Packer v. Raging Capital Management, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Brad Packer, derivatively on behalf of 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Raging Capital Management, LLC, Raging Capital Master Fund, Ltd., 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. and William C. Martin
Case Number: 23-367
Filed: March 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Secur Comm Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Filing 29 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Brad Packer's Brief due date as 06/22/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 06/22/2023, FILED.[3489751] [23-367] [Entered: 03/27/2023 11:45 AM]
March 27, 2023 Filing 26 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3489726] [23-367] [Entered: 03/27/2023 11:20 AM]
March 27, 2023 Filing 25 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, informing Court of proposed due date 06/22/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 03/27/2023 by CM/ECF.[3489698] [23-367] [Entered: 03/27/2023 10:55 AM]
March 27, 2023 Filing 21 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED.[3489666] [23-367] [Entered: 03/27/2023 10:36 AM]
March 23, 2023 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [17], on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED.[3488383] [23-367]--[Edited 03/23/2023 by TT] [Entered: 03/23/2023 12:39 PM]
March 23, 2023 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/23/2023 by CM/ECF.[3488312] [23-367] [Entered: 03/23/2023 11:49 AM]
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/23/2023 by CM/ECF.[3488298] [23-367] [Entered: 03/23/2023 11:39 AM]
March 23, 2023 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/23/2023 by CM/ECF.[3488294] [23-367] [Entered: 03/23/2023 11:38 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Joshua Broitman for Appellant Brad Packer, in case 23-367 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3487559] [23-367] [Entered: 03/22/2023 10:45 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Paul Dennis Wexler for Appellant Brad Packer, in case 23-367 , [ # 13 ], ADDED.[3487525] [23-367] [Entered: 03/22/2023 10:30 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Roberto Gomez for Appellant Brad Packer, in case 23-367 , [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3487522] [23-367] [Entered: 03/22/2023 10:29 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF. [3487499] [23-367] [Entered: 03/22/2023 10:14 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/22/2023 by CM/ECF. [3487449] [23-367] [Entered: 03/22/2023 09:48 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/21/2023 by CM/ECF. [3486832] [23-367] [Entered: 03/21/2023 11:38 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. Service date 03/21/2023 by CM/ECF.[3486798] [23-367] [Entered: 03/21/2023 11:11 AM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Raging Captial Management, LLC, Raging Capital Master Fund, Ltd., William C. Martin and 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/20/2023 by CM/ECF.[3486042] [23-367] [Entered: 03/20/2023 11:01 AM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3485232] [23-367] [Entered: 03/17/2023 11:17 AM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/13/2023, RECEIVED.[3485228] [23-367] [Entered: 03/17/2023 11:14 AM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/13/2023, RECEIVED.[3485226] [23-367] [Entered: 03/17/2023 11:12 AM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, district court receipt # ANYEDC-16495814, FILED.[3485223] [23-367] [Entered: 03/17/2023 11:10 AM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Brad Packer, FILED. [3485206] [23-367] [Entered: 03/17/2023 10:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Packer v. Raging Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brad Packer, derivatively on behalf of 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn F. Ostrager
Represented By: Joshua Broitman
Represented By: Roberto Gomez
Represented By: Paul Dennis Wexler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raging Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raging Capital Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William C. Martin
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?