Siegel v. The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Siegel, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated and Mark Huber, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ayhan Hassan
Defendant / Appellee: The Boston Beer Company, Inc., David A. Burwick, Frank H. Smalla and C. James Koch
Case Number: 23-8
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Secur Comm Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION ORDER, granting motion Appellant's motion to remove appeal from the expedited appeals calendar and adopt proposed alternative briefing schedule [ # 37 ] filed by Appellant Ayhan Hassan, by JAC, FILED. [3468008][41] [23-8] [Entered: 02/13/2023 10:41 AM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF. [3466190] [23-8] [Entered: 02/08/2023 06:15 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 36 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 03/15/2023, appellee's brief due date as 04/19/2023,TRANSMITTED.[3465503] [23-8] [Entered: 02/08/2023 10:01 AM]
February 7, 2023 Filing 34 NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3465324] [23-8] [Entered: 02/07/2023 04:40 PM]
January 24, 2023 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, J. Ryan Lopatka for Ayhan Hassan, in case 23-8, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[3457353] [23-8] [Entered: 01/24/2023 09:28 AM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Amy-Lee Goodman for C. James Koch Frank H. Smalla David A. Burwick, in case 23-8, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3456876] [23-8] [Entered: 01/23/2023 01:33 PM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Alexander Drylewski for C. James Koch Frank H. Smalla David A. Burwick, in case 23-8, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[3456875] [23-8] [Entered: 01/23/2023 01:32 PM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Kurt Wm. Hemr for C. James Koch Frank H. Smalla David A. Burwick, in case 23-8, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[3456874] [23-8] [Entered: 01/23/2023 01:31 PM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David A. Burwick, C. James Koch and Frank H. Smalla, FILED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF. [3455043] [23-8] [Entered: 01/19/2023 11:10 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David A. Burwick, C. James Koch and Frank H. Smalla, FILED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF. [3454986] [23-8] [Entered: 01/19/2023 10:40 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee David A. Burwick, C. James Koch and Frank H. Smalla, FILED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF. [3454980] [23-8] [Entered: 01/19/2023 10:37 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David A. Burwick, C. James Koch and Frank H. Smalla, FILED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF.[3454972] [23-8] [Entered: 01/19/2023 10:33 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 21 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 01/19/2023 by CM/ECF.[3454970] [23-8] [Entered: 01/19/2023 10:31 AM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3452281] [23-8] [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:28 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3452278] [23-8] [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:24 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3452277] [23-8] [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:23 PM]
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. Service date 01/13/2023 by CM/ECF.[3452274] [23-8] [Entered: 01/13/2023 12:22 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 12 ], [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED.[3451933] [23-8] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:39 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Richard A. McGuirk for The Boston Beer Company, Inc., in case 23-8, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[3451932] [23-8] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:38 PM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/12/2023 by CM/ECF. [3451216] [23-8] [Entered: 01/12/2023 10:00 AM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [10], on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED.[3451089] [23-8] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:12 AM]
January 12, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Morgan C. Nighan for The Boston Beer Company, Inc., in case 23-8, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3451088] [23-8] [Entered: 01/12/2023 08:11 AM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/11/2023 by CM/ECF. [3451015] [23-8] [Entered: 01/11/2023 05:16 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/11/2023 by CM/ECF. [3450722] [23-8] [Entered: 01/11/2023 02:17 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Boston Beer Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/11/2023 by CM/ECF.[3450679] [23-8] [Entered: 01/11/2023 01:50 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, district court receipt # ANYSDC-27157897, FILED.[3447559] [23-8] [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:46 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3447555] [23-8] [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:45 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3447552] [23-8] [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:44 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ayhan Hassan, FILED. [3447538] [23-8] [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Siegel v. The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Siegel, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Huber, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ayhan Hassan
Represented By: Kim Miller Esq.
Represented By: J. Ryan Lopatka Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Boston Beer Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. McGuirk Esq.
Represented By: George J. Skelly Esq.
Represented By: Morgan C. Nighan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David A. Burwick
Represented By: James R. Carroll Esq.
Represented By: Alexander Drylewski Esq.
Represented By: Amy-Lee Goodman
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frank H. Smalla
Represented By: James R. Carroll Esq.
Represented By: Alexander Drylewski Esq.
Represented By: Amy-Lee Goodman
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. James Koch
Represented By: James R. Carroll Esq.
Represented By: Alexander Drylewski Esq.
Represented By: Amy-Lee Goodman
Represented By: Kurt Wm. Hemr Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?