Whitty v. Suffolk County Corr. Facility
Plaintiff: Denard Elliot Whitty
Defendant: Suffolk County Correctional Facility
Appellant: Margaret Torres
Defendant / Appellee: County of Suffolk
Case Number: 23-392
Filed: March 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PRISONER PET-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time, [14], on behalf of Appellant Margaret Torres, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3509069] [23-392] [Entered: 05/02/2023 06:42 PM]
May 1, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Torres, FILED. Service date 04/25/2023 by US mail.[3509068] [23-392] [Entered: 05/02/2023 06:40 PM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee County of Suffolk, FILED. Service date 04/10/2023 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3496699] [23-392] [Entered: 04/10/2023 12:32 PM]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 04/10/2023, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2023, unless Appellant Margaret Torres, submits fee or moves to proceed in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3496558] [23-392] [Entered: 04/10/2023 10:30 AM]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 04/10/2023, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2023, unless Appellant Margaret Torres, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3496545] [23-392] [Entered: 04/10/2023 10:22 AM]
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 04/10/2023, dismissing appeal by 05/01/2023, unless Appellant Margaret Torres, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3496527] [23-392] [Entered: 04/10/2023 10:10 AM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE, to Appellee County of Suffolk, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3496511] [23-392] [Entered: 04/10/2023 10:04 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3488006] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 04:08 PM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3487911] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 03:01 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3487903] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:55 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/10/2023, RECEIVED.[3487902] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:55 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/10/2023, RECEIVED.[3487899] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:54 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Margaret Torres, FILED. [3487893] [23-392] [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Whitty v. Suffolk County Corr. Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denard Elliot Whitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margaret Torres
Represented By: Margaret Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: County of Suffolk
Represented By: Stacy A. Skorupa Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?