charles B. Johnson, in case 23-134, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3464021] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 05:03 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Christopher G. Clark for Templeton Global Income Fund Charles B. Johnson, in case 23-134, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3464018] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 05:01 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Eben Colby for Templeton Global Income Fund Charles B. Johnson, in case 23-134, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[3464016] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 05:00 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 28 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3463925] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:40 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 27 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3463912] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:36 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 26 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3463906] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:34 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3463894] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:28 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3463889] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:24 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3463884] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:20 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. Service date 02/03/2023 by CM/ECF.[3463853] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:05 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3463367] [23-134] [Entered: 02/03/2023 09:01 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3462930] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 11:35 AM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/02/2023, to SDNY - NY, ISSUED.[3462889] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 11:03 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION ORDER, referring Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund motion to stay [ # 5 ]. An administrative stay of the certification of the Trustee Vote is granted and the motion for a stay pending appeal is referred to the first available three-judge motions panel. The Clerk is directed to set an expedited schedule for the motion, by BR, FILED. [3462882][11] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:56 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellee Karen Caldwell, Ketu Desai, Mark Hammitt, Anatoly Nakum, Saba Capital Management GP, LLC, Saba Capital Management, L.P., Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Boaz R. Weinstein, FILED. [3462850][6] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:31 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. [3462848] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:29 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, district court receipt # NYSDC-27283704, FILED.[3462841] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:24 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/31/2023, RECEIVED.[3462839] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:23 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Charles B. Johnson and Templeton Global Income Fund, FILED. [3462835] [23-134] [Entered: 02/02/2023 10:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Johnson v. Saba Capital Management, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles B. Johnson, as Trustee of the Johnson Family Trust
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Marley Brumme Esq.
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark Esq.
Represented By: Eben Colby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Templeton Global Income Fund
Represented By: Scott Musoff
Represented By: Marley Brumme Esq.
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark Esq.
Represented By: Eben Colby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Saba Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By: Mark Musico Esq.
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Jacob W. Buchdahl Esq.
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Saba Capital Management GP, LLC
Represented By: Mark Musico Esq.
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Jacob W. Buchdahl Esq.
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Saba Capital Master Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Mark Musico Esq.
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Jacob W. Buchdahl Esq.
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Boaz R. Weinstein
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Jacob W. Buchdahl Esq.
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: Mark Musico Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Karen Caldwell
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ketu Desai
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Hammitt
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anatoly Nakum
Represented By: Michael E. Swartz
Represented By: Noah Gillespie
Represented By: Andrew Gladstein Esq.
Represented By: George Rowe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Coast Results, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?