Stubbs v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff / Appellant: Donna Marie Stubbs
Defendant / Appellee: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, USA
Case Number: 23-82
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: SOC SEC-SSID Title XVI
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, dated 03/14/2023, It is hereby Ordered that Appellants brief must be filed on or before 05/25/2023. The appeal is dismissed effective 05/25/2023 if the brief is not filed by that date, FILED.[3483259] [23-82] [Entered: 03/14/2023 02:24 PM]
March 3, 2023 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Avni Gandi, [ # 32 ], in place of attorney Natasha Oeltjen, SUBSTITUTED.[3477672] [23-82] [Entered: 03/03/2023 12:36 PM]
March 3, 2023 Filing 33 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[3477667] [23-82] [Entered: 03/03/2023 12:31 PM]
March 3, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 03/03/2023 by CM/ECF. [3477609] [23-82] [Entered: 03/03/2023 11:51 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 27 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, informing Court of proposed due date 05/30/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 02/28/2023 by CM/ECF.[3475289] [23-82] [Entered: 02/28/2023 08:53 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 26 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, informing the Court that pursuant to this Court's Local Rule 30.1(e)(l)(B), appellant will not file an appendix to her brief RECEIVED. Service date 02/28/2023 by CM/ECF.[3475286] [23-82]--[Edited 02/28/2023 by HT] [Entered: 02/28/2023 08:52 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 23 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 20 ], [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED.[3475253] [23-82] [Entered: 02/28/2023 08:19 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [18], on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED.[3475251] [23-82] [Entered: 02/28/2023 08:16 AM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 21 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 17 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED.[3475249] [23-82] [Entered: 02/28/2023 08:14 AM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/27/2023 by CM/ECF.[3475115] [23-82] [Entered: 02/27/2023 04:17 PM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/27/2023 by CM/ECF.[3475090] [23-82] [Entered: 02/27/2023 04:02 PM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/27/2023 by CM/ECF.[3475089] [23-82] [Entered: 02/27/2023 04:00 PM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 17 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [16], on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED.[3474950] [23-82] [Entered: 02/27/2023 02:10 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 16 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/23/2023 by CM/ECF.[3473581] [23-82] [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:22 PM]
February 23, 2023 Filing 15 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/23/2022 by CM/ECF.[3473559] [23-82] [Entered: 02/23/2023 04:06 PM]
February 21, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Carolyn A. Kubitschek, [ # 11 ], [ # 13 ], in place of attorney Ivan Michael Katz, SUBSTITUTED.[3471712] [23-82] [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:08 AM]
February 21, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER, dated 02/21/2023, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, Mr. Katz notifiying the court that his is being replaced by Ms. Kubitschek, RECEIVED. Service date 02/21/2023 by email.[3471709] [23-82] [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:06 AM]
February 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. Service date 02/17/2023 by CM/ECF. [3471062] [23-82] [Entered: 02/17/2023 11:11 AM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 02/08/2023 by CM/ECF.[3465728] [23-82] [Entered: 02/08/2023 12:36 PM]
February 8, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Natasha Oeltjen, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Dennis J. Canning, SUBSTITUTED.[3465700] [23-82] [Entered: 02/08/2023 12:20 PM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kilolo Kijakazi, FILED. Service date 02/06/2023 by CM/ECF. [3464339] [23-82] [Entered: 02/06/2023 11:53 AM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 6 PAPERS, duplicate copy of the Notice of Appeal and Exhibit to Notice of Appeal on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, RECEIVED.[3464330] [23-82] [Entered: 02/06/2023 11:46 AM]
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 PAPERS, Exhibit to Notice of Appeal forwarded to the Court of Appeals from the District Court, RECEIVED.[3458351] [23-82] [Entered: 01/25/2023 10:54 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3455969] [23-82] [Entered: 01/20/2023 11:52 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 01/09/2023, RECEIVED.[3455967] [23-82] [Entered: 01/20/2023 11:52 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 12/21/2022, RECEIVED.[3455958] [23-82] [Entered: 01/20/2023 11:51 AM]
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Donna Marie Stubbs, FILED. [3455936] [23-82] [Entered: 01/20/2023 11:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stubbs v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Donna Marie Stubbs
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz Esq.
Represented By: Carolyn A. Kubitschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, USA
Represented By: Dennis J. Canning Esq.
Represented By: Avni Dinesh Gandhi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?